Apple Inc. v. Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. et al Featured Case

Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC and Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2011cv01846
Filed: April 15, 2011
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2012 2142 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 2141 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Compel Depositions of Apple Reply Expert Declarants and Samsung's Motion to Compel Production of HTC Settlement Agreement filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Victoria F. Maroulis, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Victoria F. Maroulis)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 16, 2012 2141 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Compel Depositions of Apple Reply Expert Declarants filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Hankil Kang, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Motion to Compel Depositions of Apple Reply Expert Declarants, # 4 Declaration of Victoria F. Maroulis, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Victoria F. Maroulis, # 6 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion to Compel Depositions of Apple Reply Expert Declarants)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 15, 2012 2140 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of 2125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 25 to the Declaration of Susan Estrich filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 2125 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 14, 2012 2139 Declaration of Albert P. Bedecarre in Support of 2138 Order on Motion for Leave to File, 2053 Opposition/Response to Motion, 2054 Brief, filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Manual Filing Notification for Exhibits 1 and 2 to Declaration of Albert P. Bedecarre)(Related document(s) 2138 , 2053 , 2054 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 14, 2012 2138 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 2135 Motion for Leave to File (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 14, 2012 2137 Statement of Recent Decision (L.R. 7-3 (d)) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 13, 2012 2136 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 2089 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 13, 2012 2135 MOTION for Leave to File (A) Declaration of Albert P. Bedecarre in Support of Samsungs Opposition to Apples Motion for a Permanent Injunction and Damages Enhancement and Samsungs Opposition to Apples Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial and Amended Judgment; and (B) Manual Filing Notification for Exhibits 1 and 2 to Declaration of Albert P. Bedecarre filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Samsung's Administrative Request for Leave, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Samsung's Administrative Request for Leave, # 3 Declaration of Albert P. Bedecarre in Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion for Leave, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Albert P. Bedecarre in Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion for Leave, # 5 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 10, 2012 2134 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 2127 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Regarding Apples Reply Brief In Support Of Motion For A Permanent Injunction And Damages Enhancement (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/10/2012)
November 10, 2012 2133 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Apples Motion For A Permanent Injunction And Damages Enhancement by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/10/2012)
November 9, 2012 2132 REPLY (re 2002 CORRECTED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Renewed), New Trial, And Amended Judgment [FRCP 50, 59] ) Reply In Support Of Apples Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law (Renewed), New Trial, And Amended Judgment (FRCP 50, 59) filed byApple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 9, 2012 2131 REPLY (re 2013 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial and/or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 ) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 9, 2012 2130 Declaration Reply Declaration Of John R. Hauser In Support Of Apples Motion For A Permanent Injunction filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 9, 2012 2129 Declaration Reply Declaration Of Marylee Robinson In Support Of Apples Motions For A Permanent Injunction, For Damages Enhancement, For Supplemental Damages And For Prejudgment Interest; And Judgment As A Matter Of Law (Renewed), New Trial, And Amended Judgment [FRCP 50, 59] filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 9, 2012 2128 Manual Filing Notification Exhibit A To The Declaration Of Karan Singh, Ph.D., In Support Of Apples Reply In Support Of Its Motion For A Permanent Injunction And For Damages Enhancements filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2012) Modified on 11/13/2012 Exhibit has not been received in Clerk's Office for Lodging (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2012 2127 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Regarding Apples Reply Brief In Support Of Motion For A Permanent Injunction And Damages Enhancement filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Apples Reply In Support Of Motion For A Permanent Injunction And For Damages Enhancements, # 3 Declaration Of Karan Singh, Ph.D., In Support Of Apples Reply In Support Of Its Motion For A Permanent Injunction And For Damages Enhancements, # 4 Declaration Of Richard S.J. Hung In Support Of Apples Motion For Permanent Injunction And Damages Enhancement; And Judgment As A Matter Of Law (Renewed), New Trial, And Amended Judgment [FRCP 50, 59], # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14, # 19 Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit 16, # 21 Exhibit 17, # 22 Exhibit 18, # 23 Exhibit 19, # 24 Exhibit 20, # 25 Exhibit 21, # 26 Exhibit 22, # 27 Supplement 23, # 28 Robinson Decl. Ex. 2)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 9, 2012 2126 Declaration of Susan Estrich in Support of 2013 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial and/or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59, 2054 Brief, 2053 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to the Estrich Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 to the Estrich Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 to the Estrich Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 4 to the Estrich Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 5 to the Estrich Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 6 to the Estrich Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 7 to the Estrich Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 8 to the Estrich Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 9 to the Estrich Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 10 to the Estrich Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 11 to the Estrich Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 12 to the Estrich Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 13 to the Estrich Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 14 to the Estrich Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 15 to the Estrich Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 16 to the Estrich Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 17 to the Estrich Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 18 to the Estrich Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 19 to the Estrich Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 20 to the Estrich Declaration, # 21 Exhibit 21 to the Estrich Declaration, # 22 Exhibit 22 to the Estrich Declaration, # 23 Exhibit 23 to the Estrich Declaration, # 24 Exhibit 24 to the Estrich Declaration, # 25 Exhibit 25 to the Estrich Declaration, # 26 Exhibit 26 to the Estrich Declaration, # 27 Exhibit 27 to the Estrich Declaration, # 28 Exhibit 28 to the Estrich Declaration, # 29 Exhibit 29 to the Estrich Declaration, # 30 Exhibit 30 to the Estrich Declaration, # 31 Exhibit 31 to the Estrich Declaration)(Related document(s) 2013 , 2054 , 2053 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 9, 2012 2125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 25 to the Declaration of Susan Estrich filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 8, 2012 2124 Featured Case ORDER re 2108 MOTION to Compel Apple to Disclose the Circumstances and Timing of Its Discovery of Juror Information filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/8/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
November 7, 2012 2123 Featured Case ORDER RE ATTORNEYS' FEES FOR FED. R. CIV. P. 37 SANCTIONS re 1213 Order, 880 Order. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 7, 2012. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
November 6, 2012 2122 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 2113 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Corrected Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Samsung's Oppositions to Apple's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial, and Amended Judgment, and Motion for Permane Apple's Notice Regarding Samsung's Corrected Admin Motion to File Under Seal (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 5, 2012 2121 Corrected Attachment 6 Cited in Paragraph 12 to Declaration of Philip W. Schiller in Support of Apple's Postrial Motion for a Preliminary Injunction re 1985 filed by Apple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1985 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/5/2012) Modified text on 11/6/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2012 2120 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 2047 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion for a Permanent Injunction and for Damages Enhancements (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION--PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER SEAL) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terry Musika (Public Redacted Version Previously Filed Under Seal), # 2 Exhibit 6 to Musika Decl., # 3 Exhibit 7 to Musika Decl., # 4 Exhibit 8 to Musika Decl., # 5 Exhibit 9 to Musika Decl., # 6 Exhibit 14 to Musika Decl., # 7 Exhibit 24 to Musika Decl., # 8 Exhibit 26 to Musika Decl., # 9 Exhibit 37 to Musika Decl., # 10 Exhibit 48 to Musika Decl., # 11 Exhibit 52 to Musika Decl., # 12 Exhibit 62 to Musika Decl., # 13 Exhibit 63 to Musika Decl., # 14 Declaration of Marylee Robinson, # 15 Exhibit 30 to Robinson Decl.)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
November 2, 2012 2119 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 2105 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Leave to File Stipulation Regarding Schedule for Post-Trial Depositions filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
November 2, 2012 2118 OPPOSITION to ( 2108 MOTION to Compel Apple to Disclose the Circumstances and Timing of Its Discovery of Juror Information ) filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/2/2012) Modified text on 11/5/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2012 2117 RENEWED MOTION BY NONPARTY MOTOROLA MOBILITY LLC TO SEAL PORTIONS OF EXHIBIT 23, filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Golinveaux, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/1/2012) Modified text on 11/2/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2012 2116 Featured Case ORDER RE APPLE'S MOTION TO CLARIFY by Judge Paul S. Grewal entered 2106 Motion Clarification of Order (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
October 31, 2012 2115 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 2114 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
October 31, 2012 2114 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice FOR CAREY R RAMOS ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7240557.) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A)(Ramos, Carey) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
October 31, 2012 2113 Corrected Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Samsung's Oppositions to Apple's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial, and Amended Judgment, and Motion for Permanent Injunction and Damages Enhancement, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Prashanth Chennakesavan)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/31/2012) Modified text on 11/1/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2012 2112 OPPOSITION to ( 2106 MOTION to clarify order compelling expert depositions re 2105 Order ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/31/2012) Modified text on 11/1/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2012 2111 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Liscom Watson (Watson, Scott) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 2110 Proposed Order re 2108 MOTION to Compel Apple to Disclose the Circumstances and Timing of Its Discovery of Juror Information by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 2109 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 2108 MOTION to Compel Apple to Disclose the Circumstances and Timing of Its Discovery of Juror Information re Briefing Schedule filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Maroulis Decl in support of Stipulation re Schedule for Briefing Samsung's Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit A to Maroulis Declaration in support of Stipulation re Schedule for Briefing Samsung's Motion to Compel)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 2108 MOTION to Compel Apple to Disclose the Circumstances and Timing of Its Discovery of Juror Information, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 11/13/2012. Replies due by 11/20/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Maroulis Decl in support of Samsung's Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit Ex A to Maroulis Decl in support of Samsung's Motion to Compel, # 3 Exhibit Ex B to Maroulis Decl in support of Samsung's Motion to Compel)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/30/2012) Modified text on 10/31/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2012 2107 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 2106 MOTION to clarify order compelling expert depositions re 2105 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Leave to File Regarding Schedule For Briefing filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 2106 MOTION to clarify order compelling expert depositions re 2105 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Leave to File filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 11/13/2012. Replies due by 11/20/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Apple's Motion to Clarify Order Compelling Expert Depositions)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 29, 2012 2105 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 2082 Motion to Compel; granting 2100 Motion for Leave to File (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 2104 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 2092 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying 2099 Motion for Leave to File (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 2103 CORRECTED OPPOSITION ( 2100 MOTION for Leave to File Apples Brief in Response to Samsungs Request for Additional Depositions ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/29/2012) Modified text on 10/30/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2012 2102 OPPOSITION to ( 2100 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Apples brief in Response to Samsungs Request for Additional Depositions ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/29/2012) Modified text on 10/30/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2012 2101 OPPOSITION to ( 2099 SECOND ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re Enlarging Page Limit for Apple's Reply in Support of Motion for Permanent Injunction and for Enhanced Damages ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/29/2012) Modified text on 10/30/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2012 2100 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Apples brief in Response to Samsungs Request for Additional Depositions filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Apples Brief in Response to Samsungs Request for Additional, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Richard S.J. Hung in Support of Apples Administrative Motion for Leave to File Apples brief in Response to Samsungs Request for Additional Depositions)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/28/2012) Modified on 10/29/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2012 2099 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Enlarge Page Limit for Permanent Injunction and Enhanced Damages Reply filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Apples Reply in Support of Administrative Motion to Enlarge Page Limit for Reply in Support of Motion for Permanent Injunction and for Enhanced Damages, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Richard S.J. Hung iso Apples Administrative Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Enlarge Page limit for Permanent Injunction and Enhanced Damages Reply, # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/28/2012) Modified text on 10/29/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2012 2098 OPPOSITION to ( 2092 MOTION to Enlarge Page Limit for Reply In Support of Motion for Permanent Injunction and for Enhanced Damages ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/26/2012) Modified text on 10/29/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2012 2097 Excerpted Replacement Exhibit 37 re 2065 Declaration filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 2065 ) (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/26/2012) Modified text on 10/29/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2012 2096 Declaration Of Nathan Sabri In Support Of 2064 Samsungs Administrative Motion To File Documents Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 10/26/2012) Modified on 10/29/2012 counsel failed to link entry to document #2064 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2012 2095 Declaration Of Cyndi Wheeler In Support Of 2064 Samsungs Administrative Motion To File Documents Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 10/26/2012) Modified on 10/29/2012 linking entry to document #2064 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2012 2094 Apples Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of 2064 Samsungs Administrative Motion To File Documents Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 10/26/2012) Modified on 10/29/2012 linking entry to document #2064 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2012 2093 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 2070 Motion Allowing cross-use of discovery (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 26, 2012 2092 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Enlarge Page Limit for Reply In Support of Motion for Permanent Injunction and for Enhanced Damages filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Richard Hung Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/26/2012) Modified text on 10/29/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2012 2091 Excerpted Replacement Exhibits 9, 10, 11, 12, 28, 29, 30, 31, 32, 34, 38, 47, 71, 72, 83, 85, 189, 191, 195, 206, 207, and 208 re 2065 Declaration in Support, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 2065 ) (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/26/2012) Modified text on 10/29/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2012 2090 OPPOSITION to ( 2082 MOTION to Compel Depositions of Samsung's Declarants ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of John Pierce, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/26/2012) Modified text on 10/29/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2012 2089 Renewed Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Exhibits to the Musika Declaration in Support of Apple's Motion for Permanent Injunction filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Hankil Kang)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/26/2012) Modified text on 10/29/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2012 2088 OPPOSITION to ( 2070 MOTION for Order Permitting Cross-Use of Discovery Materials From Case No. 12-630 ) filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/25/2012) Modified text on 10/26/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2012 2087 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 2081 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 2086 Ex Parte Application (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 24, 2012 2086 EMERGENCY MOTION BY NONPARTY MOTOROLA MOBILITY LLC TO STAY ENFORCEMENT OF MAGISTRATE'S OCTOBER 23, 2012 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE re 2040 filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer A. Golinveaux, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/24/2012) Modified text on 10/25/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2012 2085 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR BRIEFING APPLE'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 2083 Stipulation (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
October 24, 2012 2084 RESPONSE to 2052 Apple's Improper Objections to Evidence in Samsung's Reply in Support of Non-Jury Claims, Including Indefiniteness filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 2052 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/24/2012) Modified text on 10/25/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2012 2083 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 2082 MOTION to Compel Depositions of Samsung's Declarants filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Eric Olson in Support of the Stipulation regarding the Schedule for Briefing Apple's Motion to Compel Depositions of Samsung's Declarants)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/23/2012) Modified text on 10/24/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2012 2082 MOTION to Compel Depositions of Samsung's Declarants filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 10/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Richard Hung in Support of Apple's Motion to Compel Depositions of Samsung Declarants, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/23/2012) Modified text on 10/24/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2012 2081 MOTION for Relief From NonDispositive Order of Magistrate Judge re 2040 Motion Hearing, Terminate Motions, filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter J. Chassman, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/23/2012) Modified text on 10/24/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2012 2080 Featured Case ORDER SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE DOCUMENT re 2040 Motion Hearing, Terminate Motions. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 23, 2012. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
October 22, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing re 2078 Order on Motion to Shorten Time. Pursuant to the Court's order referenced herein, the hearing date for 2070 is removed from the Court's calendar. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 22, 2012 2079 Featured Case STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 2054 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 22, 2012 2078 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Setting Briefing Schedule for Cross-Use of Discovery Materials (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 21, 2012 2076 Declaration of Hankil Kang in Support of 2064 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 2064 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/21/2012)
October 21, 2012 2075 Declaration of Tim Rowden in Support of 2053 Opposition to 2054 TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR A PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND DAMAGES ENHANCEMENT, AND APPLE'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (RENEWED), NEW TRIAL, AND AMENDED JUDGMENT filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 2053 , 2054 ) (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/21/2012) Modified text on 10/22/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2012 2074 Proposed Order re 2071 MOTION to Shorten Time For Briefing on Motion for Cross-Use of Discovery by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/20/2012)
October 20, 2012 2073 Proposed Order re 2070 MOTION Cross-Use of Discovery Materials From Case No. 12-630 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/20/2012)
October 20, 2012 2072 Declaration of Joby Martin in Support of 2071 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 2071 ) (Stretch, Christopher) (Filed on 10/20/2012) Modified text on 10/22/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2012 2071 MOTION to Shorten Time For Briefing on Motion for Cross-Use of Discovery filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation). (Stretch, Christopher) (Filed on 10/20/2012)
October 20, 2012 2070 MOTION for Order Permitting Cross-Use of Discovery Materials From Case No. 12-630 in Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Post-Trial Motions filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation). Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 11/5/2012. Replies due by 11/13/2012. (Stretch, Christopher) (Filed on 10/20/2012) Modified text on 10/22/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2012 2069 EXHIBITS re 2065 Declaration in Support,,, in Opposition to Apple's Motion for Permanent Injunction and Damages Enhancement filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 161, # 2 Exhibit 162, # 3 Exhibit 163, # 4 Exhibit 164, # 5 Exhibit 165, # 6 Exhibit 166, # 7 Exhibit 167, # 8 Exhibit 168, # 9 Exhibit 169, # 10 Exhibit 170, # 11 Exhibit 171, # 12 Exhibit 172, # 13 Exhibit 173, # 14 Exhibit 174, # 15 Exhibit 176, # 16 Exhibit 177, # 17 Exhibit 178, # 18 Exhibit 179, # 19 Exhibit 180, # 20 Exhibit 181, # 21 Exhibit 182, # 22 Exhibit 184, # 23 Exhibit 185, # 24 Exhibit 186, # 25 Exhibit 187, # 26 Exhibit 188, # 27 Exhibit 192, # 28 Exhibit 194, # 29 Exhibit 196, # 30 Exhibit 209, # 31 Exhibit 210, # 32 Exhibit 211)(Related document(s) 2065 ) (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/20/2012) Modified on 10/22/2012 EXHIBITS HAVE NOT BEEN SUBMITTED TO THE CLERK'S OFFICER FOR FILING (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2012 2068 EXHIBITS re 2065 Declaration in Support,,, in Opposition to Apple's Motion for Permanent Injunction and Damages Enhancement filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 132, # 2 Exhibit 133, # 3 Exhibit 134, # 4 Exhibit 135, # 5 Exhibit 136, # 6 Exhibit 137, # 7 Exhibit 138, # 8 Exhibit 139, # 9 Exhibit 140, # 10 Exhibit 141, # 11 Exhibit 142, # 12 Exhibit 143, # 13 Exhibit 144, # 14 Exhibit 145, # 15 Exhibit 146, # 16 Exhibit 147, # 17 Exhibit 148, # 18 Exhibit 149, # 19 Exhibit 150, # 20 Exhibit 151, # 21 Exhibit 152, # 22 Exhibit 153, # 23 Exhibit 154, # 24 Exhibit 155, # 25 Exhibit 156, # 26 Exhibit 157, # 27 Exhibit 158, # 28 Exhibit 159, # 29 Exhibit 160)(Related document(s) 2065 ) (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/20/2012) Modified on 10/22/2012 EXHIBITS HAVE NOT BEEN SUBMITTED TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE FOR FILING (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2012 2067 EXHIBITS re 2065 Declaration in Support,,, in Opposition to Apple's Motion for Permanent Injunction and Damages Enhancement filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 101, # 2 Exhibit 102, # 3 Exhibit 103, # 4 Exhibit 104, # 5 Exhibit 105, # 6 Exhibit 106, # 7 Exhibit 108, # 8 Exhibit 109, # 9 Exhibit 110, # 10 Exhibit 111, # 11 Exhibit 112, # 12 Exhibit 113, # 13 Exhibit 114, # 14 Exhibit 115, # 15 Exhibit 116, # 16 Exhibit 117, # 17 Exhibit 118, # 18 Exhibit 119, # 19 Exhibit 120, # 20 Exhibit 121, # 21 Exhibit 122, # 22 Exhibit 123, # 23 Exhibit 124, # 24 Exhibit 125, # 25 Exhibit 126, # 26 Exhibit 127, # 27 Exhibit 128, # 28 Exhibit 129, # 29 Exhibit 130, # 30 Exhibit 131)(Related document(s) 2065 ) (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/20/2012) Modified on 10/22/2012 EXHIBITS HAVE NOT BEEN SUBMITTED TO CLERK'S OFFICE FOR FILING (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2012 2066 EXHIBITS re 2065 Declaration in Support,,, filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 57, # 2 Exhibit 59, # 3 Exhibit 60, # 4 Exhibit 61, # 5 Exhibit 62, # 6 Exhibit 63, # 7 Exhibit 64, # 8 Exhibit 66, # 9 Exhibit 67, # 10 Exhibit 68, # 11 Exhibit 69, # 12 Exhibit 70, # 13 Exhibit 73, # 14 Exhibit 74, # 15 Exhibit 75, # 16 Exhibit 76, # 17 Exhibit 77, # 18 Exhibit 78, # 19 Exhibit 79, # 20 Exhibit 80, # 21 Exhibit 81, # 22 Exhibit 82, # 23 Exhibit 88, # 24 Exhibit 89, # 25 Exhibit 90, # 26 Exhibit 91, # 27 Exhibit 94, # 28 Exhibit 95, # 29 Exhibit 96, # 30 Exhibit 97, # 31 Exhibit 98, # 32 Exhibit 99, # 33 Exhibit 100)(Related document(s) 2065 ) (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/20/2012) Modified on 10/22/2012 EXHBITS HAVE NOT BEEN SUBMITTED TO CLERK'S OFFICE FOR FILING (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2012 2065 Declaration of Michael J. Wagner in Support of 2054 Opposition to Apple's Motion for Permanent Injunction and Damages Enhancement filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Manual Filing Notification, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 14, # 5 Exhibit 15, # 6 Exhibit 16, # 7 Exhibit 17, # 8 Exhibit 18, # 9 Exhibit 20, # 10 Exhibit 21, # 11 Exhibit 23, # 12 Exhibit 26, # 13 Exhibit 27, # 14 Exhibit 33, # 15 Exhibit 35, # 16 Exhibit 36, # 17 Exhibit 39, # 18 Exhibit 40, # 19 Exhibit 41, # 20 Exhibit 43, # 21 Exhibit 44, # 22 Exhibit 45, # 23 Exhibit 48, # 24 Exhibit 49, # 25 Exhibit 50, # 26 Exhibit 51, # 27 Exhibit 52, # 28 Exhibit 53, # 29 Exhibit 56, # 30 Exhibit 57)(Related document(s) 2054 ) (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/20/2012) Modified text on 10/22/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2012 2064 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/20/2012)
October 20, 2012 2063 EXHIBITS re 2061 Declaration in Support, of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Damages Enhancement filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 8, # 7 Exhibit 9, # 8 Exhibit 10, # 9 Exhibit 11, # 10 Exhibit 14, # 11 Exhibit 15, # 12 Exhibit 16, # 13 Exhibit 17, # 14 Exhibit 18, # 15 Exhibit 19, # 16 Exhibit 20, # 17 Exhibit 21, # 18 Exhibit 44, # 19 Exhibit 45, # 20 Exhibit 46, # 21 Exhibit 47)(Related document(s) 2061 ) (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/20/2012) Modified on 10/22/2012 EXHIBITS HAVE NOT BEEN SUBMITTED TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE FOR FILING (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2012 2062 EXHIBITS re 2058 Declaration in Support, Exhibits to Pierce Declaration in Support of Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial, and Amended Judgment filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-11 to Pierce Dec ISO Samsung's Opp. to JMOL, # 2 Exhibit 12 to Pierce Dec ISO Samsung's Opp. to JMOL, # 3 Exhibit 13 to Pierce Dec ISO Samsung's Opp. to JMOL, # 4 Exhibit 14-19 to Pierce Dec ISO Samsung's Opp. to JMOL, # 5 Exhibit 20 to Pierce Dec ISO Samsung's Opp. to JMOL, # 6 Exhibit 21-24 to Pierce Dec ISO Samsung's Opp. to JMOL, # 7 Exhibit 25 to Pierce Dec ISO Samsung's Opp. to JMOL, # 8 Exhibit 26-28 to Pierce Dec ISO Samsung's Opp. to JMOL, # 9 Exhibit 29-33 to Pierce Dec ISO Samsung's Opp. to JMOL, # 10 Exhibit 34-65 to Pierce Dec ISO Samsung's Opp. to JMOL)(Related document(s) 2058 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/19/2012) Modified on 10/22/2012 EXHIBITS HAVE NOT BEEN SUBMITTED TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE FOR FILING (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2012 2061 Declaration of John M. Pierce in Support of 2054 Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Moiton for a Permanent Injunction and Damages Enhancement filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 2054 ) (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/19/2012) Modified text on 10/22/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2012 2060 Declaration of Corey Kerstetter in Support of 2053 Opposition, 2054 to Apple's Motion for Permanent Injunction and Damages Enhancement and Apple's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law )Renewed) New Trial, and Amended Judgment filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 2053 , 2054 ) (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/19/2012) Modified text on 10/22/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2012 2059 Declaration of Michael Wagner in Support of 2053 Opposition to Apple's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law )Renewed) New Trial, and Amended Judgment filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 2053 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/19/2012) Modified text on 10/22/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2012 2058 Declaration of John Pierce in Support of 2053 Opposition to Apple's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial, and Amended Judgment filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 2053 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/19/2012) Modified text on 10/22/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2012 2057 Declaration of Sam Lucente in Support of 2053 Opposition to [2054 for Permanent Injunction and Damages Enhancement and Apple's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law )Renewed) New Trial, and Amended Judgment (Public Redacted Version) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 2053 , 2054 ) (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/19/2012) Modified text on 10/22/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2012 2056 Declaration of David Kim in Support of 2053 Opposition to Motion, 2054 for Permanent Injunction and Damages Enhancement and Apple's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law )Renewed) New Trial, and Amended Judgment filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 2053 , 2054 ) (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/19/2012) Modified text on 10/22/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2012 2055 Declaration of Hee-Chan Choi in Support of 2053 Opposition to Motion, 2054 for a Permanent Injunction and Damages Enhancement, and Apple's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Renewed), New Trial, and Amended Judgment filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 2053 , 2054 ) (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/19/2012) Modified text on 10/22/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2012 2054 Opposition to Apple's Motion for Permanent Injunction and Damages Enhancements filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tulin Erdem, # 2 Declaration of Stephen Gray, # 3 Declaration of R. Sukumar, # 4 Declaration of Jerry Wind, # 5 Declaration of Andries Van Dam)(Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/19/2012) Modified text on 10/22/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2012 2053 OPPOSITION to ( 2002 Apple's CORRECTED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Renewed), New Trial, And Amended Judgment [FRCP 50, 59] ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/19/2012) Modified text on 10/22/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2012 2052 OBJECTIONS to Evidence in 2042 Samsung's Reply in Support of Motion on Non-Jury Claims, Including Indefiniteness by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2012) Modified text on 10/22/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2012 2051 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn in Support of 2050 Apple's Opposition to Samsung's JMOL, New Trial, and Remittitur Motion filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 2050 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/19/2012) Modified text on 10/22/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2012 2050 OPPOSITION to ( 2013 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial and/or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 ) filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2012) Modified text on 10/22/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2012 2077 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 1138 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Federal Circuit #2012-1506: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al move without opposition to voluntarily dismiss its appeal with prejudice. Upon consideration thereof, It is Ordered that the motion is GRANTED. Each Side Shall bear its Own Costs. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
October 18, 2012 2049 Exhibit 24 to the Declaration of S. Calvin Walden in Support of 737 Apples Motion to Compel Depositions of 14 of Sumsungs Purported Apex Witnesses (dkt. No. 737-2) Previously Filed Under Seal., by Apple Inc. re 1978 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 42 To The Declaration Of Mia Mazza In Support Of Apples Motion To Compel Depositions Of 14 Of Samsungs Purported Apex Witnesses (Dkt. No. 736-3) Previously Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 43 To The Declaration Of Mia Mazza In Support Of Apples Motion To Compel Depositions Of 14 Of Samsungs Purported Apex Witnesses (Dkt. No. 736-3) Previously Filed Under Seal)(Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 10/18/2012) Modified text on 10/21/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2012 2048 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING SPRINT SPECTRUM, L.P.'S MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENT IN PART by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 2045 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
October 17, 2012 2047 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 1982 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 16, 2012 2046 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1979 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 1980 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 16, 2012 2045 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXPEDITED MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF BY NONPARTY SPRINT SPECTRUM, L.P. TO SEAL DOCUMENT IN PART filed by Sprint Spectrum, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Proposed Order)(Chang, Andrew) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 16, 2012 2044 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/10/2012, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2013. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 15, 2012 2043 NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING SAMSUNG'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF 2013 ITS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, NEW TRIAL AND/OR REMITTITUR PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 50 AND 59 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/15/2012) Modified on 10/16/2012 linking entry to document #2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2012 2042 REPLY in Support of ( 1988 MOTION on Samsung's Non-Jury Claims, Including Indefiniteness ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John M. Pierce, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified text on 10/14/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2012 2041 Reply Brief Regarding 1981 Non-Jury Claims Including Waiver, Equitable Estoppel, Unclean Hands, and Unfair Competition filed by Apple Inc. (Related document(s) 1981 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified text on 10/14/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2012 2040 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 2028 Emergency Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Document filed by Motorola Mobility LLC: The Court denies Motorola Mobility's Motion to Seal for reasons stated on the record. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/10/2012)
October 9, 2012 2039 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 2026 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document; denying 2036 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 9, 2012 2038 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 2031 Motion to Shorten Time; denying 2032 Motion to Strike (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 9, 2012 2037 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING ON MOTOROLA MOBILITY'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT: Motion Hearing (In Re: Docket No. 2028 ) set for 10/10/2012 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 8, 2012 2036 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document at Docket No. 2031-2 filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/8/2012)
October 8, 2012 2035 EXHIBITS re 2031 MOTION to Shorten Time Regarding Samsung's Motion to Strike CORRECTED Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Kara Borden filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 2031 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/8/2012)
October 5, 2012 2034 OPPOSITION to ( 2031 MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing Regarding Samsung's Motion to Strike ) filed byApple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2012) Modified text on 10/9/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2012 2033 Proposed Orderre 2032 Samsung's Motion to Shorten Time by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/5/2012) Modified on 10/9/2012 linking entry to document #2032 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2012 2032 MOTION to Strike Portions of Declarations of Christopher Crouse, Terry Musika, Marylee Robinson, Phillip W. Schiller, and Russell S. Winer in Support of Apples Motion for a Permanent Injunction filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Responses due by 10/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion to Strike)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 2031 MOTION to Shorten Time Regarding 2032 Samsung's Motion to Strike filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kara Borden in Support of D, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/5/2012) Modified on 10/9/2012 linking entry to document #2032 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2012 2030 EXHIBIT 6 to 2029 the Declaration of Victoria Maroulis in Support of Samsung's Respone to Apple's Brief Regarding Non-Jury Claims filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7, # 2 Exhibit 8, # 3 Exhibit 9, # 4 Exhibit 10, # 5 Exhibit 11)(Related document(s) 2029 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/5/2012) Modified text on 10/9/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2012 2029 RESPONSE to 1981 Apple's Brief Regarding Non-Jury Claims, Including Waiver, Equitable Estoppel, Unclean Hands, and Unfair Competition filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Victoria Maroulis, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 1981 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/5/2012) Modified text on 10/9/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2012 2028 Emergency Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Document filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 2027 OPPOSITION to ( 1988 MOTION on Samsung's Non-Jury Claims, Including Indefiniteness ) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Nathan Sabri In Support Of Apples Opposition To Samsungs Motion On Nonjury Claims, Including Indefiniteness, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2012) Modified text on 10/9/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2012 2026 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document re Dkt. Nos. 2013-3 and 2022-1 filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 2025 CORRECTED EXHIBITS A - I to 2022 the Zeller Affidavit in Support of Samsung's Rules 50 and 59 Motion filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 2022 ) (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/5/2012) Modified text on 10/9/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 10/9/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2012 2024 CORRECTED EXHIBIT B to the Estrich Declaration in Support of 2013 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial and/or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 2013 ) (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/5/2012) Modified text on 10/9/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2012 2023 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Ali Shah (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 4, 2012 2022 AFFIDAVIT of Michael T. Zeller in Support of Samsung's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial, and/or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: *** # 1 Exhibit FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** )(Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/4/2012) Modified on 10/5/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2012 2021 NOTICE of Filing of Documents Previously Filed Under Seal (Docket Nos. 603, 604, 605, 606, 607, 642, 643, 707, 754, and 758) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1978 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Attachments: # 1 Samsung's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Apple to Produce Documents and Things (Dkt. No. 603), # 2 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit J, # 7 Exhibit K, # 8 Exhibit L, # 9 Exhibit M, # 10 Exhibit N, # 11 Exhibit O, # 12 Exhibit P, # 13 Exhibit Q, # 14 Exhibit R, # 15 Exhibit S, # 16 Exhibit T, # 17 Exhibit U, # 18 Exhibit V, # 19 Exhibit W, # 20 Exhibit X, # 21 Exhibit Y, # 22 Exhibit Z, # 23 Exhibit AA, # 24 Exhibit BB, # 25 Exhibit CC, # 26 Samsung's Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery Relating to Mac OS 10.0 (Dkt. No. 604), # 27 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan, # 28 Exhibit A, # 29 Exhibit B, # 30 Exhibit C, # 31 Samsung's Motion to Enforce Various Court Orders Requiring the Production of Materials Relevant to Apple's Asserted Design Patents (Dkt. No. 605), # 32 Exhibit C, # 33 Exhibit D, # 34 Exhibit F, # 35 Exhibit I, # 36 Samsung's Motion For Clarification Regarding the Court's December 22, 2011 Order (Dkt. No. 606), # 37 Declaration of Brett Arnold, # 38 Exhibit C, # 39 Exhibit F, # 40 Manual Filing Notification, # 41 Exhibit H, # 42 Exhibit I, # 43 Exhibit J, # 44 Samsung's Notice of Motion and Motion for a Protective Order (Dkt. No. 607), # 45 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan, # 46 Exhibit B, # 47 Exhibit C, # 48 Exhibit D, # 49 Exhibit E, # 50 Exhibit F, # 51 Exhibit I, # 52 Exhibit K, # 53 Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Things (Dkt. No. 642), # 54 Declaration of Melissa C. Chan, # 55 Exhibit 1, # 56 Exhibit 4, # 57 Declaration of Hankil Kang, # 58 Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 643), # 59 Declaration of Rosa Kim, # 60 Declaration of Melissa C. Chan, # 61 Exhibit 1, # 62 Exhibit 2, # 63 Exhibit 7, # 64 Exhibit 8, # 65 Exhibit 9, # 66 Exhibit 10, # 67 Exhibit 11, # 68 Exhibit 12, # 69 Samsung's Unopposed Motion for Issuance of a Request for Judicial Assistance (Dkt. No. 707), # 70 Exhibit 1, # 71 Exhibit 2, # 72 Exhibit 3, # 73 Exhibit 5, # 74 Exhibit 6, # 75 Samsung's Notice of Motion and Motion for a Protective Order (Dkt. No. 754), # 76 Exhibit 2, # 77 Exhibit 3, # 78 Exhibit 4, # 79 Exhibit 5, # 80 Exhibit 6, # 81 Exhibit 7, # 82 Exhibit 8, # 83 Exhibit 9, # 84 Exhibit 10, # 85 Exhibit A, # 86 Exhibit B, # 87 Exhibit E, # 88 Exhibit F, # 89 Exhibit G, # 90 Exhibit H, # 91 Exhibit I, # 92 Exhibit J, # 93 Exhibit K, # 94 Exhibit L, # 95 Exhibit M, # 96 Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Rule 37(B)(2) Sanctions for Samsung's Alleged Violations of Two Discovery Orders (Dkt. No. 758), # 97 Declaration of Sara Jenkins, # 98 Exhibit A, # 99 Exhibit C, # 100 Exhibit D, # 101 Exhibit E, # 102 Exhibit F, # 103 Exhibit H, # 104 Exhibit I, # 105 Exhibit J, # 106 Exhibit K, # 107 Exhibit L, # 108 Exhibit M, # 109 Exhibit N, # 110 Declaration of Hankil Kang)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/2/2012) Modified text on 10/3/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2012 2020 Unredacted Apples Rule 37(B)(2) Motion Re Samsungs Violation Of January 27, 2012 Damages Discovery Order; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof by Apple Inc. re 1978 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Decl Of Erik J. Olson ISO Apples Rule 37(B)(2) Motion Re Samsungs Violation Of January 27, 2012 Damages Discovery Order, # 2 Unredacted Olson Decl. Ex. 1, # 3 Unredacted Olson Decl. Ex. 2, # 4 Unredacted Olson Decl. Ex. 3, # 5 Unredacted Olson Decl. Ex. 4, # 6 Unredacted Olson Decl. Ex. 5, # 7 Unredacted Olson Decl. Ex. 6, # 8 Unredacted Olson Decl. Ex. 7, # 9 Unredacted Olson Decl. Ex. 8, # 10 Unredacted Olson Decl. Ex. 10, # 11 Unredacted Olson Decl. Ex. 11, # 12 Unredacted Olson Decl. Ex. 12, # 13 Unredacted Olson Decl. Ex. 13, # 14 Unredacted Olson Decl. Ex. 14, # 15 Unredacted Olson Decl. Ex. 15, # 16 Unredacted Olson Decl. Ex. 16, # 17 Unredacted Olson Decl. Ex. 18, # 18 Unredacted Olson Decl. Ex. 19, # 19 Unredacted Decl Of Eric R. Roberts ISO Motion To Enforce January 27, 2012 Order As To Financial Documents)(Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 10/2/2012) Modified text on 10/3/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2012 2019 Unredacted Declaration Of S. Calvin Walden In Support Of Apples Motion To Compel Depositions Of 14 Of Samsungs Purported Apex Witnesses by Apple Inc. re 1978 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Walden Decl. Ex. 2, # 2 Unredacted Walden Decl. Ex. 3, # 3 Unredacted Walden Decl. Ex. 4, # 4 Unredacted Walden Decl. Ex. 5, # 5 Unredacted Walden Decl. Ex. 6, # 6 Unredacted Walden Decl. Ex. 7, # 7 Unredacted Walden Decl. Ex. 8, # 8 Unredacted Walden Decl. Ex. 9, # 9 Unredacted Walden Decl. Ex. 10, # 10 Unredacted Walden Decl. Ex. 21, # 11 Unredacted Walden Decl. Ex. 22, # 12 Unredacted Walden Decl. Ex. 25)(Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 10/2/2012) Modified text on 10/3/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2012 2018 Unredacted Apples Motion To Compel Depositions Of 14 Of Samsungs Purported Apex Witnesses by Apple Inc. re 1978 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Decl Of Mia Mazza ISO Apples Motion To Compel Depositions Of 14 Of Samsungs Purported Apex Witnesses, # 2 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 1, # 3 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 2, # 4 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 3, # 5 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 4, # 6 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 5, # 7 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 6, # 8 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 7, # 9 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 9, # 10 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 23, # 11 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 24, # 12 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 25, # 13 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 26, # 14 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 27, # 15 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 28, # 16 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 39, # 17 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 44, # 18 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 45, # 19 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 46, # 20 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 47, # 21 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 48, # 22 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 49, # 23 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 50, # 24 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 51, # 25 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 52, # 26 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 53, # 27 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 54, # 28 Unredacted Mazza Decl. Ex. 55)(Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 10/2/2012) Modified text on 10/3/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2012 2017 Unredacted Apple Inc.s Motion For Rule 37(B)(2) Sanctions For Samsungs Violation Of Two Discovery Orders by Apple Inc. re 1978 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Decl Of Minn Chung ISO Apples Motion For Rule 37(B)(2) Sanctions For Samsungs Violation Of Two Discovery Orders, # 2 Unredacted Chung Decl. Ex. A, # 3 Unredacted Chung Decl. Ex. B, # 4 Unredacted Chung Decl. Ex. C, # 5 Unredacted Chung Decl. Ex. F, # 6 Unredacted Chung Decl. Ex. H, # 7 Unredacted Chung Decl. Ex. L, # 8 Unredacted Chung Decl. Ex. M, # 9 Unredacted Chung Decl. Ex. N, # 10 Unredacted Chung Decl. Ex. R, # 11 Unredacted Chung Decl. Ex. S, # 12 Unredacted Chung Decl. Ex. U, # 13 Unredacted Chung Decl. Ex. W, # 14 Unredacted Chung Decl. Ex. X, # 15 Unredacted Chung Decl. Ex. BB)(Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 10/2/2012) Modified text on 10/3/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2012 2016 Statement Regarding 1978 September 18, 2012 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, by Apple Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/2/2012) Modified text on 10/3/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2012 2015 Unredacted Apples Opposition To Samsungs Motion To Enforce Various Court Orders by Apple Inc. re 1978 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Decl Of Jason R. Bartlett ISO Apples Opp To Samsungs Motion To Enforce Various Court Orders, # 2 Unredacted Bartlett Decl. Ex. B)(Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 10/2/2012) Modified text on 10/3/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2012 2014 Unredacted OPPOSITION to Samsung's Motion to Compel by Apple Inc. re 1978 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Decl. Of Samuel J. Maselli ISO Apples Opp. To Samsungs Motion To Compel Discovery)(Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 10/2/2012) Modified text on 10/3/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2012 2013 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial and/or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 50 and 59 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 2009 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Rules 50 and 59 Motion; Estrich Declaration in Support; Exhibits A-O to the Estrich Declaration; Exhibits 13 and 18 to the Pierce Declaration (Un-redacted) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Estrich in Support of Samsung's Rules 50 and 59 Motion, # 2 Exhibit A to the Estrich Declaration, *** # 3 Exhibit B to the Estrich Declaration FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , # 4 Exhibit C to the Estrich Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to the Estrich Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to the Estrich Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to the Estrich Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to the Estrich Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to the Estrich Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I to the Estrich Declaration, # 11 Exhibit J to the Estrich Declaration, # 12 Exhibit K to the Estrich Declaration, # 13 Exhibit L to the Estrich Declaration, # 14 Exhibit M to the Estrich Declaration, # 15 Exhibit N to the Estrich Declaration, # 16 Exhibit O to the Estrich Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 13 to the Pierce Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 18 to the Pierce Declaration)(Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/2/2012) Modified text on 10/3/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/5/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2012 2012 Declaration of Susan R. Estrich in Support of 1819 Samsung's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial, and/or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 10/1/2012) Modified on 10/2/2012 linking entry to document #1819 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2012 2011 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 1936 MOTION To Dissolve the June 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/1/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 30, 2012 2010 REPLY in Further Support of its Application Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1(c) for Decision on Motion to Dissolve the Judge 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction (re 2008 , re 2007 filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 9/30/2012) Modified text on 10/2/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2012 2009 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 1990 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
September 28, 2012 2008 Opposition to 2007 Samsung's Renewed Application to Dissolve Galaxy Tab 10.1 Preliminary Injunction filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 10/12/2012. Replies due by 10/19/2012. (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 9/28/2012) Modified on 10/2/2012 counsel posted document incorrectly as a motion (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2012 2007 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Notice of Remand and Application for Decision (Attachments: # 1 Addendum A)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
September 28, 2012 2006 Declaration of Courtland L. Reichman in Support of 1980 Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byTelefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 1980 ) (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
September 27, 2012 2005 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 2000 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
September 27, 2012 2004 Declaration of Nathan Sabri in Support of 2003 Opposition/Response to Motion, to File Documents Under Seal and For An Order Prohibiting the Parties From Communicating with Jurors filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 2003 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
September 25, 2012 2003 PARTIAL OPPOSITION to ( 1990 Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal And For An Order Prohibiting The Parties From Communicating With Jurors filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments:****EXHIBIT 1 FILED IN ERROR--SEE DOCKET #2004**** # 1 Declaration Sabri Decl, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 9/25/2012) Modified text on 9/26/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/27/2012 (mpb, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2012 2002 CORRECTED NOTICE OF MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Renewed), New Trial, And Amended Judgment [FRCP 50, 59] filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 10/19/2012. Replies due by 11/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 9/25/2012) Modified text on 9/26/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2012 2001 CORRECTED EXHIBIT 19 to the Pierce Declaration re 1993 Declaration in Support, 1991 Declaration in Support, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 1993 , 1991 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 9/25/2012) Modified text on 9/26/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2012 2000 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document ( Exhibit 19 to the Pierce Declaration in support of Samsung's Rules 50 and 50 Motion (Dkt. No. 1991) ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Exhibit 19 to the Pierce Declaration)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 9/25/2012) Modified text on 9/26/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2012 1999 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08-24-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 24, 2012 1998 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08-20-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 24, 2012 1997 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08-21-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 24, 2012 1996 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING SAMSUNG'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW MOTION TO PERMIT EXPERT TO REVIEW MATERIALS DESIGNATED UNDER PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 761 Motion to Withdraw 701 AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION to Amend/Correct 691 MOTION to Permit Samsung's Expert Samuel Lucente to Review Materials Designated Under the Protective Order (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 24, 2012 1995 Proposed Order re 1990 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Rules 50 and 59 Motion [Proposed] Order Granting Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal by Apple Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 24, 2012 1994 Declaration of Cyndi Wheeler in Support of 1990 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Rules 50 and 59 Motion filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1990 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 22, 2012 1993 Declaration of John Pierce in Support of 1990 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Rules 50 and 59 Motion, 1991 Declaration in Support,,,,,,, Corrected Declaration of John Pierce in Support of Samsung's Rules 50 and 59 Motion filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 48 to Pierce, # 2 Exhibit 49 to Pierce)(Related document(s) 1990 , 1991 ) (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 9/22/2012)
September 22, 2012 1992 Declaration of Jason Bartlett in Support of 1982 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 1983 . filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4-1, # 5 Exhibit 4-2, # 6 Exhibit 4-3, # 7 Exhibit 4-4, # 8 Exhibit 4-5, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) 1982 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 9/22/2012)
September 21, 2012 1991 Declaration of John Pierce in Support of 1990 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Rules 50 and 59 Motion Declaration of John Pierce in Support of Samsung's Rules 50 and 59 Motion filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Pierce, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Pierce, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Pierce, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Pierce, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Pierce, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Pierce, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Pierce, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Pierce, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Pierce, # 10 Exhibit 10 to Pierce, # 11 Exhibit 11 to Pierce, # 12 Exhibit 12 to Pierce, # 13 Exhibit 13 to Pierce, # 14 Exhibit 14 to Pierce, # 15 Exhibit 15 to Pierce, # 16 Exhibit 16 to Pierce, # 17 Exhibit 17 to Pierce, # 18 Exhibit 18 to Pierce, # 19 Exhibit 19 to Pierce, # 20 Exhibit 20 to Pierce, # 21 Exhibit 21 to Pierce, # 22 Exhibit 22 to Pierce, # 23 Exhibit 23 to Pierce, # 24 Exhibit 24 to Pierce, # 25 Exhibit 25 to Pierce, # 26 Exhibit 26 to Pierce, # 27 Exhibit 27 to Pierce, # 28 Exhibit 28 to Pierce, # 29 Exhibit 29 to Pierce, # 30 Exhibit 30 to Pierce, # 31 Exhibit 31 to Pierce, # 32 Exhibit 32 to Pierce, # 33 Exhibit 33 to Pierce, # 34 Exhibit 34 to Pierce, # 35 Exhibit 35 to Pierce, # 36 Exhibit 36 to Pierce, # 37 Exhibit 37 to Pierce, # 38 Exhibit 38 to Pierce, # 39 Exhibit 39 to Pierce, # 40 Exhibit 40 to Pierce, # 41 Exhibit 41 to Pierce, # 42 Exhibit 42 to Pierce, # 43 Exhibit 43 to Pierce, # 44 Exhibit 44 to Pierce, # 45 Exhibit 45 to Pierce, # 46 Exhibit 46 to Pierce, # 47 Exhibit 47 to Pierce, # 48 Notice of Manual Filing)(Related document(s) 1990 ) (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 21, 2012 1990 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Rules 50 and 59 Motion filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Estrich ISO Admin. Mot., # 2 Proposed Order Granting Admin. Mot., # 3 Samsung's Rules 50 and 59 Motions, # 4 Declaration of Susan Estrich ISO Samsung's Rules 50 and 59 Motion, # 5 Exhibit A to Estrich, # 6 Exhibit B to Estrich, # 7 Exhibit C to Estrich, # 8 Exhibit D to Estrich, # 9 Exhibit E to Estrich, # 10 Exhibit F to Estrich, # 11 Exhibit G to Estrich, # 12 Exhibit H to Estrich, # 13 Exhibit I to Estrich, # 14 Exhibit J to Estrich, # 15 Exhibit K to Estrich, # 16 Exhibit L to Estrich, # 17 Exhibit M to Estrich, # 18 Exhibit N to Estrich, # 19 Exhibit O to Estrich, # 20 Declaration of Michael Wagner, # 21 Exhibit A to Wagner, # 22 Exhibit B to Wagner, # 23 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Rules 50 and 59 Motions)(Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 21, 2012 1989 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Apple's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Renewed), New Trial, and Amended Judgment [FRCP 50, 59] filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 10/19/2012. Replies due by 11/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kim Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 21, 2012 1988 Brief re 1965 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Samsung's Motion On Non-Jury Claims, Including Indefiniteness filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of B. Dylan Proctor, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 1965 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 21, 2012 1987 Proposed Order re 1982 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Proposed Order Granting Apple's Motion for a Permanent Injunction and Damages Enhancement by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 21, 2012 1986 Declaration of Russell Winer in Support of 1982 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Winer Declaration in Support of Apple's Motion for a Permanent Injunction filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1982 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 21, 2012 1985 Declaration of Philip Schiller in Support of 1982 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Schiller Declaration in Support of Apple's Motion for Permanent Injunction filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Notice of Manual Filing, # 2 Attachment 1, # 3 Attachment 2, # 4 Attachment 3, # 5 Attachment 4, # 6 Attachment 5, # 7 Attachment 6, # 8 Attachment 7)(Related document(s) 1982 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 21, 2012 1984 Declaration of Christopher Crouse in Support of 1982 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Crouse Declaration in Support of Apple's Motion for Permanent Injunction filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1982 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 21, 2012 1983 Declaration of Jason Bartlett in Support of 1982 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Bartlett Declaration in Support of Apple's Motion for Permanent Injunction and Damages Enhancement filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4-1, # 5 Exhibit 4-2, # 6 Exhibit 4-3, # 7 Exhibit 4-4, # 8 Exhibit 4-5, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) 1982 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 9/21/2012) Modified on 9/24/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).*** TEXT MODIFIED PER FILERS REQUEST. ***
September 21, 2012 1982 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Public Version Apples Motion for a Permanent Injunction and for Damages Enhancements, # 2 Declaration Musika Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit 28, # 31 Exhibit 29, # 32 Exhibit 30, # 33 Exhibit 31, # 34 Exhibit 32, # 35 Exhibit 33, # 36 Exhibit 34, # 37 Exhibit 35, # 38 Exhibit 36, # 39 Exhibit 37, # 40 Exhibit 38, # 41 Exhibit 39, # 42 Exhibit 40, # 43 Exhibit 41, # 44 Exhibit 42, # 45 Exhibit 43, # 46 Exhibit 44, # 47 Exhibit 45, # 48 Exhibit 46, # 49 Exhibit 47, # 50 Exhibit 48, # 51 Exhibit 49, # 52 Exhibit 50, # 53 Exhibit 51, # 54 Exhibit 52, # 55 Exhibit 53, # 56 Exhibit 54, # 57 Exhibit 55, # 58 Exhibit 56, # 59 Exhibit 57, # 60 Exhibit 58, # 61 Exhibit 59, # 62 Exhibit 60, # 63 Exhibit 61, # 64 Exhibit 62, # 65 Exhibit 63, # 66 Exhibit 64, # 67 Exhibit 65, # 68 Exhibit 66, # 69 Exhibit 67, # 70 Exhibit 68, # 71 Declaration Robinson Declaration, # 72 Exhibit 1, # 73 Exhibit 2, # 74 Exhibit 3, # 75 Exhibit 4, # 76 Exhibit 5, # 77 Exhibit 6, # 78 Exhibit 7, # 79 Exhibit 8, # 80 Exhibit 9, # 81 Exhibit 10, # 82 Exhibit 11, # 83 Exhibit 12, # 84 Exhibit 13, # 85 Exhibit 14, # 86 Exhibit 15, # 87 Exhibit 16, # 88 Exhibit 17, # 89 Exhibit 18, # 90 Exhibit 19, # 91 Exhibit 20, # 92 Exhibit 21, # 93 Exhibit 22, # 94 Exhibit 23, # 95 Exhibit 24, # 96 Exhibit 25, # 97 Exhibit 26, # 98 Exhibit 27, # 99 Exhibit 28, # 100 Exhibit 29, # 101 Exhibit 30, # 102 Exhibit 31, # 103 Exhibit 32 Notice of Manual Filing, # 104 Exhibit 33 Notice of Manual Filing, # 105 Exhibit 34, # 106 Exhibit 35, # 107 Exhibit 36, # 108 Exhibit 37, # 109 Exhibit 38, # 110 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 21, 2012 1981 Brief Regarding Non-Jury Claims Including Waiver, Equitable Estoppel, Unclean Hands, and Unfair Competition re 1965 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Apple's Motion on Non-Jury Claims Including Waiver, Equitable Estoppel, Unclean Hands, and Unfair Competition)(Related document(s) 1965 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/21/2012) Modified text on 9/24/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2012 1980 Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Declaration of Christopher Kelley in Support of Samsung's Motion to Seal Exhibit 87, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Christopher Kelley in Support of Samsung's Motion to Seal Exhibit 87, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Christopher Kelley in Support of Samsung's Motion to Seal Exhibit 87, # 5 Declaration of Declaration of Christopher Kelley in Support of Samsung's Motion to Seal Exhibit FF, # 6 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Christopher Kelley in Support of Samsung's Motion to Seal Exhibit FF, # 7 Declaration of Melissa Dalziel, # 8 Exhibit A to Declaration of Melissa Dalziel, # 9 Exhibit B to Declaration of Melissa Dalziel, # 10 Exhibit C to Declaration of Melissa Dalziel)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 9/21/2012) Modified text on 9/24/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2012 1979 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 1907 , 1911 , 1912 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cyndi Wheeler in Support of Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 18, 2012 1978 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART APPLE'S AND SAMSUNG'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 602 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 637 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 642 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 643 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 707 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 715 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 736 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 737 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 754 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 758 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 759 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 18, 2012 1977 Manual Filing Notification of Excluded Exhibits and Demonstratives (PX41, PX49, PX50, PX64, PX66A, 66B, PX114, PX126, PX178, PDX23, PDX24, and Underlying Evid. for PX12, PX13, PX14) by Apple Inc. (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 9/18/2012) Modified on 9/19/2012 Exhibits in physical form submitted to the Clerk's Office ON 9/19/2012 marked as "Chambers Copies". No other copies submitted to the Clerk's Office for filing . (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2012 1976 Supplemental Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan in Support of Samsung's Proffer of Witness Testimony and Exhibits (Dkt. No. 1921) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1966 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 9/18/2012) Modified text on 9/19/2012 Exhibits to Declaration of Diane C. Hutnuan have not been received in the Clerk's Office for Manual Filing (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2012 1975 Objections and Responses Regarding (1) Exhibits to be Used with Richard Howarth, Andries Van Dam, Stephen Gray, Vincent O'Brien, and David Teese and (2) Designated Depositon Testimony of Shin Nishibori and Brian Agnetta and Exhibit P and R (Dkt. No 1735) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1966 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P, # 2 Exhibit R)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 9/18/2012) Modified text on 9/19/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2012 1974 Exhibit 9 to Samsung's Objections and Responses Regarding Exhibits and Deposition Designations Disclosed on August 14, 2012 (Dkt. No. 1760) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1966 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 9/18/2012) Modified text on 9/19/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2012 1973 NOTICE of Filing of Excluded Exhibits and Demonstrative by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 19, # 2 Exhibit 21, # 3 Exhibit 61, # 4 Exhibit 85, # 5 Exhibit 96, # 6 Exhibit 113, # 7 Exhibit 151, # 8 Exhibit 152, # 9 Exhibit 157, # 10 Exhibit 175, # 11 Exhibit 179, # 12 Exhibit 188, # 13 Exhibit 197, # 14 Exhibit 198, # 15 Exhibit 219, # 16 Exhibit 2040, # 17 Exhibit 2226, # 18 Exhibit 2321, # 19 Exhibit Closing Slide 37, # 20 Exhibit Closing Slide 45, # 21 Exhibit PDX14.4, # 22 Exhibit PDX14A.47, # 23 Exhibit PDX14A.48, # 24 Exhibit PDX14A.49, # 25 Exhibit PDX14A.50, # 26 Exhibit PDX14A.51, # 27 Exhibit PDX14A.52, # 28 Exhibit PDX20, # 29 Exhibit PDX21, # 30 Exhibit PDX22, # 31 Exhibit PDX28.17, # 32 Exhibit PDX28.25, # 33 Exhibit PDX28.27)(Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 9/18/2012) Modified text on 9/19/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2012 1972 Exhibits to Samsung's Corrected Notice of Filing of Excluded Exhibits (Dkt. No. 19180 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1966 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Exhibit 62, # 2 Corrected Exhibit 69, # 3 Corrected Exhibit 86, # 4 Corrected Exhibit 88)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 9/18/2012) Modified text on 9/19/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2012 1971 MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION for Exhibit 2 to Samsung's Notice of Filing of Excluded Closing Demonstrative (Dkt. No. 1919) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1966 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 9/18/2012) Modified on 9/19/2012 Exhibit has not been received in the Clerk's Office for manual filing (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2012 1970 Proffer of Witness Testimony and Exhibits by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1966 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal(Dkt. No. 1911) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing, # 2 Declaration of DIane Hutnyan in Support of Samsung's Proffer, # 3 Exhibit 1 to the Hutnyan Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to the Hutnyan Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to the Hutnyan Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 to the Hutnyan Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 to the Hutnyan Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 7 to the Hutnyan Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 8 to the Hutnyan Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 11 to the Hutnyan Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 12 to the Hutnyan Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 13 to the Hutnyan Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 15 to the Hutnyan Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 16 to the Hutnyan Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 17 to the Hutnyan Declaration, # 16 Declaration of Brett Arnold in Support of Samsung's Proffer, # 17 Exhibit B to the Arnold Declaration, # 18 Exhibit D to the Arnold Declaration, # 19 Exhibit E to the Arnold Declaration, # 20 Exhibit F to the Arnold Declaration, # 21 Exhibit G to the Arnold Declaration, # 22 Exhibit H to the Arnold Declaration, # 23 Exhibit I to the Arnold Declaration, # 24 Exhibit J to the Arnold Declaration, # 25 Exhibit K to the Arnold Declaration, # 26 Exhibit P to the Arnold Declaration, # 27 Exhibit U, V to the Arnold Declaration, # 28 Exhibit W to the Arnold Declaration, # 29 Exhibit X to the Arnold Declaration)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 9/18/2012) Modified text on 9/19/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2012 1969 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Dylan Proctor (Proctor, Brett) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 17, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing re 1968 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Hearing set for Thursday, September 20 is vacated. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 1968 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Denying Without Prejudice 1936 Motion to Dissolve the June 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction, and Issuing Indicative Ruling Pursuant to FRCP 62.1.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 14, 2012 1967 REPLY Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Further Support of Motion (re 1936 MOTION To Dissolve the June 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction ) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 9/14/2012) Modified on 9/17/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2012 1966 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 1684 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1711 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 1735 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1760 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1781 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1785 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1898 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1907 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1911 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 1912 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1914 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1918 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1919 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1921 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 1923 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 1925 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 12, 2012 1965 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part 1956 Motion Regarding Schedule for Briefing of Non-Jury Claims.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
September 10, 2012 1964 Declaration of Grant L. Kim in Support of 1963 Opposition to Motion To Dissolve Galaxy Tab 10.1 Preliminary Injunction filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 1963 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 9/10/2012) Modified text on 9/11/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2012 1963 OPPOSITION to ( 1936 MOTION To Dissolve Galaxy Tab 10.1 Preliminary Injunction ) filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 9/10/2012) Modified text on 9/11/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2012 1962 REPLY in Support of ( 1956 MOTION Regarding Schedule for Briefing of Non-Jury Claims ) filed by Apple Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/10/2012) Modified text on 9/11/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2012 1961 OPPOSITION to ( 1956 MOTION Regarding Schedule for Briefing of Non-Jury Claims ) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 9/9/2012) Modified text on 9/10/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2012 1960 NOTICE of Appearance by John Mark Pierce (Pierce, John) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 7, 2012 1959 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1755 Motion Clarification regarding Sealing Order (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 6, 2012 1958 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 1950 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
September 6, 2012 1957 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1954 Stipulation Re: Schedule for Enforcing Judgment and Certain Post-Verdict Filings.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
September 4, 2012 1956 MOTION Regarding Schedule for Briefing of Non-Jury Claims filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 9/18/2012. Replies due by 9/25/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
September 4, 2012 1955 REPLY Brief (re 1911 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Proffer of Witness Testimony and Exhibits ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 9/4/2012) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2012 1954 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR ENFORCING JUDGMENT AND CERTAIN POST-VERDICT FILINGS filed by Apple Inc.. (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 9/3/2012) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2012 1953 RESPONSE to ( 1941 MOTION for Stay of 1933 August 24, 2012 Damages Judgment Under Fed. R. Civ.P.62(b) ) Pending Resolution Of Post-Trial Motions filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/31/2012) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2012 1952 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION to ( 1950 MOTION for Leave to File Apples Motion For Leave To File Motion To Reconsider Symmetrical Schedule For Injunctive Relief ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/31/2012) Modified text on 9/4/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2012 1951 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan Identifying Samsung's Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 1924 the Court's August 24, 2012 Order filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 1924 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/30/2012) Modified text on 8/31/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2012 1950 MOTION for Leave to File Motion To Reconsider Symmetrical Schedule For Injunctive Relief filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/30/2012) Modified text on 8/31/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2012 1949 OBJECTIONS And Response To Samsungs Proffer Of Witness Testimony And Exhibits by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Decl Of Nathan Sabri In Support Of Apples Objections And Response To Samsungs Proffer Of Witness Testimony And Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/30/2012) Modified text on 8/31/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2012 1948 Supplemental Declaration Of Jason Bartlett In Support Of Apple Inc.s Petition For Attorneys Fees Pursuant To The Courts April 23 Order filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 8/30/2012) Modified text on 8/31/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2012 1947 Trial Exhibit Received on 8/29/2012 and placed in Exhibit Room.(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
August 29, 2012 1946 Featured Case CLARIFICATION ORDER Re: 1945 Order on Post-Trial Proceedings. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/29/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
August 28, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing re 1945 Order on Motion to Shorten Time, Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
August 28, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing re 1945 Order on Motion to Shorten Time, Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
August 28, 2012 1945 Featured Case ORDER RE: POST-TRIAL PROCEEDINGS by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1937 Motion to Shorten Time; granting 1942 Motion to Shorten Time (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
August 28, 2012 1944 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1880 Stipulation Dismissing Claims Without Prejudice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
August 28, 2012 1943 REPLY in Support of ( 1937 MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing Regarding Motion to Dissolve Tab 10.1 Injunction filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/28/2012) Modified text on 8/29/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2012 1942 MOTION to Shorten Time re 1941 Motion for Stay filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Victoria Maroulis, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/27/2012) Modified on 8/28/2012 linking entry to document #1941 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2012 1941 MOTION for Stay of 1933 August 24, 2012 Judgment Under Fed. R. Civ.P.62(b) Pending Resolution of Post-Trial Motions; Memornadum of Points and Authorities filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Responses due by 8/29/2012. Replies due by 8/30/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Stay)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/27/2012) Modified text on 8/28/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2012 1940 RESPONSE To The Courts August 24 Order Regarding Post-Trial Preliminary Injunction Filings by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/27/2012) Modified text on 8/28/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2012 1939 Certificate Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 10(B) by Apple Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/27/2012) Modified on 8/28/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2012 1938 OPPOSITION to ( 1937 Samsung's MOTION to Shorten Time for Samsung's Motion to Dissolve the June 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction ) filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/27/2012) Modified text on 8/28/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2012 1937 MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing re 1936 Samsung's Motion to Dissolve the June 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Victoria Maroulis in Support of Samsung's Motion to Shorten Time, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion to Shorten Time)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/26/2012) Modified on 8/27/2012 linking entry to document #1936 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2012 1936 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of MOTION To Dissolve the June 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Responses due by 8/28/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injunction)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/26/2012) Modified text on 8/27/2012 to conform with caption of document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2012 1935 Featured Case ORDER RE: AWARD OF FEES AND COSTS re 880, 906. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/26/2012.(psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2012).
August 24, 2012 1934 Featured Case ORDER Re: Post-Verdict Proceedings. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/24/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 24, 2012 1933 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Apple Inc. against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 24, 2012 1932 Minute Entry: Jury Trial completed on 8/24/2012 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/24/2012). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/24/2012)
August 24, 2012 1931 AMENDED JURY VERDICT. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 24, 2012 1930 JURY VERDICT. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 24, 2012 1929 Jury Note Number 1 (only question from jury during deliberations) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 24, 2012 1927 SAMSUNG'S REQUEST FOR THIRTY MINUTES TO REVIEW THE JURY VERDICT FORM BEFORE THE JURY IS DISMISSED FOR THE PURPOSE OF SEEKING CLARIFICATION OF POTENTIAL INCONSISTENT VERDICT IF NECESSARY by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/24/2012) Modified text on 8/24/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2012 1926 CLERKS NOTICE RE STATUS OF JURY DELIBERATIONS. The Jury informed the Court at 2:35 p.m. that they have reached a verdict which will be read in Courtroom 1 as soon as the parties can be assembled. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 24, 2012 1925 Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Melissa Daliziel in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Notice of Filing of Samsung's Published Demonstratives, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Notice of Manual Filing -- Exhibits B and D, # 6 Exhibit C)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/24/2012) Modified text on 8/27/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2012 1924 Featured Case ORDER RE: AWARD OF FEES AND COSTS re 1213 and 1275 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/24/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 24, 2012 1923 Administrative Motion to Seal Regarding Published Demonstratives filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 8/24/2012) Modified text on 8/27/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2012 1922 Apple's NOTICE Of Filing Of Published Demonstratives by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 8/24/2012) Modified text on 8/27/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2012 1921 Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Temporary Seal Until the Jury Completes Its Deliberations filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan, # 3 Exhibit 1A, # 4 Exhibit 1B, # 5 Exhibit 1C, # 6 Exhibit 10)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/24/2012) Modified text on 8/27/2012 to conform with caption of document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2012 1928 Minute Entry: Jury Deliberations held on 8/23/2012 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/23/2012). (Court Reporter not reported.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/23/2012)
August 23, 2012 1920 CLERKS NOTICE RE STATUS OF JURY DELIBERATIONS. The Jury ceased deliberations for the day at 5:32 PM and will resume deliberations Friday, August 24, 2012 at 9:00 AM. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 23, 2012 1919 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Notice of Filing of Excluded Closing Demonstratives filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Notice of Filing of Excluded Closing Demonstratives, # 3 Exhibit 1-6 (Under Seal))(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 23, 2012 1918 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected Notice of Filing of Excluded Exhibits filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Corrected Notice of Filing of Excluded Exhibits, # 3 Corrected Exhibits 60, 62, 69, 86, and 88 (Under Seal))(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 23, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE RE STATUS OF JURY DELIBERATIONS. The Jury has indicated they will deliberate until 5:30 p.m. today. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 22, 2012 1917 Minute Entry: Jury Deiberations (Day 1) held on 8/22/2012 before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (Date Filed: 8/22/2012). (not reported.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/22/2012)
August 22, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE RE STATUS OF JURY DELIBERATIONS. The Jury ceased deliberations for the day at 4:30 PM and will resume deliberations Thursday, August 23, 2012 at 9:00 AM. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 22, 2012 1915 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruchika Agrawal (Agrawal, Ruchika) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 22, 2012 1914 Administrative Motion To Seal Regarding Supplemental Filing Of Excluded Exhibits And Demonstratives filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Apples Supplemental Notice Of Filing Of Excluded Exhibits And Demonstratives, # 2 Exhibit PX2321, # 3 Closing Slide 37, # 4 Closing Slide 45, # 5 [Proposed] Order Granting Apples Motion To Seal Supplemental Filing Of Excluded Exhibits And Demonstratives)(Sabri, Nathaniel) (Filed on 8/22/2012) Modified text on 8/23/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2012 1913 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Bryan Sabri (Sabri, Nathaniel) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 21, 2012 1916 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 8/21/2012 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/21/2012). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge/Irene Rodriguez.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/21/2012)
August 21, 2012 1912 Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Samsung's Proffer of Witness Testimony and Exhibits filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified text on 8/22/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2012 1911 Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Temporary Seal Until The Jury Completes Its Deliberations filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Victoria Maroulis in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Samsung's Proffer of Witness Testimony and Exhibits (Under Seal), # 4 Declaration of Diane Hutnyan in Support of Samsung's Proffer (Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit 1-17 to the Hutnyan Declaration (Under Seal), # 6 Declaration of Brett Arnold in Support of Samsung's Proffer (Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit A-T to the Arnold Declaration (Under Seal), # 8 Exhibit U, V to the Arnold Declaration (Under Seal), # 9 Exhibit W, X to the Arnold Declaration (Under Seal))(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified text on 8/22/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2012 1910 APPLE'S NOTICE OF FILING OF EXCLUDED DEMONSTRATIVES by Apple Inc. (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified text on 8/22/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2012 1909 APPLE'S MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION OF EXCLUDED EXHIBITS (PX19, PX21, PX41, PX49, PX50, PX61, PX64, PX66A, 66B, PX85, PX96, PX113, PX114, PX126, PX151, PX152, PX175, PX178, PX179, PX188, PX197, PX198, PX219, PX2020, PX2226 AND UNDERLYING EVID. FOR PX12, PX13, PX14) by Apple Inc. (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified text on 8/22/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2012 1908 APPLE'S NOTICE OF FILING OF EXCLUDED EXHIBITS by Apple Inc. (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified text on 8/22/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2012 1907 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Regarding Excluded Exhibits filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified text on 8/22/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2012 1905 CORRECTED MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION for Exhibits to Samsung's Notice of Filing of Excluded Exhibits by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1899 Notice (Other), (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified text on 8/22/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2012 1904 APPLE'S NOTICE OF FILING OF JUROR NOTEBOOK by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified text on 8/22/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2012 1903 FINAL JURY INSTRUCTION. This document is identical to 1901 except that it includes Judge Koh's signature on the front page. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/21/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 21, 2012 1902 Featured Case ORDER Re: Provision of Lunch for Jury. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/21/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 21, 2012 1901 FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/21/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 21, 2012 1900 Featured Case ORDER Re: Changes to Final Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/21/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 21, 2012 1899 MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION FOR EXHIBITS TO SAMSUNG'S NOTICE OF FILING OF EXCLUDED EXHIBITS by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1898 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified text on 8/22/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2012 1898 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Notice of Filing of Excluded Evidence filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Samsung's Notice of Filing of Excluded Evidence, # 2 Exhibit 1-7, # 3 Exhibit 9-13, # 4 Exhibit 14-16, # 5 Exhibit 17-18, # 6 Exhibit 19-20, # 7 Exhibit 21, # 8 Exhibit 22, # 9 Exhibit 23-25, # 10 Exhibit 26, # 11 Exhibit 27, # 12 Exhibit 28, # 13 Exhibit 29, # 14 Exhibit 30-31, # 15 Exhibit 32 part 1, # 16 Exhibit 32 part 2, # 17 Exhibit 33, # 18 Exhibit 34, # 19 Exhibit 35, # 20 Exhibit 36, # 21 Exhibit 37-38, # 22 Exhibit 39, # 23 Exhibit 40-49, # 24 Exhibit 50, # 25 Exhibit 51, # 26 Exhibit 52, # 27 Exhibit 53, # 28 Exhibit 54-68, # 29 Exhibit 69-72, # 30 Exhibit 73, # 31 Exhibit 74-87, # 32 Exhibit 88-89, # 33 Exhibit 8)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified text on 8/22/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2012 1897 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 1865 Apple's Motion Regarding Closing Argument.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 21, 2012 1896 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLES OBJECTIONS TO SAMSUNGS CLOSING SLIDES. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/21/2012. (lhklc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 21, 2012 1895 Featured Case ORDER re 1872 Samsung's Objections to Apple's Closing Slides. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/21/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 21, 2012 1894 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 1392 Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge Re: Apple's Adverse Inference Motion; granting 1799 Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge Re: Samsung's Adverse Inference Motion. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 21, 2012 1893 FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/21/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 21, 2012 1892 Samsung's Comment on Revised Final Jury Instructions re 1883 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified on 8/22/2012 linking entry to document #1883 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2012 1891 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 1886 Stipulation Re: Direction to Jury Regarding Use of Internet on Devices in Evidence During Deliberations.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 21, 2012 1890 VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/21/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 21, 2012 1889 Reformatted Final Exhibit List. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/21/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 21, 2012 1888 JOINT NOTICE Regarding Equipment by Apple Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified text on 8/22/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2012 1887 NOTICE of Lodging Deposition Testimony by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified text on 8/22/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2012 1886 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Withdraw ECF No. 1834 and ECF No. 1837 and to Provide Substitute Direction to Jury Regarding Use of Internet on Devices In Evidence During Deliberations filed by Apple Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified on 8/22/2012 linking entry to document #1834 and 1837 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2012 1885 APPLE'S COMMENTS ON VERDICT FORM 1878 by Apple Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified on 8/22/2012 linking entry to document #1878 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1906 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 8/20/2012 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/20/2012). (Court Reporter Lee Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/20/2012)
August 20, 2012 1884 APPLE'S COMMENTS ON REVISED FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Apple Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1883 Featured Case ORDER Re: Revised Final Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/20/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 20, 2012 1882 Samsung's Comment Regarding Final Verdict Form by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1881 Featured Case ORDER RE: INDEFINITENESS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/20/2012. (lhklc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 20, 2012 1880 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Dismissing Claims Without Prejudice filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1879 Featured Case ORDER Re: 1853 Samsung's Motion to Correct Exhibit List; Final Exhibit List. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/20/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 20, 2012 1878 Verdict Form. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/20/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 20, 2012 1877 Notice Of Withdrawal Of Objection To Samsung Closing Demonstrative SDX5001.037 by Apple Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1876 Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion Regarding Samsung's Closing Argument ( re 1865 ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1875 APPLE'S RESPONSES TO SAMSUNG'S OBJECTIONS TO CLOSING DEMONSTRATIVES by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1874 Samsung's Responses Regarding Apple's Objections to Samsung's Opening Slides by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1873 Samsung's Proffer of Indefiniteness Argument During Closing by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1872 Samsung's Objections to Apple's Slides for Closing Argument by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1871 Apples Objections To Samsungs Closing Demonstratives by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1870 Featured Case ORDER Re: Tentative Verdict Form. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/20/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 20, 2012 1869 Corrected Joint Submission of Admitted Trial Exhibits by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1868 Featured Case ORDER Further Modifying Jury Instruction Hearing Time. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/20/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 20, 2012 1867 SAMSUNGS SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT REGARDING USE OF INTERNET ON DEVICES IN EVIDENCE DURING DELIBERATIONS by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1866 Apples Opposition To Samsungs Motion To Enforce Court Order & To Correct Admitted Exhibit List re 1853 Trial Brief filed by Apple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1853 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1865 MOTION Regarding Closing Argument filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 9/4/2012. Replies due by 9/11/2012. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1864 Featured Case ORDER Modifying Jury Instruction Hearing Time. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/20/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 20, 2012 1863 APPLE'S SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT REGARDING UPDATES AND PATCHES THAT RELATE TO ATTEMPTS TO DESIGN AROUND THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT re 1857 Statement, 1844 Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1862 SAMSUNGS RESPONSE TO ORDER REGARDING INFORMATION FOR DAMAGES INSTRUCTIONS re 1851 Order by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1861 APPLE'S STATEMENT AND RESPONSE REGARDING INFORMATION FOR DAMAGES INSTRUCTIONS re 1851 Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1860 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan in Support of 1859 Samsung's Objections To Tentative Final Jury Instructions filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 1859 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1859 OBJECTIONS to Tentative Final Jury Instructions by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1858 Samsung's RESPONSE to 1844 Order Re: Apple's Request For Direction To Jury Regarding Use Of Internet On Devices In Evidence During Deliberations by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1857 APPLE'S STATEMENT REGARDING UPDATES AND PATCHES THAT RELATE TO ATTEMPTS TO DESIGN AROUND THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT re 1844 Order by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1856 APPLE'S HIGH PRIORITY OBJECTIONS TO TENTATIVE FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS re 1814 Order by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1854 Notice of Manual Filing Re: Exhibits C-V to the Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan in Support of Motion to Enforce and Correct Admitted Exhibit List by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1853 MOTION to Enforce Court Order and Correct the Admitted Exhibit List by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified text on 8/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 1852 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Admitted Exhibits List. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/19/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 19, 2012 1851 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/19/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2012)
August 19, 2012 1850 NOTICE of Lodging of Deposition Testimony by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Samsung's Notice of Lodging Deposition Testimony, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Samsung's Notice of Lodging Deposition Testimony, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Samsung's Notice of Lodging Deposition Testimony, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Samsung's Notice of Lodging Deposition Testimony, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Samsung's Notice of Lodging Deposition Testimony, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Samsung's Notice of Lodging Deposition Testimony, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G to Samsung's Notice of Lodging Deposition Testimony, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H to Samsung's Notice of Lodging Deposition Testimony, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I to Samsung's Notice of Lodging Deposition Testimony, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J to Samsung's Notice of Lodging Deposition Testimony)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/19/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2012 1849 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Tentative Final Jury Instructions (Complete Set). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/19/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2012)
August 19, 2012 1848 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Tentative Final Jury Instructions - Part V (Trade Dress Damages and Adverse Inference Instructions). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/19/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2012)
August 19, 2012 1847 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Lodging Excluded Exhibits. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/19/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2012)
August 19, 2012 1846 High Priority Objections to Tentative Jury Instructions by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/19/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2012 1845 STATEMENT OF INSTRUCTIONS LIKELY TO BE SUBJECT OF APPLE'S HIGH PRIORITY OBJECTIONS re 1838 Order by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/19/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2012 1844 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Apple's Requested Jury Instruction on Internet Access of Devices. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/19/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2012)
August 19, 2012 1843 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08-17-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 8/19/2012)
August 19, 2012 1842 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08-16-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 8/19/2012)
August 19, 2012 1841 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08-15-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 8/19/2012)
August 19, 2012 1840 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08-14-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 8/19/2012)
August 19, 2012 1839 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08-13-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 8/19/2012)
August 19, 2012 1838 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Tentative Final Jury Instructions (Part IV). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/19/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2012)
August 19, 2012 1837 OPPOSITION to Apple's Request for Direction to Jury Regarding Use of Internet on Devices in Evidence During Deliberations 1835 Order, 1834 Notice by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/19/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2012 1836 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc J. Pernick (Pernick, Marc) (Filed on 8/19/2012)
August 19, 2012 1835 Featured Case ORDER Re: 1834 Apple's Request for Device Use Direction. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/19/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2012)
August 19, 2012 1834 REQUEST FOR DIRECTION TO JURY REGARDING USE OF INTERNET ON DEVICES IN EVIDENCE DURING DELIBERATIONS by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/19/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2012 1833 OPPOSITION to ( 1820 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [CORRECTED] ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/19/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2012 1832 OPPOSITION TO 1819 SAMSUNG'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/19/2012) Modified on 8/20/2012 linking entry to document #1819 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2012 1831 Samsung's Response to Question re Jury Instruction No. 23 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/19/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2012 1830 Statement re 1824 Order Concerning Jury Instruction on Equitable Estoppel by Apple Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/19/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2012 1829 JOINT SUBMISSION OF ADMITTED TRIAL EXHIBITS by Apple Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/19/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2012 1828 Tentative Final Jury Instructions - Part III (Trade Dress Instructions). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/18/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2012)
August 18, 2012 1827 Tentative Final Jury Instructions - Part II (Design Patent, Inducement, Willfulness, Breach of Contract, and Antitrust Instructions). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/18/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2012)
August 18, 2012 1826 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Jury Instructions Objection Procedure; Tentative Final Jury Instructions - Part I. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/18/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2012)
August 18, 2012 1825 JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING PROPOSED VERDICT FORM by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Apple's Proposed Verdict Form), # 2 Exhibit B (Samsung's Proposed Verdict Form))(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/18/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2012 1824 Question Regarding Joint Undisputed Jury Instruction 23. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/18/2012. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2012)
August 18, 2012 1823 Joint Statement Regarding Summary Chart Of Accused Samsung Products by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/18/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2012 1822 Redlined Version of Proposed Final Jury Instructions by Apple Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/18/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2012 1821 Redlined Version of its Proposed Final Jury Instructions re 1814 Order by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/18/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2012 1820 RULE 50(A) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [CORRECTED] filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 9/4/2012. Replies due by 9/11/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/18/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2012 1819 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/18/2012) Modified on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2012 1818 Statement of Apple's Evidence at Trial by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/18/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2012 1817 RULE 50(A) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 9/4/2012. Replies due by 9/11/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/18/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2012 1816 JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING CASE NARROWING by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/18/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2012 1815 APPLE'S STATEMENT RE IMPACT OF TRIAL EVIDENCE ON PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND VERDICT FORM by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/18/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2012 1855 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 8/17/2012 before Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/17/2012). Jury Trial set for 8/20/2012 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (Court Reporters: Lee-Anne Shortridge and Irene Rodriguez.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/17/2012)
August 17, 2012 1814 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Miscellaneous Issues. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/17/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 17, 2012 1813 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Samsung's Rule 50 Motion and Apple's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/17/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 17, 2012 1812 RESPONSE to 1797 First Set of Questions Regarding Proposed Jury Instructions by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/17/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2012 1811 RESPONSE to 1797 the Court's Questions Regarding Jury Instructions Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Marc J. Pernick In Support Of Apples Responses To The Courts Questions Regarding Jury Instructions, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2012 1810 Proposed Jury Instruction Regarding Indefiniteness by Apple Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2012 1809 SAMSUNGS STATEMENT AND PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTION REGARDING THE INDEFINITENESS OF THE TERM "SUBSTANTIALLY CENTERED" by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/17/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2012 1808 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Teece Objections. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/17/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 17, 2012 1807 JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING CLEANING AND RE-LABELING OF THE JOINT PHYSICAL EXHIBITS filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/17/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2012 1806 NOTICE of Appearance by Xavier Mark Brandwajn (Brandwajn, Xavier) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 17, 2012 1803 APPLE'S REPORT ON DISPUTED PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTION NOS. 36 AND 37, by Apple, Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2012 1802 JOINT SUBMISSION OF DEMONSTRATIVE EXHIBITS DISPLAYED TO THE JURY THROUGH AUGUST 15, 2012 by Apple, Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2012 1801 JOINT SUBMISSION OF ADMITTED EXHIBITS THROUGH AUGUST 15, 2012 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/17/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2012 1800 Offer of Evidence Regarding Jury Instructions Nos. 36 & 37 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/17/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2012 1799 MOTION re 1388 , 1792 for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge, or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Responses due by 8/18/2012. Replies due by 8/19/2012. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/17/2012) Modified text on 8/20/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2012 1805 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 8/16/2012 before Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/16/2012). (Court Reporters: Lee-Anne Shortridge and Irene Rodriguez.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/16/2012)
August 16, 2012 1798 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Objections. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/16/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 16, 2012 1797 Questions for the Parties Regarding Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/16/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 16, 2012 1796 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Rule 50 Motions; Order Regarding Apple's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/16/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 16, 2012 1795 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Miscellaneous Issues. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/16/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 16, 2012 1794 Opposition to Apple's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/16/2012) Modified text on 8/17/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2012 1793 Brief In Support Of Judgment As A Matter Of Law Regarding Fidler Tablet filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/16/2012) Modified text on 8/17/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2012 1792 Featured Case ORDER RE: 1388 DENYING MOTION FOR ADVERSE INFERENCE by Judge Paul S. Grewal (psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012).
August 16, 2012 1791 Featured Case ORDER RE: ATTORNEY ADMISSION. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/16/2012.(psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 16, 2012 1790 August 16, 2012 Rolling List of Witnesses by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/16/2012) Modified text on 8/17/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2012 1789 AUGUST 16, 2012 ROLLING LIST OF WITNESSES by Apple Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/16/2012) Modified text on 8/17/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2012 1788 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos regarding 1760 Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal by Apple Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/16/2012) Modified text on 8/17/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2012 1787 NOTICE of Appearance by James A Daire (Daire, James) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 16, 2012 1786 Declaration of JASON R. BARTLETT Support of 1782 Objections and Responses to Objections re: Teece, Ahn, Donaldson, Kim Knightly, Lee, Musika, Ordover, Rosenbrock, Rossi, Teksler, Walker, Agnetta, Balakrishnan, Bressler, Hong, Kare, Singh, Stringer, and Yeo filed by Apple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1782 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/16/2012) Modified text on 8/17/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2012 1785 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 16, 2012 1784 Declaration of RICHARD S.J. HUNG in Support of 1782 Objections and Responses to Objections re: Teece, Ahn, Donaldson, Kim Knightly, Lee, Musika, Ordover, Rosenbrock, Rossi, Teksler, Walker, Agnetta, Balakrishnan, Bressler, Hong, Kare, Singh, Stringer, and Yeo , filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Errata 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23)(Related document(s) 1782 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/16/2012) Modified text on 8/17/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2012 1783 Declaration of Peter Kolovos in Support of 1782 Objections and Responses to Objections filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) 1782 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/16/2012) Modified text on 8/17/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2012 1782 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO OBJECTIONS RE: TEECE, AHN, DONALDSON, KIM, KNIGHTLY, LEE, MUSIKA, ORDOVER, ROSENBROCK, ROSSI, TEKSLER, WALKER, AGNETTA, BALAKRISHNAN, BRESSLER, HONG, KARE, SINGH, STRINGER, AND YEO by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/16/2012) Modified text on 8/17/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2012 1781 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Objections and Responses Regarding Exhibits and Deposition Designations Disclosed on August 15, 2012 filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Samsung's Objections and Responses, # 2 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Declaration of Curran M. Walker, # 15 Exhibit 1, # 16 Exhibit 2, # 17 Exhibit 3, # 18 Exhibit 4, # 19 Exhibit 5, # 20 Exhibit 6, # 21 Exhibit 7, # 22 Exhibit 8, # 23 Exhibit 9, # 24 Exhibit 10, # 25 Exhibit 11, # 26 Exhibit 12, # 27 Exhibit 13, # 28 Exhibit 14, # 29 Exhibit 15, # 30 Exhibit 16, # 31 Exhibit 17, # 32 Exhibit 18, # 33 Exhibit 19, # 34 Exhibit 20, # 35 Exhibit 21, # 36 Exhibit 22, # 37 Exhibit 23)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/16/2012) Modified text on 8/17/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2012 1780 JOINT SUBMISSION of Demonstrative Exhibits Displayed to the Jury Through August 14, 2012 by Apple Inc. (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 8/16/2012) Modified text on 8/17/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2012 1779 Samsung's Proffer of Testimony of Michael Wagner Regarding Hypothetical Design Around Costs by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joby Martin, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/16/2012) Modified text on 8/17/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2012 1778 Joint Submission of Admitted Exhibits at Trial Through August 14 2012 by Apple Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/16/2012) Modified text on 8/17/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2012 1804 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 8/15/2012 before Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/15/2012). (Court Reporters: Lee-Anne Shortridge and Irene Rodriguez.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/15/2012)
August 15, 2012 1777 Proposed Redactions to Trial Exhibits DX 630 and DX 631 Pursuant to the Court's Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motions to Seal by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/15/2012) Modified text on 8/16/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2012 1776 Samsung's Second Amended August 5, 2012 Rolling List of Witnesses by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/15/2012) Modified text on 8/16/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2012 1775 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Miscellaneous Issues. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/15/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
August 15, 2012 1774 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Objections; ORDER Regarding Samsung's Motion to Exclude. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/15/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
August 15, 2012 1773 Samsung's Amended August 15, 2012 Rolling List of Witnesses by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/15/2012) Modified text on 8/16/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2012 1772 Samsung's August 15, 2012 Rolling List of Witnesses by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/15/2012) Modified text on 8/16/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2012 1771 Status Update Regarding Sealed Licensing Terms by Non-Parties Nokia Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, International Business Machines Corporation, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation and Siemens AG, filed by Nokia Corporation (Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/15/2012) Modified text on 8/16/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2012 1770 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of 1735 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Objections and Responses filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1735 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
August 15, 2012 1769 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Bovich on behalf of Non-Party Siemens AG (Bovich, John) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
August 15, 2012 1768 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Robert Lange (Lange, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
August 15, 2012 1767 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Hutnyan NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CURRAN M. WALKER (Hutnyan, Diane) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
August 15, 2012 1766 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Hutnyan NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF KARA M. BORDEN (Hutnyan, Diane) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
August 15, 2012 1765 Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Untimely Disclosed Testimony of Greg Chapman, Emilie Kim and Sony Keeper of Records by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/15/2012) Modified text on 8/16/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2012 1764 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Liu (Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
August 15, 2012 1763 Opposition to Samsungs Motion to Exclude Untimely Undisclosed Testimony of Greg Chapman, Emilie Kim and Sony Keeper of Records by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Peter Kolovos, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/15/2012) Modified text on 8/16/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2012 1761 Statement in Response to 1649 1714 Court's Order on Sealing by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Ltd.. (Lange, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/15/2012) Modified text on 8/16/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2012 1760 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Objections and Responses Regarding Exhibits and Deposition Designations Disclosed On August 14, 2012 filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Samsung's Objections and Responses, # 2 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/15/2012) Modified text on 8/16/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2012 1759 Declaration of JASON R. BARTLETT in Support of 1756 Objections and Responses to Objections Regarding Trial Exhibits and Depositon Designations Disclosed on August 14, 2012 filed by Apple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1756 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/15/2012) Modified text on 8/16/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2012 1758 Declaration of Peter Kolovos in Support of 1756 Objections and Responses to Objections filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28)(Related document(s) 1756 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/15/2012) Modified text on 8/16/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2012 1757 Declaration of RICHARD S.J. HUNG in Support of 1756 Objections and Responses to objections re: Trial Exhibits and Deposition Designations Disclosed on August 14, 2012 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Related document(s) 1756 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/15/2012) Modified text on 8/16/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2012 1756 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO OBJECTIONS RE: TRIAL EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS DISCLOSED ON AUGUST 14, 2012 by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/15/2012) Modified text on 8/16/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2012 1755 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's Order on Motions to Seal re 1649 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Intel Corporation. Responses due by 8/29/2012. Replies due by 9/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Kelley in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kelley, Christopher) (Filed on 8/15/2012) Modified text on 8/16/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2012 1754 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 1696 Motion to Stay; granting in part and denying in part 1723 Motion to Stay (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
August 15, 2012 1753 Joint Submission Of Demonstrative Exhibits Displayed To The Jury Through August 13, 2012 by Apple Inc. (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 8/15/2012) Modified text on 8/16/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2012 1752 Joint Submission of Admitted Exhibits Through August 13, 2012 by Apple Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/15/2012) Modified text on 8/16/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2012 1751 Revised August 14, 2012 Rolling List of Witness by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/15/2012) Modified text on 8/16/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2012 1762 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 8/14/2012 before Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/14/2012). (Court Reporters: Lee-Anne Shortridge and Irene Rodriguez.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/14/2012)
August 14, 2012 1750 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Miscellaneous Issues. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/14/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 14, 2012 1749 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Objections. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/14/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 14, 2012 1748 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals as to 1697 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit. Filing fee $ 455 paid. Appeal Record due by 9/12/2012. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012) (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2012 1747 MOTION to Exclude Untimely Undisclosed Testimony of Greg Chapman, Emilie Kim and Sony Keeper of Records by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Filed on 8/14/2012) Modified on 8/15/2012 incorrect event type selected when posting document (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2012 1746 Proposed Redactions to Trial Exhibit PX78 Pursuant to the Court's Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motions to Seal by Apple Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/14/2012) Modified text on 8/15/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2012 1745 Witness List by Apple Inc. Rolling List of Witnesses. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 14, 2012 1744 Witness List by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC August 14, 2012 Rolling List of Witnesses. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 14, 2012 1743 DECLARATION of Deok Keun Matthew Ahn in Opposition to 1740 Supplemental Response to Objections regarding Andres Van Dam filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 1740 ) (Ahn, Deok Keun) (Filed on 8/14/2012) Modified text on 8/15/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2012 1742 NOTICE re 711 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES REGARDING JINSOO KIM, JEEYUEN WANG, ROGER FIDLER, ITAY SHERMAN, SAMUEL LUCENTE AND MICHAEL KAMINS bu Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/14/2012) Modified text on 8/15/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2012 1741 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos in Support of 1684 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits U, V, W, X, Y, BB, and FF To The Declaration Of Diane C. Hutnyan (Docket Nos. 1681-1682) filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1684 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 14, 2012 1740 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE to 1731 Objections, 1735 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Objections and Responses Regarding Andries van Dam by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/14/2012) Modified text on 8/15/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2012 1739 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Thane Bauz Special Appearance on Behalf of Sony Mobile Communications USA, Inc. (Bauz, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 14, 2012 1738 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn Regarding Stipulated Amendment to the Protective Order Regarding Intel Code Production by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/14/2012) Modified text on 8/15/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2012 1737 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals as to 1722 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit. Filing fee $ 455 paid. Appeal Record due by 9/12/2012. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 14, 2012 1736 Declaration of JASON R. BARTLETT in Support of 1731 Objections and Responses to Objections Regarding Vincent O'Brien, David Teece, Stephen Gray, Andries Van Dam, Bryan Agnetta, Richard Howarth, and Shin Nishibori filed by Apple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1731 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/14/2012) Modified text on 8/15/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2012 1735 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Objections and Responses filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Samsung's Objections and Responses, # 2 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit W, # 26 Exhibit X)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/14/2012) Modified on 8/15/2012 Exhibit K Has Not Been Submitted to the Clerk's Office for Manual Filing (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2012 1734 Declaration of S. CALVIN WALDEN in Support of 1731 Objections and Responses to Objections Regarding Vincent O'Brien, David Teece, Stephen Gray, Andries Van Dam, Bryan Agnetta, Richard Howarth, and Shim Nishibori filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 1731 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/14/2012) Modified text on 8/15/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2012 1733 Declaration of RICHARD S.J. HUNG in Support of 1731 Objections and Responses Regarding Vincent O'Brien, David Teece, Stephen Gray, Andries Van Dam, Bryan Agnetta, Richard Howarth and Shin Nishibori filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17)(Related document(s) 1731 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/14/2012) Modified text on 8/15/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2012 1732 Declaration of Sam Stake in Support of 1730 Proffer of Testimony Regarding Woodward Yang filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 1730 ) (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 8/14/2012) Modified text on 8/15/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2012 1731 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO OBJECTIONS REGARDING VINCENT OBRIEN, DAVID TEECE, STEPHEN GRAY, ANDRIES VAN DAM, BRYAN AGNETTA, RICHARD HOWARTH, AND SHIN NISHIBORI by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/14/2012) Modified text on 8/15/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2012 1730 Proffer of Testimony of Wpoodward Yang by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/14/2012) Modified text on 8/15/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2012 1727 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E Mack (Mack, Brian) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 14, 2012 1726 Proposed Redactions to Trial Exhibits PX67, PX76 and DX630 Pursuant to the Court's Order Granting in Part and Denying in Par Motions to Seal by Apple Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/14/2012) Modified on 8/15/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2012 1725 Joint Submission of Demonstrative Exhibits Displayed to the Jury on August 10, 2012 by Apple Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/14/2012) Modified text on 8/15/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2012 1724 Joint Submission of List of Admitted Exhibit List Through August 10, 2012 by Apple Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/14/2012) Modified text on 8/15/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2012 1723 MOTION to Stay and Suspend 1256 July 17, 2012 and 1649 August 9, 2012 Orders Pending Appeal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Responses due by 8/28/2012. Replies due by 9/4/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/14/2012) Modified text on 8/14/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2012 1729 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 8/13/2012 before Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/13/2012). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1728 EFILED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE DOCKET NO. 1729 *** Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 8/13/2012 before Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/13/2012). (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/13/2012) Modified on 8/14/2012 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2012 1722 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0971-7044477. Appeal Record due by 9/12/2012. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1721 Featured Case ORDER denying 1692 Samsung's Motion to Exclude Examination and Comment on Absent Witnesses. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/13/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1720 Featured Case ORDER re 1703 Samsung's Objections and 1707 Apple's Objections re Kim, Wang, Lucente, Sherman, Kamins, and Fidler. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/13/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1719 Proposed Order re 1696 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of Dkt. 1649 and Dkt. 1256 by Apple Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1718 Witness List by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Amended August 13, 2012 Rolling List of Witnesses. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1717 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Evidentiary Objections and Sealing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/13/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1716 Witness List by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC SAMSUNGS AUGUST 13, 2012 ROLLING LIST OF WITNESSES. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1715 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Objections to Williams's Exhibits. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/13/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1714 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Motion to Clarify by Judge Lucy H. Koh 1686 (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1713 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Samsung's Rule 50 Motion. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/13/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1712 TRIAL BRIEF Apple Inc.s Opposition to Samsungs Motion to Exclude Examination and Comment on Absent Witnesses 1692 by Apple Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1711 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES REGARDING JINSOO KIM, JEEYUEN WANG, ROGER FIDLER, ITAY SHERMAN, SAMUEL LUCENTE AND MICHAEL KAMINS filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1710 EXHIBITS re 1705 Declaration in Support,, PUBLIC EXHIBIT 11 filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1705 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1709 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1706 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1708 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1701 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1707 CORRECTED OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO OBJECTIONS REGARDING JIN SOO KIM, JEEYUEN WANG, ROGER FIDLER, ITAY SHERMAN, SAMUEL LUCENTE, AND MICHAEL KAMINS re 1704 Objection by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/13/2012) Modified on 8/14/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2012 1706 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice FOR ROBERT WILSON ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7042666.) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1705 Declaration of RICHARD S.J. HUNG in Support of 1704 Objection filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21)(Related document(s) 1704 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1704 OBJECTIONS to APPLE'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO OBJECTIONS REGARDING JIN SOO KIM, JEEYUEN WANG, HYOUNG SHIN PARK, ROGER FIDLER, ITAY SHERMAN, SAMUELLUCENTE, AND MICHAEL KAMINS by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1703 OBJECTIONS and Responses Re: (1) Exhibits to be Used with Jinsoo Kim, Jeeyeun Wang, Samuel Lucente, Itay Sherman and Michael Kamins, and (2) Deposition Designations of Roger Fidler by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan, # 2 Exhibit A Part 1, # 3 Exhibit A Part 2, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Filed on 8/13/2012) Modified text on 8/14/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2012 1700 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1672 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1699 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1689 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1697 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit by Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0971-7041383. Appeal Record due by 9/12/2012. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1696 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of Dkt. 1649 and Dkt. 1256 filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 8/27/2012. Replies due by 9/4/2012. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1695 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08-10-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1694 Proposed Jury Instructions by Apple Inc. REVISED (DISPUTED) JOINT PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS FOR AFTER THE CLOSE OF EVIDENCE. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1693 Proposed Jury Instructions by Apple Inc. REVISED (UNDISPUTED) JOINT PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS FOR AFTER THE CLOSE OF EVIDENCE. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 1692 SAMSUNGS MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXAMINATION AND COMMENT ON ABSENT WITNESSES by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/13/2012) Modified on 8/14/2012 counsel posted document using incorrect event type (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2012 1691 PROPOSED REDACTIONS TO TRIAL EXHIBIT PX25A1 PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART MOTIONS TO SEAL by Apple Inc. (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 8/13/2012) Modified text on 8/14/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2012 1690 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Objections; granting 1647 Motion to Exclude Testimony by Judge Lucy H. Koh (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2012)
August 12, 2012 1689 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice FOR ALAN L. WHITEHURST ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7041236.) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/12/2012)
August 12, 2012 1688 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa N Chan (Chan, Melissa) (Filed on 8/12/2012)
August 12, 2012 1687 Witness List by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Samsung's August 12, 2012 Rolling List of Witnesses. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/12/2012)
August 12, 2012 1686 MOTION Clarification re 1649 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Ltd.. Responses due by 8/27/2012. Replies due by 9/4/2012. (Lange, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/12/2012)
August 12, 2012 1685 Declaration of RICHARD HUNG in Support of 1683 Objections and Responses Regarding Terry Musika, Markus Paltian, Andre Zorn, Time Williams, Benjamin Bederson, Adam Bogue, Clifton Forlines, and Woodward Yang filed by Apple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1683 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/12/2012) Modified text on 8/13/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2012 1684 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits U, V, W, X, Y, BB, and FF To The Declaration Of Diane C. Hutnyan (Docket Nos. 1681-1682) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/12/2012)
August 12, 2012 1683 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO OBJECTIONS REGARDING TERRY MUSIKA, MARKUS PALTIAN, ANDRE ZORN, TIM WILLIAMS, BENJAMIN BEDERSON, ADAM BOGUE, CLIFTON FORLINES, AND WOODWARD YANG by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/12/2012) Modified tet on 8/13/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2012 1682 EXHIBITS re 1681 Declaration in Support,,, 1678 Objection, Exhibits AA-HH to Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan In Support of Samsung's Objections and Responses Regarding (1) Exhibits To Be Used With Musika, Bogue, Forlines, Bederson, Williams, Zorn, Paltian, Yang, and (2) Designated Deposition Testimony of Paltian and Zorn filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BB, # 2 Exhibit CC, # 3 Exhibit DD, # 4 Exhibit EE, # 5 Exhibit FF, # 6 Exhibit GG, # 7 Exhibit HH)(Related document(s) 1681 , 1678 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/12/2012)
August 12, 2012 1681 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan in Support of 1678 Objection, Samsung's Objections and Responses Regarding (1) Exhibits To Be Used With Musika, Bogue, Forlines, Bederson, Williams, Zorn, Paltian, Yang, and (2) Designated Deposition Testimony of Paltian and Zorn filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z)(Related document(s) 1678 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/12/2012)
August 12, 2012 1680 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Advertisements of iPhone and iPad. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/12/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2012)
August 12, 2012 1679 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/12/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2012)
August 12, 2012 1678 Samsung's Objections and Responses Regarding (1) Exhibits To Be Used With Musika, Bogue, Forlines, Bederson, Williams, Zorn, Paltian, Yang and (2) Designated Deposition Testimony of Paltian and Zorn by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/12/2012) Modified text on 8/13/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2012 1677 Declaration of JASON R. BARTLETT in Support of 1676 Apple's MOTION to Exclude Samsung Witness Testimony filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 1676 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/11/2012) Modified text on 8/13/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2012 1676 REPLY (re 1647 MOTION To Exclude Samsung Witness Testimony ) APPLE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE SAMSUNG WITNESS TESTIMONY filed byApple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/11/2012)
August 11, 2012 1675 JOINT SUBMISSION OF DEMONSTRATIVE EXHIBITS DISPLAYED TO THE JURY THROUGH AUGUST 7, 2012 by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/11/2012) Modified on 8/13/2012 EXHBIT D AND F HAVE NOT BEEN MANUALLY SUBMITTED TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE FOR FILING (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2012 1674 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Yeh-Kai Tung (Tung, Mark) (Filed on 8/11/2012)
August 11, 2012 1673 Proposed Order GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR JOSEPH MILOWIC III by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/11/2012)
August 11, 2012 1672 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice FOR JOSEPH MILOWIC III ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7041072.) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/11/2012)
August 11, 2012 1671 Witness List by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Samsung's August 11, 2012 Rolling List of Witnesses. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/11/2012)
August 10, 2012 1702 Proposed Order re 1701 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 54611012377) Filing fee previously paid on 8/10/2012 by Apple Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 1701 MOTION of Michael R. Heyison for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 54611012377) Filing fee previously paid on 8/10/2012 filed by Apple Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 1698 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 8/10/2012 before Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/10/2012). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 1670 RESPONSE to 1669 Apple's Statement Regarding Jury Instructions by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas R. Watson)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/10/2012) Modified text on 8/13/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2012 1669 Report Regarding Efforts to Meet and Confer on Final Jury Instructions by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Marc J. Pernick, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2012) Modified text on 8/13/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2012 1668 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Musika Objections. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/10/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 1667 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 1640 Motion ; denying 1653 Motion (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 1666 RESPONSE to re 1602 Statement Samung's Response to Apple's Offer of Proof re Evidence of its iPhone and iPad Advertisements by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 1665 Featured Case ORDER Re: Objections to John Hauser. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/10/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 1664 OPPOSITION to ( 1647 MOTION To Exclude Samsung Witness Testimony filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/10/2012) Modified text on 8/13/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2012 1663 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Edward Stretch (Stretch, Christopher) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 1662 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Objections to Sittler and Benner. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/10/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 1661 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Hutnyan (Hutnyan, Diane) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 1660 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1645 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 1659 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Tully Scott Notice of Appearance by William F. Abrams (Scott, Timothy) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 1657 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER Regarding Objections to Singh, Teksler Lee, and Chang Exhibits and Deposition Designations. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/10/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012) Modified text on 8/13/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2012 1656 OPPOSITION to ( 1640 APPLE'S REQUEST FOR AN INTERIM JURY INSTRUCTION REGARDING LIKELIHOOD OF CONFUSION ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/10/2012) Modified text on 8/13/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2012 1655 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 1650 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Apples Proffer Regarding Expected Testimony of Boris Teksler and PX52 (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 1654 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Apples Proposed Redactions To Trial Exhibits PX25A, PX25C, And PX182 Pursuant To The Courts Order Granting-In-Part And Denying-In-Part Motions To Seal (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 1653 MOTION Requesting Court Order that the Parties Label Joint Exhibit Devices in a Manner Not Obscuring Trade Dress filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Responses due by 8/24/2012. Replies due by 8/31/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anne Abramowitz in Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion to Label Joint Exhibit Devices in a Manner Not Obscuring Trade Dress, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 1652 Declaration of Deok Keun Matthew Ahn Regarding Removal and Replacement of Exhibit Stickers filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Photographs)(Ahn, Deok Keun) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 9, 2012 1651 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1614 Motion for Leave to File (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 1650 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Objections by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 1607 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1628 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 1649 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Sealing Motions by Judge Lucy H. Koh (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 1648 Declaration of Jason R. Bartlett in Support of 1647 MOTION To Exclude Samsung Witness Testimony filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 1647 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 1647 MOTION To Exclude Samsung Witness Testimony filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 8/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 1646 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1617 Motion for Leave to File (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 1645 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark S. Petersen, # 2 Proposed Order)(Scott, Timothy) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 1644 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Apple Inc.s Motion Regarding Sealing Issues for Testimony of Boris Teksler (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/9/2012) Modified on 8/10/2012 COUNSEL POSTED DOCUMENT INCORRECTLY AS A NOTICE (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2012 1643 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria F. Maroulis NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ALBERT P. BEDECARRE (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 1642 Exhibit List ADMITTED EXHIBIT LIST AS OF AUGUST 9, 2012 by Apple Inc... (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 1641 EXHIBITS re 1640 MOTION APPLE'S REQUEST FOR AN INTERIM JURY INSTRUCTION REGARDING LIKELIHOOD OF CONFUSION (Proposed Interim Instruction) filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1640 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 1640 MOTION APPLE'S REQUEST FOR AN INTERIM JURY INSTRUCTION REGARDING LIKELIHOOD OF CONFUSION filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 8/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1*** ATTACHMENT 1 FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. *** Proposed Interim Jury Instruction)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/9/2012) Modified on 8/9/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2012 1639 OBJECTIONS to Apples Objections And Responses To Objections Regarding Proposed Examination Materials For Terry Musika, John Hauser, And Edward Sittler And Deposition Designations For Dong Hoon Chang, Junwon Lee, And Tim Benner by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Richard Hung In Support Of Apples Objections And Responses Re Hauser, Musika, And Deposition Examination Materials, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 1638 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Siemens AG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration James Daire Declaration (Exhibits A & B), # 2 Declaration Frank Nuzzi Declaration (Exhibit A), # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Daire, James) (Filed on 8/9/2012) Modified on 8/10/2012 pursuant to General Order No. 62, attachment #1 and #2 sealed (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2012 1637 OBJECTIONS to Samsung's Objections and Responses Regarding (1) Exhibits To Be Used With John Hauser, Terry Musika and Edward Sittler and (2) Designated Deposition Testimony of Tim Benner, Dong Hoon Chang, and Jun Won Lee by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 1636 Declaration of SUSAN R. ESTRICH IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S AUGUST 8, 2012 ORDER filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 1635 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Leonard Robinson (Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 1634 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Chung-Hoi Ho (Ho, Francis) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 1633 NOTICE of Appearance by Taryn Spelliscy Rawson (Rawson, Taryn) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 1632 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Barquist (Barquist, Charles) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 1631 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Rachel Estrich (Estrich, Susan) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 1630 Joinder to 1613 Objection to the Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding a Procedure for Reducing the Number of Sealing Requests, by Koninklijki Philips Electronics N.V.. (Ma, Gary) (Filed on 8/9/2012) Modified text on 8/10/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2012 1629 RESPONSE to re 1625 Objection, 1613 Objection, APPLE'S RESPONSE TO THIRD PARTIES' OBJECTIONS TO THE PARTIES' STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING A PROCEDURE FOR REDUCING THE NUMBER OF SEALING REQUESTS by Apple Inc.. (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 8, 2012 1628 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Samsung's Objections and Responses Regarding Exhibits to Be Used With Boris Teksler, # 2 Declaration of Diane Hutnyan)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 8, 2012 1627 Apple's OBJECTIONS and RESPONSES to 1628 Objections Regarding Proposed Examination Materials for Boris Teksler by Apple Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/8/2012) Modified on 8/9/2012 linking entry to document #1628 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2012 1626 RESPONSE to re 1625 Objection, 1613 Objection, Response to Third-Party Objections to Stipulation re Procedure for Reducing Sealing Requests by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 8, 2012 1625 OBJECTIONS to re 1597 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING A PROCEDURE FOR REDUCING THE NUMBER OF SEALING REQUESTS by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 8, 2012 1624 Witness List by Apple Inc. APPLE'S AUGUST 8, 2012 ROLLING LIST OF WITNESSES. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 8, 2012 1623 Featured Case ORDER re 1604 ATTORNEY ADMISSION. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/8/2012. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012).
August 8, 2012 1622 REQUEST for a Joint Hearing on Apple's Motion for Adverse Inference Instruction against Samsung and Samsung's Motion for Adverse Inference Instruction against Apple by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/8/2012) Modified text on 8/9/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2012 1621 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/07/2012, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/6/2012. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 8, 2012 1620 Featured Case ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/8/12. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 8, 2012 1619 MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION OF EXHIBITS A, B AND C TO 1618 THE DECLARATION OF CHARLES S. BARQUIST IN SUPPORT OF APPLES OFFER OF PROOF REGARDING EVIDENCE OF ITS IPHONE AND IPAD ADVERTISEMENTS by Apple Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/8/2012) Modified on 8/9/2012 EXHIBITS A,B AND C HAVE NOT BEEN MANUALLY SUBMITTED TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE FOR FILING (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2012 1618 Declaration of CHARLES S. BARQUIST IN SUPPORT OF 1602 APPLE'S OFFER OF PROOF REGARDING EVIDENCE OF ITS IPHONE AND IPAD ADVERTISEMENTS filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/8/2012) Modified on 8/9/2012 linking entry to document #1602 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2012 1617 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Third-Party Intervenor Reuters America LLC's Opposition to Motion to Seal Trial and Pretrial Evidence filed by Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 8, 2012 1616 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1609 Motion for Leave to File (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 8, 2012 1615 Joinder InterDigital's Joinder in Third Party Replies to Reuters' Supplemental Opposition to Third Party Motions to Seal by InterDigital Communications LLC, InterDigital Technology Corporation. (Cacovean, Corina) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 8, 2012 1614 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Samsung's Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge, In the Alternative, Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Sur-Reply to Samsung's Motion)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 8, 2012 1613 OBJECTIONS to re 1597 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING A PROCEDURE FOR REDUCING THE NUMBER OF SEALING REQUESTS by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Ltd.. (Lange, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 7, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing re 1658 Jury Trial - Held (restoring dates to calendar--somehow get vacated when minutes docketed) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 7, 2012 1658 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 8/7/2012 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/7/2012). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge/Irene Rodriguez.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/7/2012)
August 7, 2012 1612 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08-07-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 7, 2012 1611 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08-06-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 7, 2012 1610 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08-03-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 7, 2012 1609 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Reuters America LLC's Supplemental Opposition to Motions to Seal Trial and Pretrial Evidence filed by Nokia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven D. Hemminger, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hemminger, Steven) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 7, 2012 1608 OBJECTIONS to Samsung's Objections and Responses Regarding Exhibits To Be Used With Karan Singh by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan, # 2 Exhibit A)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 7, 2012 1607 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Re Apple's Objections and Responses Re Singh Examination Materials filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 APPLE'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO OBJECTIONS REGARDING PROPOSED EXAMINATION MATERIALS FOR KARAN SINGH, # 2 Declaration OF JASON BARTLETT, # 3 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 7, 2012 1606 REPLY in Support of ( 1488 MOTION to Seal Trial Exhibits 1490 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Renewed Motion to Seal Dkt. Nos. 927, 991, 1013, 1022, 1060, 1206 ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/7/2012) Modified text on 8/8/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2012 1605 REPLY in Support of ( 1400 Emergency Motion by Non-Party Motorola Mobility LLC to Seal Exhibits, Close Courtroom and Seal Portions of Transcript ) filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/7/2012) Modified text on 8/8/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2012 1604 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/7/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 8/7/2012) re 1388 MOTION Adverse Inference Jury Instruction filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and 1402 MOTION to Strike 1388 MOTION Adverse Inference Jury Instruction APPLE'S MOTION TO STRIKE SAMSUNG'S UNTIMELY MOTION FOR ADVERSE INFERENCE INSTRUCTION filed by Apple Inc. The Court takes matters under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/7/2012)
August 7, 2012 1602 Statement APPLE'S OFFER OF PROOF REGARDING EVIDENCE OF ITS IPHONE AND IPAD ADVERTISEMENTS by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 7, 2012 1601 Statement re 1596 Order Samsung's Submission in Response to the Court's August 6, 2012 Order by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Poret and Jacoby Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit B - DX 2556 Statement, # 3 Exhibit 1 to DX2556 Statement)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 7, 2012 1600 REPLY in Support of ( 1388 MOTION Adverse Inference Jury Instruction ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/7/2012) Modified text on 8/8/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing (trial dates accidentally deleted, now replaced) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 1603 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 8/6/2012 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/6/2012). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge/Irene Rodriguez.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 1599 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1594 Motion for Leave to File (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 1598 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1582 Motion for Leave to File (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 1597 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING A PROCEDURE FOR REDUCING THE NUMBER OF SEALING REQUESTS filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 1596 Featured Case ORDER on 1587 Apple's Objections and 1585 Samsung's Objections Re: Winer, Poret, Van Liere, and Balakrishnan Examination Exhibits. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/6/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 1595 Witness List by Apple Inc. APPLE'S AUGUST 6, 2012 ROLLING LIST OF WITNESSES. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 1594 MOTION for Leave to File REPLY TO 1556 REUTERS AMERICA LLC'S OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO SEAL TRIAL AND PRETRIAL EVIDENCE filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer A. Golinveaux, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/6/2012) Modified on 8/7/2012 linking entry to document #1556 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2012 1593 Declaration of Beth Kellermann in Support of 1591 Opposition/Response to Motion for Spoliation Adverse Inference Instruction Against Apple filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1591 ) (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 1592 Declaration of Jason R. Bartlett in Support of 1591 Opposition/Response to Motion for Adverse Inference Jury Instruction filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Related document(s) 1591 ) (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 1591 OPPOSITION to ( 1388 Samsung's MOTION Adverse Inference Jury Instruction Against Apple filed by Apple Inc.. (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 8/6/2012) Modified text on 8/7/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2012 1590 REPLY (re 1493 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) in Support of Qualcomm's Revised Admin Mtn to Seal Confidential Information filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kays, David) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 1588 Declaration of RICHARD S.J. HUNG in Support of 1587 Objection filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 1587 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 1587 OBJECTIONS to APPLE'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES REGARDING DAY 4 EXAMINATION DISCLOSURES by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 1586 EXHIBITS re 1585 Objection, Ex. A to Ketan Decl filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Related document(s) 1585 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 1585 OBJECTIONS to re Exhibits To Be Used with Winer, Van Liere, Poret, and Balakrishnan by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl of Ketan Patel, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 1584 Statement Joint Statement Re: Proposed Schedule For Exchange Of Exhibits, Objections, And Responses by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 5, 2012 1583 Witness List by Apple Inc. APPLE'S AUGUST 5, 2012 ROLLING LIST OF WITNESSES. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/5/2012)
August 5, 2012 1582 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Samsung's Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits and Renewed Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/5/2012)
August 5, 2012 1581 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1573 Motion for Leave to File (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2012)
August 4, 2012 1580 Witness List by Apple Inc. APPLE'S AUGUST 4, 2012 ROLLING LIST OF WITNESSES. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/4/2012)
August 3, 2012 1589 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 8/3/2012 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/3/2012). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/3/2012)
August 3, 2012 1579 REPLY (re 1392 MOTION De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge, in the Alternative, Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge ) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 3, 2012 1578 Declaration of Christopher Stretch Regarding August 2, 2012 Courtroom Visit by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/3/2012) Modified text on 8/6/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2012 1577 Witness List by Apple Inc. APPLE'S AUGUST 3, 2012 ROLLING LIST OF WITNESSES. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 3, 2012 1576 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 1563 Order, APPLE'S SECOND SUBMISSION IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S AUGUST 2, 2012 ORDER (DKT. NO. 1563) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 3, 2012 1575 REPLY (re 1376 EMERGENCY ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for a Limited Sealing Order ) filed byInternational Business Machines Corporation. (Scott, Timothy) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 3, 2012 1574 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING ON SAMSUNG'S MOTION FOR SPOLIATION ADVERSE INFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS AND APPLE'S MOTION TO STRIKE: Motions (In Re: Docket Nos. 1388 and 1402 ) set for 8/7/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 3, 2012 1573 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to 1556 Reuters America LLC's Opposition to Motions to Seal Trial and Pretrial Evidence filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David A. Kays, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of David A. Kays, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kays, David) (Filed on 8/3/2012) Modified on 8/6/2012 linking entry to document #1556 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2012 1571 OBJECTIONS to APPLE'S OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED CROSS EXAMINATION EXHIBITS AND MATERIALS FOR PHIL SCHILLER, PETER BRESSLER, SUSAN KARE AND SCOTT FORSTALL AND APPLES RESPONSES TO SAMSUNG'S OBJECTIONS TO JUSTIN DENISON DIRECT EXHIBITS by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 3, 2012 1570 Declaration of RICHARD S.J. HUNG in Support of 1569 MOTION for Reconsideration APPLES MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION REGARDING RULINGS ON OBJECTIONS TO BRESSLER, KARE, SCHILLER, DENISON & FORSTALL EXHIBITS (DKT. NO. 1563) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 1569 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 3, 2012 1569 MOTION for Reconsideration APPLES MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION REGARDING RULINGS ON OBJECTIONS TO BRESSLER, KARE, SCHILLER, DENISON & FORSTALL EXHIBITS (DKT. NO. 1563) filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 3, 2012 1568 OBJECTIONS to Newly-Disclosed Bressler and Denison Exhibits, Revised Schiller Exhibits, and Responses Re: Forstall, Bressler, Kare, and Schiller Cross Exhibits by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 3, 2012 1567 RESPONSE to 1564 Apple's Motion Regarding Sealing Issues Related to August 3 Witness Examinations by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/3/2012) Modified text on 8/6/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2012 1566 Submission in Response to 1563 the Court's August 2, 2012 Order by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/3/2012) Modified text on 8/6/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2012 1565 RESPONSE to re 1563 Order, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 2, 2012 1564 MOTION Regarding Sealing Issues Related to August 3 Wintess Examinations by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/2/2012) Modified on 8/6/2012 counsel failed to post document as a motion (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2012 1563 Featured Case ORDER re 1542 Samsung's [Corrected] Objections to Apple's Forstall, Bressler, Kare, Schiller and Denison Exhibits; and re 1543 Apple's Objections to Samsung's Denison and Schiller Exhibits. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/2/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1562 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1494 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1561 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1404 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1560 Supplemental Joint Statement re 1509 Statement, 1397 Statement, 1436 Stipulation, 1536 Statement, 1452 Statement, re Meet and Confer to Discuss Objections to Exhibit Translations by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/2/2012) Modified text on 8/6/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2012 1559 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1523 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1558 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1534 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1557 Declaration of Xinying Valerian in Support of 1556 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,,,,, filed byReuters America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Xinying Valerian, # 2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Xinying Valerian, # 3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Xinying Valerian, # 4 Exhibit D to Declaration of Xinying Valerian, # 5 Exhibit E to Declaration of Xinying Valerian, # 6 Exhibit F to Declaration of Xinying Valerian, # 7 Exhibit G to Declaration of Xinying Valerian)(Related document(s) 1556 ) (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1556 OPPOSITION to ( 1414 JOINT MOTION, 1493 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1499 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PRIOR MOTIONS AND EXHIBITS THERETO, 1489 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Revised), 1328 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal /Non-Party Nokia Corporation's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 1396 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Third Party Confidential Information, 1390 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Non-Party Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Seal Terms of Confidential License Agreement, 1376 EMERGENCY ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for a Limited Sealing Order, 1340 Administrative Motion to Partially File Under Seal, 1400 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Emergency Motion by Non-Party Motorola Mobility LLC to Seal Exhibits, Close Courtroom and Seal Portions of Transcript), 1495 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE'S MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL TRIAL EXHIBITS, 1506 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1488 MOTION to Seal Trial Exhibits , 1334 Emergency MOTION for an Order Closing the Courtroom and Sealing the Transcript During Discussion of InterDigital's Confidential Information, 1486 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Proposed Trial Exhibit 630, 1490 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Renewed Motion to Seal Dkt. Nos. 927, 991, 1013, 1022, 1060, 1206, 1481 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1498 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Non-Party Siemens AG's Administrative Motion to Seal ) Third Party Reuters America LLC's Opposition to Motions to Seal Trial and Pretrial Evidence filed byReuters America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying Motions to Seal Trial and Pretrial Evidence, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Julie P. Samuels, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Amy Stevens, # 4 Declaration Declaration of Patent Professors)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 8/2/2012) Modified text on 8/6/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2012 1555 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 1539 Response ( Non Motion ), Notice of Correction (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1554 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1514 Stipulation (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1553 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Regarding 1420 Motion to Enforce; granting 1450 Motion for Leave to File Surreply (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1552 NOTICE by Apple Inc. NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF EXHIBIT G TO DECLARATION OF MICHEL MAHARBIZ IN SUPPORT OF APPLE'S OPPOSITION TO SAMSUNG'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT UNDER L.R. 79-5(E) (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1551 Proposed Order re 1549 MOTION to Strike Apple's Response to Declaration of John B. Quinn and Purported Recommendation Regarding Sanction by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1550 EXHIBITS re 1549 MOTION to Strike Apple's Response to Declaration of John B. Quinn and Purported Recommendation Regarding Sanction Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Joby Martin filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 1549 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1549 MOTION to Strike Apple's Response to Declaration of John B. Quinn and Purported Recommendation Regarding Sanction filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Responses due by 8/16/2012. Replies due by 8/23/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joby Martin)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1548 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). Amendment to 1543 Objection . (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1547 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07-31-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1546 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07-30-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1545 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 1216 Motion for Relief; granting in part 1258 Motion for Clarification (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1544 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Objections. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/2/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1543 OBJECTIONS to re 1540 Objection,, [Corrected] Apples Responses To Samsungs Objections To Forstall, Bressler, Kare, Denison And Schiller Direct Examination Materials by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1542 OBJECTIONS to Samsung's [Corrected] (1) Objections Re: Forstall Exhibits and Amended Exhibit Disclosures for Bressler, Kare, Schiller and Denison, and (2) Responses Re: Exhibits for Denison Direct Exam and Schiller Cross Exam by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1541 OBJECTIONS to Samsung's (1) Objections Regarding Forstall Exhibits, and Amended Exhibit Disclosures for Bresller, Kare, Schiller and Denison, and (2) Responses Regarding Exhibits for Denison Direct Exam and Schiller Cross Exam by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ketan V. Patel, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1540 OBJECTIONS to Apples Responses To Samsungs Objections To Forstall, Bressler, Kare, Denison And Schiller Direct Examination Materials Apples Objections To Samsungs Proposed Direct Examination Materials For Jdenison And Supplemental Objections To Samsungs Proposed Cross Examination Materials For Schiller by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Richard Hung In Support Of Apples Objections And Responses Re Samsungs Responses, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1539 RESPONSE to re 1533 Declaration in Opposition, Apple Inc.'s Response to Declaration of John B. Quinn and Recommendation Regarding Appropriate Sanction by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter J. Kolovos, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 1, 2012 1538 Statement Joint Preliminary Statement Proposing Post-Verdict Proceedings by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
August 1, 2012 1537 RESPONSE to Samsungs Corrected Objections To Cross Examination Materials For Justin Denison by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Jason R. Bartlett In Support Of Apples Supplemental Response To Samsungs Objections To Cross Examination Materials For Justin Denison, # 2 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
August 1, 2012 1536 Statement re 1509 Statement, 1397 Statement, 1436 Stipulation, 1452 Statement, Supplemental Joint Statement re Meet and Confer to Discuss Objections to Exhibit Translation by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
August 1, 2012 1535 Letter from William F. Lee, Esq. . (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
August 1, 2012 1534 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Roger G. Brooks ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7014506.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice)(Kays, David) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
August 1, 2012 1533 DECLARATION of John B. Quinn Submitted At the Request of the Court Regarding Samsung's DIsclosure of Public Information In Response to Press Inquiries filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 A, # 2 B, # 3 C, # 4 D, # 5 E, # 6 F, # 7 G)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
August 1, 2012 1532 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 1533 . *** DECLARATION of John B. Quinn Submitted At the Request of the Court Regarding Samsung's DIsclosure of Public Information In Response to Press Inquiries filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 8/1/2012) Modified on 8/1/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2012 1572 Minute Entry: Jury Trial began on 7/31/2012 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 7/31/2012). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 1531 RESPONSE (re 1392 MOTION De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge, in the Alternative, Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge ) filed byApple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 1530 Witness List by Apple Inc. APPLE'S JULY 31, 2012 ROLLING LIST OF WITNESSES. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 1529 Proposed Order re 1389 MOTION to Shorten Time Amended Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion to Shorten Time by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 1526 OBJECTIONS to re 1518 Objection Samsung's Response To Apple's Newly Disclosed Objections To Samsung's Exhibits For Cross Examination Of Peter Bressler And Update Regarding Justin Denison by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 1522 Featured Case ORDER On Samsung's Objections to Stringer Exhibits. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/31/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 1521 OBJECTIONS to Samsung's [Corrected] Objections to Apple's Proposed Examination Exhibits and Materials for Third Day of Trial by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 1520 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER ON SAMSUNGS OBJECTIONS TO APPLES PROPOSED EXAMINATION EXHIBITS AND MATERIALS FOR SECOND DAY OF TRIAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/31/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 1519 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Apple's Objections to Stringer Exhibits. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/31/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 1518 Apple's Objections to Samsung's Proposed Cross Examination Exhibits and Materials for Phil Schiller, Peter Bressler and Susan Kare; Apple's Responses to Samsung's Objections to Cross Examination Exhibits and Material for Justin Denison Apples Objections To Samsungs Proposed Cross Examination Exhibits And Materials For Phil Schiller, Peter Bressler, And Susan Kare by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/31/2012) Modified on 8/1/2012 (srm, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2012 1517 OBJECTIONS to Samsungs Objections to Apples Proposed Examination Exhibits and Materials for Third Day of Trial by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Hutnyan, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 1516 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Samsungs Submission in Response to the Courts July 30, 2012 Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 1515 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Clarification Regarding Certain Apple Exhibits (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 30, 2012 Received Sealed Document: Declaration of Kara M. Borden in Support of 1468 Objection, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1527 Minute Entry: Jury Selection held on 7/30/2012 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 7/30/2012). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1525 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/30/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 7/30/2012) re 1472 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by International Business Machines Corporation. Court to issue order after hearing. (Court Reporter FTR: (11:15 to 11:27.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1524 Proposed Order re 1523 MOTION of Derek Lam for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 54611012308) Filing fee previously paid on 7/30/2012 by Apple Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1523 MOTION of Derek Lam for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 54611012308) Filing fee paid on 7/30/2012 filed by Apple Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1514 Featured Case JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING UPDATED DAMAGES OPINIONS AND EXHIBITS filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2012) Modified text on 7/31/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2012 1513 Supplemental Response to 1439 Objections to Chris Stringer Exhibits, by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2012) Modified text on 7/31/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2012 1512 Featured Case ORDER re 1468 Samsung's Objections to Apple's Proposed Examination Exhibits and Materials for Second Day of Trial. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/30/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1511 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Apple's Objections to Denison Exhibits. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/30/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1510 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 1463 Motion for Reconsideration (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1509 Supplemental Joint Statement re Meet and Confer to Discuss Objections to Exhibit Translation re 1397 , 1436 , 1452 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/30/2012) Modified text on 7/31/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2012 1508 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kays, David) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1507 OBJECTIONS to Samsung's [Corrected] Objections to Apple's Proposed Examination Exhibits and Materials for Second Day of Trial by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1506 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1505 Declaration of Henri Lamiraux in Support of 1495 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE'S MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL TRIAL EXHIBITS filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1495 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1504 Declaration of Beth Kellermann in Support of 1495 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE'S MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL TRIAL EXHIBITS filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1495 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1503 Declaration of GREGORY JOSWIAK in Support of 1499 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLES MOTION TO SEAL PRIOR MOTIONS AND EXHIBITS THERETO filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1499 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1502 Declaration of JIM BEAN in Support of 1499 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLES MOTION TO SEAL PRIOR MOTIONS AND EXHIBITS THERETO filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1499 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1501 Declaration of JASON R. BARTLETT in Support of 1499 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLES MOTION TO SEAL PRIOR MOTIONS AND EXHIBITS THERETO filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1499 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1500 Proposed Order re 1499 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLES MOTION TO SEAL PRIOR MOTIONS AND EXHIBITS THERETO by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1499 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLES MOTION TO SEAL PRIOR MOTIONS AND EXHIBITS THERETO filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1498 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Non-Party Siemens AG's Administrative Motion to Seal filed by Siemens AG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration John P. Bovich, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Declaration Frank J. Nuzzi, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Proposed Order)(Bovich, John) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1497 NOTICE by Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1496 Declaration of Gregory Joswiak in Support of 1495 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE'S MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL TRIAL EXHIBITS filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1495 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1495 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE'S MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL TRIAL EXHIBITS filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jim Bean)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2012) Modified on 7/31/2012 pursuant to General Order No. 62 attachment #2 sealed (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2012 1494 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Peter J. Chassman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7009449.) filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1493 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kays, David) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1492 Certificate of Interested Entities by Motorola Mobility LLC Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-16 (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1491 Supplemental Submission in Support of 1400 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits, Close Courtroom and Seal Portions of Transcript) filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Related document(s) 1400 ) (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/30/2012) Modified text on 7/31/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2012 1490 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Renewed Motion to Seal Dkt. Nos. 927, 991, 1013, 1022, 1060, 1206 filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of GiHo Ro in Support of Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion, # 2 Declaration of Prashanth Chennakesavan in Support of Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion, # 3 Exhibit 1-15 to the Chennakesavan Declaration, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1489 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Revised) filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josef Hausner)(Kelley, Christopher) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1488 MOTION to Seal Trial Exhibits filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Responses due by 8/2/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of GiHo Ro in Support of Samsung's Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits, # 2 Declaration of YoungJin Kwon in Support of Samsung's Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1487 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Apple's Response to Samsung's Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Slides 11-19 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1486 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Proposed Trial Exhibit 630, and Clsoing the Courtoom and Sealing the Transcript During Discussion of Dolby's Confidential Information filed by Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Scott, Timothy) (Filed on 7/30/2012) Modified text on 7/31/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2012 1485 Supplemental Declaration of Nathaniel E. Durrance in Support of 1390 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Non-Party Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Seal Terms of Confidential License Agreement filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Related document(s) 1390 ) (Durrance, Nathaniel) (Filed on 7/30/2012) Modified text on 7/31/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2012 1484 Supplemental Brief in Support of 1396 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Third Party Confidential Information filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Michael J. Crowley)(Related document(s) 1396 ) (Lange, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/30/2012) Modified text on 7/31/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2012 1483 Declaration in Support of 1340 Administrative Motion to Partially File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration of Michael Marion in Support of Third-Party Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.'s Administrative Motion to Partially File Under Seal filed byKoninklijki Philips Electronics N.V.. (Related document(s) 1340 ) (Ma, Gary) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1482 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Motion to Remove Docket #1378-3 filed by Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Dodd, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1481 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Uchigasaki Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1 to the Supp. Uchigasaki Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to the Supp. Uchigasaki Decl., # 4 Proposed Order)(Dodd, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1480 RESPONSE to 1463 Samsung's MOTION for Reconsideration Regarding Opening Statement Slides 11-19 by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2012) Modified text on 7/31/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2012 1479 Declaration of Kenneth S. King (Supplemental) in Support of 1376 EMERGENCY ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for a Limited Sealing Order filed byInternational Business Machines Corporation. (Related document(s) 1376 ) (Scott, Timothy) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1478 Featured Case ORDER DENYING THIRD-PARTY INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 1472 Motion for TRO (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1477 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) Samsung's Proffer Regarding Exhibit 628 (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1476 RESPONSE to 1463 MOTION for Reconsideration Regarding Opening Statement Slide 29 by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2012) Modified text on 7/31/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2012 1475 OBJECTIONS to re 1463 MOTION for Reconsideration re 1456 Order Samsung's Motion For Reconsideration and Offer of Proof by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1474 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) Samsung's Proffer Regarding Documents Demonstrating Independent Creation And That Rebut Allegations of Copying (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1473 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) Samsung's Proffer of Evidence Regarding Shin Nishibori (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1472 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Scott, Timothy) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1471 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME ON 7/30/2012 HEARING ON THIRD PARTY IBM'S MOTION TO SEAL: 7/30/2012 10:30 AM Motion Hearing reset to 11:15 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1470 RESPONSE (re 1376 EMERGENCY ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for a Limited Sealing Order ) Reuters' America LLC's Opposition to Non-Party IBM's Motion to Prevent Publication filed byReuters America LLC. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1469 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING ON THIRD PARTY IBM'S MOTION TO SEAL: Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1468 OBJECTIONS to Apple's Proposed Examination Exhibits and Materials For Second Day of Trial by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Kara M. Borden, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1467 OBJECTIONS to APPLE'S OBJECTIONS TO THE EXHIBITS TO BE USED DURING THE DIRECT EXAMINATION OF JUSTIN DENISON by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1466 RESPONSES to 1467 Apple's Objections to Exhibits to be Used in Samsung's Direct Examination of Justin Denison by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/30/2012) Modified on 7/31/2012 linking entry to document #1467 (dhm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/9/2012 EXHIBIT (DX 627 AND 629) HAVE NOT BEEN MANUALLY SUBMITTED TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE FOR FILING (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2012 1465 Declaration of Brett J. Arnold in Support of 1463 MOTION for Reconsideration re 1456 Order Samsung's Motion For Reconsideration and Offer of Proof filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1463 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1464 Declaration of JASON R. BARTLETT in Support of 1462 Response ( Non Motion ), filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 1462 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1463 MOTION for Reconsideration re 1456 Order Samsung's Motion For Reconsideration and Offer of Proof filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1462 RESPONSE to APPLE'S RESPONSES TO SAMSUNG'S OBJECTIONS TO THE EXHIBITS AND DEMONSTRATIVES TO BE USED DURING THE EXAMINATIONS OF PHIL SCHILLER, PETER BRESSLER AND SUSAN KARE, AND JUSTIN DENISON by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1461 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria F. Maroulis Jon Cederberg (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1460 RESPONSE to re 1454 Objection Samsung's Response to Apple's Objections to Cross Examination Exhibits of Christopher Stringer by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1459 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria F. Maroulis John B. Quinn (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1458 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria F. Maroulis William Price (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 1457 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria F. Maroulis Ryan Goldstein (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 29, 2012 1456 Featured Case ORDER On Apple's Objections to Samsung's Opening Slides. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/29/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2012)
July 29, 2012 1455 Featured Case ORDER re 1440 Samsung's Objections to Apple's Opening Slides. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/29/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2012)
July 29, 2012 1454 OBJECTIONS to Apples Objections To Samsungs Proposed Cross Examination Exhibits And Materials For Christopher Stringer by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/29/2012)
July 29, 2012 1453 Letter from Local Counsel for Mr. Shin Nishibori Re: Improperly Served Subpoena . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena to Mr. Nishibori)(Nolan, Thomas) (Filed on 7/29/2012)
July 29, 2012 1452 Supplemental Joint Statement re 1397 Meet and Confer to Discuss Objections to Exhibit Translations by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/29/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2012 1451 Declaration of Adam Cashman in Support of 1450 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Re Apple's New Arguments On Reply Re Apple's Motion to Enforce Court Orders Regarding Sony Designs filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 1450 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/29/2012)
July 29, 2012 1450 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Re Apple's New Arguments On Reply Re Apple's Motion to Enforce Court Orders Regarding Sony Designs filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/29/2012)
July 29, 2012 1449 Witness List by Apple Inc. APPLE'S JULY 29, 2012 ROLLING LIST OF WITNESSES. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/29/2012)
July 29, 2012 1448 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Claim Constructions in Jury Notebooks. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/29/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2012)
July 29, 2012 1447 Featured Case ORDER Amending Design Patent Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/29/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2012)
July 29, 2012 1446 Corrected Declaration of JASON R. BARTLETT in Support of 1441 Objection TO SAMSUNGS OPENING STATEMENT AND DEMONSTRATIVES filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 1441 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/29/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2012 1445 Declaration of JASON R. BARTLETT in Support of 1444 Apple's Response to Samsung's Objections to Apple's Opening Statement Demonstrative Exhibits, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 1444 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/29/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2012 1444 RESPONSE to SAMSUNG'S OBJECTIONS TO APPLES OPENING STATEMENT DEMONSTRATIVE EXHIBITS & CHRIS STRINGER EXHIBITS by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/29/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2012 1443 Declaration of JASON R. BARTLETT in Support of Response to 1441 Objections to Apple's Opening Statement Demostrative Exhibits filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 1441 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/29/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2012 1442 RESPONSE to 1440 Apple's Objections to Samsung's Opening Slides by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Joseph Milowic III and Exhibits A-E)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/29/2012) Modified on 7/30/2012 linking entry to document #1440 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2012 1441 OBJECTIONS to APPLE'S OBJECTIONS TO SAMSUNG'S OPENING STATEMENT DEMONSTRATIVE EXHIBITS by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/29/2012)
July 29, 2012 1440 OBJECTIONS to Apple's Opening Slides by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/29/2012)
July 29, 2012 1439 OBJECTIONS to Trial Exhibits of Christopher Stringer by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 157, # 6 Exhibit 162, # 7 Exhibit 164, # 8 Exhibit 165, # 9 Exhibit 166, # 10 Exhibit 167, # 11 Exhibit 168a, # 12 Exhibit 168b, # 13 Exhibit 170, # 14 Exhibit 171)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/29/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2012 1438 Declaration of ALISON M. TUCHER in Support of 1420 MOTION to Enforce Court Orders Regarding Sony Designs filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 1437 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/29/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2012 1437 REPLY in Support of ( 1420 MOTION TO ENFORCE COURT ORDERS REGARDING SONY DESIGNS ) filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/29/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2012 1436 STIPULATION Joint Statement re: Meet and Confer to Discuss Objections to Exhibit Translations filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/28/2012)
July 28, 2012 1435 OBJECTIONS to 1433 Apple's Request for Correction of Design Patent Claim Construction Order by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/28/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2012 1434 Declaration of ALISON M. TUCHER in Support of 1433 APPLE'S REQUEST FOR CORRECTION TO DESIGN PATENT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 1433 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/28/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2012 1433 REQUEST re 1425 for Correction to Design Patent Claim Construction by Apple Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/28/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2012 1432 CORRECTED OBJECTIONS and COUNTERDESIGNATIONS to 1401 SAMSUNG'S RULE 26(a)(3) DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/28/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2012 1431 CORRECTED OPPOSITION to ( 1420 MOTION TO ENFORCE COURT ORDERS REGARDING SONY DESIGNS ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/28/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2012 1430 JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING JURY BINDER by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/28/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2012 1429 OPPOSITION to ( 1420 MOTION TO ENFORCE COURT ORDERS REGARDING SONY DESIGNS ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Curran M. Walker, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/28/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2012 1528 Minute Entry: Final Pretrial Conference (Date Filed: 7/27/2012). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/27/2012)
July 27, 2012 1428 OPPOSITION to ( 1402 MOTION to Strike 1388 MOTION Adverse Inference Jury Instruction filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2012 1427 Preliminary Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/27/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2012). The parties shall bring 15 double sided, 3-hole punched copies of the preliminary jury instructions to trial on Monday, July 30, 2012.
July 27, 2012 1426 Featured Case Case Management ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/27/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified on 7/27/2012 (lhklc2, COURT STAFF). Counsel are advised to review the section on "Information for Jurors" for additional information not discussed at the Case Management Conference.
July 27, 2012 1425 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Design Patent Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/27/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 27, 2012 1424 Proposed Order re 1414 JOINT MOTION regarding Sealing of Trial Exhibits by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2012 1423 BRIEF regarding Apple's Renewed Objection to 1327 Preliminary Jury Instruction No. 21 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.(a Korean corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2012 1422 Certificate of Interested Entities by Microsoft Corporation (Durrance, Nathaniel) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 27, 2012 1421 OPPOSITION to 1398 Brief Regarding References at Trial "Plaintiff" amd "Defendant" by Apple Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2012 1420 MOTION TO ENFORCE COURT ORDERS REGARDING SONY DESIGNS filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 8/10/2012. Replies due by 8/17/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason R. Bartlett, # 2 Declaration of Kristin L. Yohannan, # 3 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2012 1419 Declaration of YoungJin Kwon in Support of 1414 Joint Motion Regarding Sealing of Trial Exhibits filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1414 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2012 1418 Declaration of Prashanth Chennakesavan in Support of 1414 Joint Motion Regarding Sealing of Trial Exhibits filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1414 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2012 1417 Declaration of GiHo Ro in Support of 1414 Joint Motion Regarding Sealing of Trial Exhibits filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1414 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2012 1416 Declaration of Gregory Joswiak in Support of 1414 JOINT MOTION , 1408 Corrected Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1414 , 1408 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2012 1415 Declaration of Mark Buckley in Support of 1414 JOINT MOTION 1408 Corrected Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1414 , 1408 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2012 1414 JOINT MOTION Regarding Sealing of Trial Exhibits by Apple Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified on 7/30/2012 counsel posted document incorrectly as a statement (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2012 1413 NOTICE of Appearance by Corina Irina Cacovean of Dylan J. Liddiard (Cacovean, Corina) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 27, 2012 1412 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of 1408 Renewed Motion to Seal, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified on 7/30/2012 linking entry to document #1408 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2012 1411 NOTICE of Appearance by Corina Irina Cacovean of Michael B. Levin (Cacovean, Corina) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 27, 2012 1410 NOTICE of Lodgement of Corrected Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Jason R. Bartlett in Support of Apple's Response to Samsung's Opening Memorandum Regarding Design Patent Claim Construction [Dkt. No. 1140-4] by Apple Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2012 1409 Supplemental Declaration of GiHo Ro in Support of 1318 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Dkt. Nos. 927, 991, 1013, 1022, 1060, and 1206, 1375 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Corrected Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Dkt. Nos. 927, 991, 1013, 1022, 1060, 1206), 1330 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1318 , 1375 , 1330 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2012 1408 Corrected Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Nathan Sabri, # 3 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 4 Declaration of Erica Tierney)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2012 1407 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Non-Party Intel's Administrative Motion to Seal Selected Proprietary Material filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kelley, Christopher) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 27, 2012 1406 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Daniel Hemminger as Counsel of Record for non-party Nokia Corporation (Hemminger, Steven) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 27, 2012 1403 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents [DOCKET NOS. 1385-1, 1385-2] filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2012 1402 MOTION to Strike Untimely 1388 MOTION Adverse Inference Jury Instruction, filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 8/10/2012. Replies due by 8/17/2012. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified text on 7/30/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1401 OBJECTIONS to re 1245 Notice (Other), 1284 Notice (Other) APPLE INC.'S OBJECTIONS AND COUNTERDESIGNATIONS TO SAMSUNG'S RULE 26(a)(3) DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 1400 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Emergency Motion by Non-Party Motorola Mobility LLC to Seal Exhibits, Close Courtroom and Seal Portions of Transcript) filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Thomas V. Miller, # 2 Declaration Jennifer A. Golinveaux, # 3 Proposed Order)(Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 1399 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Golinveaux , David S. Bloch, Marcus T. Hall and Peter J. Chassman for Non-Party Motorola Mobility LLC (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 1398 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding References at Trial to "Plaintiff" and "Defendant" by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 1397 Joint Statement re Meet and Confer to Discuss Objections to Exhibit Translations by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1396 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Third Party Confidential Information filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Declaration of Michael J. Crowley, # 3 Exhibit A to Crowley Decl, # 4 Exhibit B to Crowley Decl, # 5 Declaration of Jonathan Lange, # 6 Exhibit A to Lange Decl, # 7 Proposed Order)(Lange, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 1395 Declaration of Tanya Moore in Support of 1390 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential License Agreement filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 1391 , 1390 ) (Durrance, Nathaniel) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1394 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. *** Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric Reifschneider, # 2 Exhibit 1 to the declaration of Eric Reifschneider, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kays, David) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified on 7/30/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1393 MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing re 1392 Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge; Declaration of Victoria F. Maroulis filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified on 7/27/2012 linking entry to document #1392 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1392 MOTION De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge, in the Alternative, Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. Responses due by 8/9/2012. Replies due by 8/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 1391 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of 1390 Administrative Motion to Seal Terms of Confidential License Agreement filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Related document(s) 1390 ) (Durrance, Nathaniel) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1390 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Non-Party Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Seal Terms of Confidential License Agreement filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Durrance, Nathaniel) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 1389 MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing re Samsung's Motion for Spoliation Adverse Inference Instruction Against Apple; Declaration of Victoria Maroulis filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.(a Korean corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1388 MOTION Adverse Inference Jury Instruction filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Responses due by 8/9/2012. Replies due by 8/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 1387 Objections and Counter Designations to Apple's Corrected Notice of Amended Deposition Designations by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1294 Samsung's Objections and Counter Designations to Apple's Corrected Notice of Amended Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Samsung's Objections and Counter Designations to Apple's Corrected Notice of Amended Deposition Designations, # 2 Exhibit B to Samsung's Objections and Counter Designations to Apple's Corrected Notice of Amended Deposition Designations)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1386 NOTICE of Appearance by David Allan Kays for Non-Party Qualcomm Incorporated (Kays, David) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 1385 Exhibits to Martin Declaration ISO Samsung's Daubert Motion by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Dkt. No. 927) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6 to Martin, # 2 Exhibit 7 to Martin, # 3 Exhibit 8 to Martin, # 4 Exhibit 9 to Martin, # 5 Exhibit 12 to Martin, # 6 Exhibit 15 to Martin, # 7 Exhibit 18 to Martin, # 8 Exhibit 19 to Martin, # 9 Exhibit 20 to Martin, # 10 Exhibit 21 to Martin, # 11 Exhibit 23 to Martin, # 12 Exhibit 24 to Martin, # 13 Exhibit 25 to Martin, # 14 Exhibit 26 to Martin, # 15 Exhibit 27 to Martin, # 16 Exhibit 28 to Martin, # 17 Exhibit 30 to Martin)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1384 Unredacted Exhibits to Arnold Declaration ISO Samsung's MSJ by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Dkt. Nos. 930, 945) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 46 to Arnold, # 2 Exhibit 47 to Arnold, # 3 Exhibit 48 to Arnold, # 4 Exhibit 49 to Arnold, # 5 Exhibit 50 to Arnold, # 6 Exhibit 51 to Arnold, # 7 Exhibit 52 to Arnold, # 8 Exhibit 54 to Arnold, # 9 Exhibit 55 to Arnold, # 10 Exhibit 56 to Arnold, # 11 Exhibit 57 to Arnold, # 12 Exhibit 58 to Arnold, # 13 Exhibit 60 to Arnold, # 14 Exhibit 63 to Arnold, # 15 Exhibit 64 to Arnold, # 16 Exhibit 66 to Arnold, # 17 Exhibit 68 to Arnold, # 18 Exhibit 69 to Arnold, # 19 Exhibit 71 to Arnold, # 20 Exhibit 73 to Arnold, # 21 Exhibit 74 to Arnold, # 22 Exhibit 75 to Arnold, # 23 Exhibit 76 to Arnold, # 24 Exhibit 77 to Arnold, # 25 Exhibit 78 to Arnold, # 26 Exhibit 79 to Arnold, # 27 Exhibit 80 to Arnold, # 28 Exhibit 81 to Arnold, # 29 Exhibit 82 to Arnold)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1383 OPPOSITION to Various Third Party Motions to Seal (re 1334 Emergency MOTION for an Order Closing the Courtroom and Sealing the Transcript During Discussion of InterDigital's Confidential Information, 1378 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1328 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Non-Party Nokia Corporation's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 1376 Third Party Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1340 Administrative Motion to Partially File Under Seal ) Third Party Reuters America LLC's Opposition to Various Third Party Motions to Seal filed by Reuters America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Opposition, # 2 Proposed Order)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1382 Unredacted Exhibits to Arnold Declaration ISO Samsung's MSJ ( by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Dkt. Nos. 930, 944, 945) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 20 to Arnold, # 2 Exhibit 23 to Arnold, # 3 Exhibit 31 to Arnold, # 4 Exhibit 36 to Arnold, # 5 Exhibit 38 to Arnold, # 6 Exhibit 39 to Arnold, # 7 Exhibit 40 to Arnold, # 8 Exhibit 41 to Arnold, # 9 Exhibit 42 to Arnold, # 10 Exhibit 43 to Arnold, # 11 Exhibit 44 to Arnold)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1381 Unredacted Declaration of Brett Arnold ISO Samsung's MSJ by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Dkt. Nos. 930, 943) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Arnold, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Arnold, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Arnold, # 4 Exhibit 5 to Arnold, # 5 Exhibit 10 to Arnold, # 6 Exhibit 11 to Arnold, # 7 Exhibit 12 to Arnold, # 8 Exhibit 15 to Arnold)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1380 MOTION Requesting Internet Access in Courtroom from Michael Jacobs and Todd Briggs (Joint) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1379 Unredacted Exhibits to Gray and Van Dam Decs ISO Samsung's MSJ by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Dkt. Nos. 931, 937 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7 to Gray, # 2 Exhibit 8 to Gray, # 3 Exhibit 9 to Gray, # 4 Exhibit 10 to Gray, # 5 Exhibit 11 to Gray, # 6 Exhibit 12 to Gray, # 7 Exhibit 13 to Gray, # 8 Exhibit 14 to Gray, # 9 Exhibit 15 to Gray, # 10 Exhibit 2 to Van Dam)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1378 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Uchigasaki, # 2 Exhibit Uchigasaki Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Uchigasaki Exhibit 2, # 4 Declaration Dodd, # 5 Proposed Order)(Dodd, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified on 7/31/2012 Pursuant to General Order No. 62 attachment #1 and #4 sealed (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1377 Proposed Order re 1318 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Dkt. Nos. 927, 991, 1013, 1022, 1060, and 1206, 1375 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Corrected Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Dkt. Nos. 927, 991, 1013, 1022, 1060, 1206) Samsung's Corrected Proposed Order by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 1376 Notice of EMERGENCY ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for a Limited Sealing Order filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scott, Timothy) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1375 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Corrected Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Dkt. Nos. 927, 991, 1013, 1022, 1060, 1206) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Samsung's Motion (Corrected), # 2 Declaration of GiHo Ro (Corrected), # 3 Declaration of Prashanth Chennakesavan (Corrected))(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 1374 Unredacted Ex. A to Hedge Decl. ISO Apple's Opposition to Samsung's MSJ re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Dkt. No. 1023) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Vol. 2, # 2 Exhibit A Vol. 3, # 3 Exhibit A Vol. 4, # 4 Exhibit A Vol. 5)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1373 Unredacted Exhibits to Maharbiz Decl. ISO Apple's Opposition to Samsung's MSJ re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Dkt. No. 1013) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Exhibit J, # 4 Exhibit K, # 5 Exhibit L, # 6 Exhibit M, # 7 Exhibit N, # 8 Exhibit S)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1372 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. *** Unredacted Musika Decl. and Exhs. ISO Apple's Opposition to Samsung's MSJ re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Dkt. No. 1024) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit H, # 5 Exhibit I, # 6 Exhibit J, # 7 Exhibit K, # 8 Exhibit L)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified on 7/26/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1371 Unredacted Exhibit B to Ordover Declaration in Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Dkt. No. 1018) by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1370 Unredacted Declaration of Ravin Balakrishnan, Ph.D in Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Dkt. No. 1024) by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1369 Unredacted Declaration of Karl Kramer in Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Dkt. No. 1013) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 10)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1368 Unredacted Declaration of Dr. Karan Singh, Ph.D in Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Dkt. No. 1024) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 8)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1367 Unredacted Exhibit 1 to Winer Declaration in Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Dkt. No. 1023) by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1366 Unredacted Opposition to Samsung's Motion re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Dkt No. 997) by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1365 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Koninklijki Philips Electronics N.V. re 1340 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Third Party Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.'s Administrative Motion to Partially File Under Seal (Ma, Gary) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 1364 Featured Case ORDER Permitting Electronic Equipment in Courthouse by Members of the Press. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/26/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 1363 Unredacted Declaration of John R. Hauser re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Dkt. No. 991) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1362 Unredacted Exhibits to Musika Declaration in Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Daubert Motion re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Dkt. No. 991) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit G, # 5 Exhibit H, # 6 Exhibit I, # 7 Exhibit J, # 8 Exhibit L, # 9 Exhibit M, # 10 Exhibit N, # 11 Exhibit O, # 12 Exhibit P, # 13 Exhibit Q, # 14 Exhibit R, # 15 Exhibit V, # 16 Exhibit W, # 17 Exhibit X)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1361 Unredacted Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, re (Dkt. No. 1063) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1360 Unredacted Declaration of Bill Trac in Support of Samsung's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, re (Dkt. Nos. 1068, 1069) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to the Trac Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 to the Trac Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 8 to the Trac Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 9 to the Trac Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 10 to the Trac Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 14 to the Trac Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 15 to the Trac Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 16 to the Trac Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 17 to the Trac Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 18 to the Trac Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 19 to the Trac Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 20 to the Trac Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 21 to the Trac Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 22 to the Trac Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 23 to the Trac Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 24 to the Trac Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 25 to the Trac Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 26 to the Trac Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 27 to the Trac Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 28 to the Trac Declaration)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1359 Unredacted Exhibits to Kanada Declaration in Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsungs Motions in Limine re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, re (Dkt. No. 1206) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 9, # 8 Exhibit 10, # 9 Exhibit 12, # 10 Exhibit 41)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1358 Unredacted Opening Supplemental Claim Construction Brief re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,re (Dkt. No. 1186 by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ravin Balakrishnan, Ph.D., # 2 Exhibit 6 to Balakrishnan Declaration)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1357 Unredacted Motions in Limine re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, re (Dkt. No. 1184) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 to Bartlett Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 10 to Bartlett Declaration)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1356 Unredacted Opening Memroandum Regarding Claim Construction by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, re (Dkt. Nos. 1090, 1091) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4 to the Cashman Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 14 to the Cashman Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 15 to the Cashman Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 17 to the Cashman Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 18 to the Cashman Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 20 to the Cashman Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 63 to the Cashman Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 64 to the Cashman Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 65 to the Cashman Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 66 to the Cashman Declaration)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1355 Unredacted Exhibits to Bressler Declaration in Support of Apple's Response to Samsung's Opening Memo re Design Patent Claim Construction RESPONSE to re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,re (Dkt. No. 1140) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 32, # 2 Exhibit 33, # 3 Exhibit 34, # 4 Exhibit 35, # 5 Exhibit 36, # 6 Exhibit 37, # 7 Exhibit 39, # 8 Exhibit 40, # 9 Exhibit 72, # 10 Exhibit 73, # 11 Exhibit 74, # 12 Exhibit 75, # 13 Exhibit 76, # 14 Exhibit 77)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1354 Unredacted Declaration of Peter W. Bressler, FIDSA, in Support of Apple's Response to Samsung's Opening Memorandum Regarding Design Patent Claim Construction RESPONSE to re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, re (Dkt. No. 1140) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8, # 8 Exhibit 9, # 9 Exhibit 10, # 10 Exhibit 20)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1353 Unredacted Opposition to Apple's Opening Claim Construction Brief by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, re (Dkt. No. 1139) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5 to the Cashman Declaration)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1352 Reply in Support of Opening Memorandum re Claim Construction by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, re (Dkt. No. 1179) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to the Barach Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 to the Barach Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 to the Barach Declaration)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1351 Unredacted Claim Construction Brief by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, re (Dkt. No. 1183) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 to the Schmidt Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 4 to the Schmidt Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 9 to the Schmidt Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 10 to the Schmidt Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 11 to the Schmidt Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 12 to the Schmidt Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 13 to the Schmidt Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 14 to the Schmidt Declaration)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 1350 UNREDACTED NOTICE OF MOTIONS AND MOTIONS in Limine by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C to the D'Amato Declaration, # 2 Exhibit E to the D'Amato Declaration, # 3 Exhibit G to the D'Amato Declaration, # 4 Exhibit H to the D'Amato Declaration, # 5 Exhibit J to the D'Amato Declaration, # 6 Exhibit K to the D'Amato Declaration, # 7 Exhibit L to the D'Amato Declaration, # 8 Exhibit M to the D'Amato Declaration, # 9 Exhibit N to the D'Amato Declaration, # 10 Exhibit T to the D'Amato Declaration, # 11 Exhibit V to the D'Amato Declaration, # 12 Exhibit W to the D'Amato Declaration)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 1405 Proposed Order re 1404 MOTION of Joseph J. Mueller for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 54611012280) Filing fee previously paid on 7/25/2012 by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 25, 2012 1404 MOTION of Joseph J. Mueller for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 54611012280.) Filing fee paid on 7/25/2012 filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 25, 2012 1349 Declaration of Jason R. Bartlett in Support of 1348 OBJECTIONS TO SAMSUNG'S SUBMISSION IDENTIFYING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S JULY 11, 2012 ORDER filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 1348 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified text on 7/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 1348 OBJECTIONS to re 1275 Declaration in Support, APPLE'S OBJECTIONS TO SAMSUNG'S SUBMISSION IDENTIFYING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S JULY 11, 2012 ORDER by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 25, 2012 1347 Unredacted Oppostion to Apple's Supplemental Claim Construction Brief (Dkt. No. 1201) re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified text on 7/26/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 1346 Unredacted Exhibits to Bartlett Decl ISO Apple's Response to Samsung's Opening Memo Re Design Patent Claim Construction (Dkt. No. 1140) re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8, # 8 Exhibit 9, # 9 Exhibit 10, # 10 Exhibit 11, # 11 Exhibit 12, # 12 Exhibit 13, # 13 Exhibit 14, # 14 Exhibit 27)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified text on 7/26/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 1345 Unredacted Oppositions to Apple's Motions in Limine (Dkt. Nos. 1208, 1209) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to the D'Amato Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B to the D'Amato Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C to the D'Amato Declaration, # 4 Exhibit G to the D'Amato Declaration, # 5 Exhibit H to the D'Amato Declaration, # 6 Exhibit I to the D'Amato Declaration, # 7 Exhibit J to the D'Amato Declaration)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified text on 7/26/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 1344 Unredacted Apple's Opening Design Patent Claim Construction Brief (Dkt. No. 1089) re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8, # 2 Exhibit 9, # 3 Exhibit 10, # 4 Exhibit 11)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified text on 7/26/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 1343 Unredacted Apple Reply ISO Motion to Exclude Testimony of Samsung Experts (Dkt. No. 1059) re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified text on 7/26/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 1342 Unredacted Exhibit C to Watson Declaration in Support of Samsung's Proposed Jury Instructions (Dkt. No. 1233) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified text on 7/26/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 1341 Unredacted Exhibit A to Samsung's Objections to Apple's Exhibit List (Dkt. No. 1236) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1256 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified text on 7/26/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 1340 Administrative Motion to Partially File Under Seal filed by Koninklijki Philips Electronics N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Third Party Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.'s Administrative Motion to Partially File Under Seal, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Gary C. Ma in Support of Third Party Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.'s Administrative Motion to Partially File Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit A to the Declaration of Gary C. Ma in Support of Third Party Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.'s Administrative Motion to Partially File Under Seal, # 4 Declaration Declaration of Michael Marion in Support of Third Party Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)(Ma, Gary) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified on 7/26/2012 pursuant to General Order No. 62 attachement #2 and #4 sealed (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 1339 Certificate of Interested Entities by Koninklijki Philips Electronics N.V. Third Party Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.'s Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Ma, Gary) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 25, 2012 1338 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to ( 1328 Non-Party Nokia Corporation's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified text on 7/26/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 1337 Declaration of Lawrence F. Shay in Support of 1334 Emergency MOTION to Expedite by Non-Parties InterDigital Communications, LLC and InterDigital Technology Corporation for an Order Closing the Courtroom and Sealing the Transcript During Discussion of InterDigital's Confidential Information filed byInterDigital Communications LLC, InterDigital Technology Corporation. (Related document(s) 1334 ) (Cacovean, Corina) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 25, 2012 1336 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Ma and Robert F. McCauley for Third Party Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. (Ma, Gary) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 25, 2012 1335 Declaration of Michael B. Levin in Support of 1334 Emergency MOTION to Expedite by Non-Parties InterDigital Communications, LLC and InterDigital Technology Corporation for an Order Closing the Courtroom and Sealing the Transcript During Discussion of InterDigital's Confidential Information filed byInterDigital Communications LLC, InterDigital Technology Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Redacted)(Related document(s) 1334 ) (Cacovean, Corina) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 25, 2012 1334 Emergency MOTION for an Order Closing the Courtroom and Sealing the Transcript During Discussion of InterDigital's Confidential Information filed by InterDigital Technology Corporation, InterDigital Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cacovean, Corina) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified text on 7/26/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 1333 Witness List by Apple Inc. Apple Inc.s List Of Twenty Witnesses It Will Call At Trial. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 25, 2012 1332 Witness List by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) Samsung's List Of 20 Witnesses It Definitely Intends To Call Live Or By Deposition. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 25, 2012 1331 Declaration of Karl Olson in Support of 1330 Opposition/Response to Motion, Declaration of Karl Olson in Support of Third Party Reuters America LLC's Opposition to Renewed Motions to Seal filed byReuters America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Karl Olson, # 2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Karl Olson, # 3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Karl Olson, # 4 Exhibit D to Declaration of Karl Olson, # 5 Exhibit E to Declaration of Karl Olson, # 6 Exhibit F to Declaration of Karl Olson, # 7 Exhibit G to Declaration of Karl Olson)(Related document(s) 1330 ) (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 25, 2012 1330 OPPOSITION to ( 1318 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Dkt. Nos. 927, 991, 1013, 1022, 1060, and 1206, 1317 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Renewed Motion to Seal ) filed by Reuters America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified text on 7/26/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 1328 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal /Non-Party Nokia Corporation's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Nokia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Proposed Order)(Hemminger, Steven) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 25, 2012 1327 Renewed Objection to Preliminary Instruction No. 21 (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified text on 7/26/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 1326 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1310 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 25, 2012 1325 JOINT GLOSSARY OF TERMS by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified text on 7/26/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 1324 EXHIBITS re 1323 Trial Brief Exhibit A filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1323 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 25, 2012 1323 TRIAL BRIEF by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 25, 2012 1322 TRIAL BRIEF Samsung's Unsealed Trial Brief and Exhibits Thereto by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joby Martin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified on 8/7/2012 EXHIBIT 5, 6, 8 AND 11 HAVE NOT BEEN MANUALLY SUBMITTED TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE FOR FILING (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 1321 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART 895 Apple's Motion for an Adverse Inference Jury Instruction, by Judge Paul S. Grewal (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012).
July 25, 2012 1320 Proposed Order re 1318 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Dkt. Nos. 927, 991, 1013, 1022, 1060, and 1206 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 25, 2012 1319 Declaration of GiHo Ro in Support of 1318 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Dkt. Nos. 927, 991, 1013, 1022, 1060, and 1206 filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Prashanth Chennakesavan, # 2 Exhibit to Chennakesavan Declaration)(Related document(s) 1318 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 24, 2012 1329 Minute Entry: Interim Pretrial Conference (Date Filed: 7/24/2012). Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/24/2012)
July 24, 2012 1318 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Dkt. Nos. 927, 991, 1013, 1022, 1060, and 1206 filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Samsung's Motion)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 24, 2012 1317 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Renewed Motion to Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 3 Declaration of Nathan Sabri, # 4 Declaration of Erica Tierney)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 24, 2012 1316 Statement APPLE'S DISCLAIMER OF OPPOSITION TO UNSEALING OF TRIAL BRIEFS by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 24, 2012 1315 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1269 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Unredacted Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay June 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. No. 1147) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 24, 2012 1314 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1269 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Unredacted Declaration of Mark Tung in Support of Samsung's Conditional Motion for Relief (Dkt. No. 953) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 6, # 5 Exhibit 7, # 6 Exhibit 8, # 7 Exhibit 9, # 8 Exhibit 11, # 9 Exhibit 12, # 10 Exhibit 13, # 11 Exhibit 14, # 12 Exhibit 15)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 24, 2012 1313 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1269 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Unredacted Motion for Leave to Seek Reconsideration of Court's June 25, 2012 Order (Dkt. No. 1132) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Watson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Watson Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Watson Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Watson Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 10 to Watson Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 12 to Watson Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 13 to Watson Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 14 to Watson Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 20 to Watson Declaration)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 24, 2012 1312 Featured Case Declaration of Mark Tung in Support of 1269 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Kohi> filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 6, # 5 Exhibit 7, # 6 Exhibit 8, # 7 Exhibit 9, # 8 Exhibit 11, # 9 Exhibit 12, # 10 Exhibit 13, # 11 Exhibit 14, # 12 Exhibit 15)(Related document(s) 1296 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/24/2012) Modified on 7/25/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2012 1311 RESPONSE to re 1269 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, APPLE INC.'S OPPOSITION TO SAMSUNG'S MOTION TO STAY AND SUSPEND THE JUNE 26, 2012 PRELMINARY INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL OR, ALTERNATIVELY, PENDING DECISION BY FEDERAL CIRCUIT ON STAY PENDING APPEAL by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 24, 2012 1310 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Objections to Translations filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 24, 2012 1309 RESPONSE to re 1269 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, APPLE'S OPPOSITION TO SAMSUNG'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SEEK RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S MAY 21, 2012 ORDER by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 24, 2012 1308 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1306 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 24, 2012 1307 JOINT LIST OF WITNESSES, DEPONENTS, ATTORNEYS AND LAW FIRMS by Apple Inc.(a California corporation), Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/24/2012) Modified text on 8/8/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2012 1306 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING JOINT GLOSSARY OF TERMS filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 24, 2012 1305 Featured Case ORDER Regarding List of Attorneys Law Firms and Witnesses. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/24/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 24, 2012 1304 OBJECTIONS to re 1289 Statement, Samsung's Objections to Apple's Proposed Design Patent Addendum to "An Introduction to the Patent System" by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 24, 2012 1303 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1302 Stipulation re Equipment (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 24, 2012 1302 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Permitting Use of Equipment in the Courtroom filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 24, 2012 1301 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 1299 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Apple's Trial Brief (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 24, 2012 1300 TRIAL BRIEF [Public Redacted Version] by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joby Martin, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 9)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/24/2012) Modified on 8/8/2012 EXHIBIT 5, 6 AND 8 HAVE NOT MANUALLY SUBMITTED TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE FOR FILING (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2012 1298 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Trial Brief and Exhibits to the Declaration of Joby Martin filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 23, 2012 1299 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Apple's Trial Brief filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Apples Trial Brief)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1297 MOTION for Reconsideration Samsung's Motion For Reconsideration and Objections to Trial Limitations filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion For Reconsideration)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1296 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Final Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/23/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1295 Tentative Preliminary Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/23/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1294 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 1244 Notice (Other) Apples Corrected Notice Of Amended Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1293 Featured Case ORDER Striking Appendix A. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/23/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1292 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Jury Notebooks. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/23/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1291 Statement (Joint) Regarding Use of Representative Products at Trial by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1290 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 1244 Notice (Other) Apples Notice Of Amended Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1289 Statement Apple's Submission Regarding Proposed Design Patent Supplement to the Federal Judicial Center's Patent Video by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1288 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Third Party Sealing Motions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/23/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1287 EXHIBITS re 1189 Pretrial Conference Statement, Apple's Revised Deposition Designation List (Exhibit 3 to Joint Pretrial Conference Statement) filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1189 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1286 Exhibit List Apple's Revised Exhibit List by Apple Inc... (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1285 EXHIBITS re 1189 Pretrial Conference Statement, Samsung's Revised Exhibit 6 to Pretrial Conference Statement and Proposed Order filed bySamsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 1189 ) (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1284 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. re 1245 Notice (Other), Samsung's Amended Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1283 Proposed Form of Verdict by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) Samsung's Revised Proposed Special Verdict Form. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1282 RESPONSE (re 1258 MOTION Motion to Clarify Portions of the Court's June 30, 2012 Order Denying Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment re 1158 Order ) filed byApple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1281 Exhibit List Joint Exhibit List by Apple Inc... (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1280 Proposed Form of Verdict by Apple Inc. APPLE'S FIRST REVISED DRAFT OF PROPOSED SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1279 Proposed Jury Instructions by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) Samsungs Revised Disputed Jury Instruction No. 59 re Willful Patent Infringement. (Attachments: # 1 Samsungs Revised Disputed Jury Instruction No. 79 re Trade Dress Dilution - Actual Notice)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1278 EXHIBITS re 1189 Pretrial Conference Statement, 1193 Exhibits, Ex. 4, Samsung's Second Amended Witness List filed bySamsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Related document(s) 1189 , 1193 ) (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1277 Statement Joint Case Narrowing Statement by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1276 RESPONSE (re 1274 MOTION for Leave to File Apples Administrative Motion For Leave To File Statement Regarding July 18, 2012 Pretrial Conference ) Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Statement Regarding July 18, 2012 Pretrial Conference filed bySamsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 22, 2012 1275 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan Identifying Samsung's Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to July 11, 2012 Order filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan Identifying Samsung's Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to July 11, 2012 Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/22/2012)
July 21, 2012 1274 MOTION for Leave to File Apples Administrative Motion For Leave To File Statement Regarding July 18, 2012 Pretrial Conference filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Jason R. Bartlett In Support Of Apples Administrative Motion For Leave To File Statement Regarding July 18, 2012 Pretrial Conference, # 2 Exhibit A)(Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 7/21/2012)
July 20, 2012 1273 OBJECTIONS to re 1244 Notice (Other) Samsung's Objections to Apple's Discovery Designations by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 20, 2012 1272 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07-18-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 20, 2012 1271 OBJECTIONS to re 1243 Notice (Other), Samsung's Discovery Designations by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 20, 2012 1270 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1116 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 20, 2012 1269 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 953 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1033 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1035 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1039 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document; denying 1080 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document; denying 1123 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document; denying 1132 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1150 Motion ; denying 1160 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 20, 2012 1268 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Glossary of Terms. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/20/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 20, 2012 1266 Featured Case ORDER Construing Disputed Claim Terms. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/20/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 19, 2012 1267 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/18/2012 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 7/19/2012). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/19/2012)
July 19, 2012 1265 NOTICE of Appearance by Xinying Valerian (Valerian, Xinying) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 19, 2012 1264 Proposed Jury Instructions by Apple Inc. CORRECTED JOINT PROPOSED DISPUTED JURY INSTRUCTION NO. 69. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 18, 2012 1263 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1259 Motion to Shorten Time (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 18, 2012 1262 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Krevans (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 18, 2012 1261 Statement Apples Proposed Agenda For Case Management Conference by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 17, 2012 1260 Proposed Order re 1258 MOTION Motion to Clarify Portions of the Court's June 30, 2012 Order Denying Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment re 1158 Order by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 1259 MOTION to Shorten Time re Motion to Clarify Portions of the Court's June 30, 2012 Order Denying Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Cashman Declaration, # 2 Ex. 1, # 3 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 1258 MOTION Motion to Clarify Portions of the Court's June 30, 2012 Order Denying Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment re 1158 Order filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 7/20/2012. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 1257 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1247 Motion to Intervene (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 1256 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 847 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 925 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 927 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 930 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 991 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 997 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1004 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1007 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1013 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1020 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1022 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1023 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1024 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1052 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1059 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1060 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1061 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1063 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1069 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1089 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1090 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1122 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1139 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1140 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1179 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1183 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1185 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1186 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1201 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1206 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1208 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1233 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 1255 Declaration of Cyndi Wheeler in Support of 1201 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Claim Construction Brief, 1208 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Oppositions to Apple's Motions in Limine filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 1201 , 1208 ) (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 1254 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Permitting Use of Equipment in the Courtroom - Hearing on Claim Construction filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 1253 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 1232 Proposed Jury Instructions Joint Notice Regarding Disputed Proposed Jury Instructions (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 1252 CLERKS NOTICE RE CHANGE OF LOCATION OF 7/18/2012 HEARING. Judge Koh's calendar for Wednesday, July 18, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. has been relocated to Courtroom 1 on the 5th Floor. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 1247 MOTION to Intervene Third-Party Reuters America LLC's Unopposed Administrative Motion to Intervene; Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012) Modified text on 7/17/2012 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2012 1250 Featured Case ORDER Continuing Hearing on Design Patent Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/17/2012. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 1248 OPPOSITION to (re 1183 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Claim Construction Brief, 1186 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apples Opening Supplemental Claim Construction Brief, 1201 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Claim Construction Brief, 1208 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Oppositions to Apple's Motions in Limine, 1206 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1179 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply In Support of Opening Memorandum re Claim Construction, 1233 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Thomas Watson in Support of Samsung's Proposed Jury Instructions, 1184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Apples Motions In Limine, 1185 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Objections to Apple's Exhibit List, Proposed Joint Exhibit List and Deposition Designations ) Third-Party Reuters America LLC's Opposition to Various Administrative Motions to Seal filed byReuters America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/17/2012) Modified text on 7/18/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2012 1247 MOTION to Intervene Third-Party Reuters America LLC's Unopposed Administrative Motion to Intervene filed by Reuters America LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 7/31/2012. Replies due by 8/7/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Karl Olson, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Karl Olson)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 1246 NOTICE of Change of Address by Victor F. Souto (Souto, Victor) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 16, 2012 1245 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) Samsung's Initial Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Samsung's Initial Deposition Designations)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 16, 2012 1244 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Apple Inc.s Identification Of Deposition Designations And Other Discovery To Be Offered At Trial (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 16, 2012 1243 Discovery Designations by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/16/2012) Modified text on 7/17/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2012 1242 OPPOSITION to ( 1216 MOTION Samsung's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 1144 Order Granting-in-Part and Denying-in-Part Motionis to Strike Expert Reports ) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Raymond M. Hasu In Support Of Apples Opposition To Samsungs Motion For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order Of Magistrate Judge, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2012) Modified text on 7/17/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2012 1241 Proposed Disputed Jury Instructions by Apple Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2012) Modified text on 7/17/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2012 1239 NOTICE of Change of Address by Benjamin Laban Singer (Singer, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 16, 2012 1238 Proposed Disputed Jury Instructions at the Close of Evidence, In Order by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/16/2012) Modified text on 7/17/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2012 1237 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. re 1236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Objections to Apple's Exhibit List, Proposed Joint Exhibit List and Deposition Designations (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 13, 2012 1236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Objections to Apple's Exhibit List, Proposed Joint Exhibit List and Deposition Designations filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Trac Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Samsung's Objections, # 4 Ex. A, # 5 Ex. B, # 6 Ex. C, # 7 Ex. D)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/13/2012) Modified on 7/16/2012 Pursuant to General Order No. 62 attachment #1 Sealed (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2012 1235 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. re 1233 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Thomas Watson in Support of Samsung's Proposed Jury Instructions (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 13, 2012 1234 OBJECTIONS to re 1189 Pretrial Conference Statement, 1193 Exhibits, 1195 Exhibits, 1224 Exhibits, Objections to the Use of Depositions, Exhibits, or the Admissibility of Materials Identified in Samsung's Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 13, 2012 1233 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Thomas Watson in Support of Samsung's Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Watson Declaration, # 3 Ex. A, # 4 Ex. B, # 5 Ex. C, # 6 Ex. D)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 13, 2012 1232 Proposed Jury Instructions by Apple Inc. (DISPUTED) JOINT PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 13, 2012 1231 Proposed Jury Instructions by Apple Inc. (UNDISPUTED) JOINT PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 13, 2012 1230 NOTICE of Change of Address by David B Bassett (Bassett, David) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 13, 2012 1229 Declaration of Bill Trac in Support of 1184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Apples Motions In Limine filed bySamsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Related document(s) 1184 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 12, 2012 1228 Declaration of Hankil Kang in Support of 1184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Apples Motions In Limine filed bySamsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 1184 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 12, 2012 1227 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Samsung's Motion for Relief. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/12/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 12, 2012 1226 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1205 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 12, 2012 1225 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1221 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 12, 2012 1224 CORRECTED EXHIBIT 6 re 1189 Pretrial Conference Statement, 1193 Exhibits, 1195 Exhibits, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1189 , 1193 , 1195 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/12/2012) Modified text on 7/13/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2012 1223 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeremy Winer (Winer, Jeremy) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 12, 2012 1222 Declaration of Cyndi Wheeler in Support of 1183 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Claim Construction Brief, 1185 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 1183 , 1185 ) (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 12, 2012 1221 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Stipulated and Disputed Jury Instructions Filing Deadline filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jon Steiger in Support of Joint Stipulation)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 12, 2012 1220 Declaration of Bill Trac in Support of 1186 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apples Opening Supplemental Claim Construction Brief filed bySamsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 1186 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 11, 2012 1219 Proposed Form of Verdict by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) Samsung's Proposed Form of Verdict. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 11, 2012 1218 Proposed Form of Verdict by Apple Inc. . (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 11, 2012 1217 Proposed Voir Dire by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) . (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 11, 2012 1216 MOTION Samsung's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 1144 Order Granting-in-Part and Denying-in-Part Motionis to Strike Expert Reports filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. Responses due by 7/25/2012. Replies due by 8/1/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Martin Decl., # 2 Ex. 1, # 3 Ex. 2, # 4 Ex. 3, # 5 Ex. 4, # 6 Ex. 5, # 7 Ex. 6, # 8 Ex. 7, # 9 Ex. 8, # 10 Ex. 9, # 11 Ex. 10, # 12 Ex. 11, # 13 Ex. 12, # 14 Ex. 13, # 15 Ex. 14, # 16 Ex. 15, # 17 Ex. 16, # 18 Ex. 17, # 19 Ex. 18, # 20 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 11, 2012 1215 Proposed Voir Dire by Apple Inc. Apples Proposed Voir Dire Questions. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 11, 2012 1214 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Scope of Depositions filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 11, 2012 1213 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART APPLE'S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE APRIL 12 ORDER; GRANTING-IN-PART SAMSUNG'S MOTION TO ENFORCE THE APRIL 12 ORDER; GRANTING-IN- PART SAMSUNG'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, re 965 Samsung's Motion to Enforce April 12, 2012 Order, 968 Samsung's MOTION for Sanctions and 885 Apples Administrative Motion For Clarification Of April 12 Order. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 7/11/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 11, 2012 1212 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 1206 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 11, 2012 1211 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1208 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Oppositions to Apple's Motions in Limine, 1209 Declaration in Support,,, (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 11, 2012 1210 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1185 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 10, 2012 1251 USCA for the Federal Circuit Preliminary Notice of Docketing re 1138 Notice of Appeal by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Docket No. 12-1506 has been assigned.(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 1209 Declaration of John D'Amato in Support of 1208 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Oppositions to Apple's Motions in Limine filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to the D'Amato Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B to the D'Amato Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C to the D'Amato Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D to the D'Amato Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E to the D'Amato Declaration, # 6 Exhibit F to the D'Amato Declaration, # 7 Exhibit G to the D'Amato Declaration, # 8 Exhibit H to the D'Amato Declaration, # 9 Exhibit I to the D'Amato Declaration, # 10 Exhibit J to the D'Amato Declaration)(Related document(s) 1208 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 1208 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Oppositions to Apple's Motions in Limine filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Hankil Kang in Support of Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Samsung's Oppositions to Apple's Motions in Limine, # 4 Proposed Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Apple's Motions in Limine)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/10/2012) Modified on 7/12/2012 Pursuant to General Order No. 62 attachment #1 Sealed (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2012 1207 Proposed Order re 1206 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 1206 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 [Public] Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motions in Limine, # 2 Declaration of Joseph Kanada, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 11, # 5 Exhibit 13, # 6 Exhibit 14, # 7 Exhibit 15, # 8 Errata 16, # 9 Exhibit 17, # 10 Exhibit 18, # 11 Exhibit 19, # 12 Exhibit 20, # 13 Exhibit 21, # 14 Exhibit 22, # 15 Exhibit 23, # 16 Exhibit 24, # 17 Exhibit 25, # 18 Exhibit 26, # 19 Exhibit 27, # 20 Exhibit 28, # 21 Exhibit 29, # 22 Exhibit 30, # 23 Exhibit 31, # 24 Exhibit 32, # 25 Exhibit 33, # 26 Exhibit 34, # 27 Exhibit 35, # 28 Exhibit 36, # 29 Exhibit 37, # 30 Exhibit 38, # 31 Exhibit 39, # 32 Exhibit 40)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 1205 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Authenticity of Documents filed by Apple Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 1204 Declaration of Deok Keun Matthew Ahn in Support of 1203 Claim Construction Statement filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 1203 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 1203 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT APPLE'S REBUTTAL SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 1202 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. re 1201 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Claim Construction Brief (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 1201 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Claim Construction Brief filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Trac Declaration in Support of Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Claim Construction Brief)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/10/2012) Modified on 7/12/2012 attachment #1 Sealed pursuant to General Order No. 62 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2012 1200 NOTICE Regarding Proposed Video Recording.(cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 1199 Proposed Order re 1179 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply In Support of Opening Memorandum re Claim Construction by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cyndi Wheeler ISO of Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Docs Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit One to Declaration of Cyndi Wheeler)(Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 1198 Proposed Voir Dire by Apple Inc. Joint Jury Questionnaire. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 9, 2012 1197 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/9/12. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 9, 2012 1196 EXHIBITS re 1194 Declaration in Support,, filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1194 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 9, 2012 1195 EXHIBITS re 1189 Pretrial Conference Statement, 1193 Exhibits, Corrected Exhibit 6 filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1189 , 1193 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 9, 2012 1194 Declaration of Hankil Kang in Support of 1160 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Regarding Apples Opposition To Samsungs Motion To Stay And Suspend The June 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal Or, Alternatively, Pending Decision By Federal Circuit On Stay Pending App filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal)(Related document(s) 1160 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 7, 2012 1193 EXHIBITS re 1189 Pretrial Conference Statement Corrected Exhibits 2 and 6, and Amended Exhibit 4 filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 1189 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/7/2012)
July 6, 2012 1192 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING SAMSUNG'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS JUNE 21, 2012 ORDER (DKT. NO. 1115), DENYING SAMSUNG'S REQUEST TO STAY, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, AND TO SEAL DOCUMENTS by Judge Paul S. Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 6, 2012 1191 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE RE ARGUMENTS MADE AT JUNE 21 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 1119 Motion for Leave to File (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 6, 2012 1190 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. re 1183 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Claim Construction Brief (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 6, 2012 1189 Joint Pretrial Conference Statement and Proposed Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/6/2012) Modified text on 7/9/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2012 1188 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 1186 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apples Opening Supplemental Claim Construction Brief (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 6, 2012 1187 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 1184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Apples Motions In Limine (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 5, 2012 1186 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apples Opening Supplemental Claim Construction Brief filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order Granting Apple Inc.s Administrative Motion To File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Apples Opening Supplemental Claim Construction Brief, # 3 Declaration Of Ravin Balakrishnan, Ph.D., In Support Of Apples Opening Supplemental Claim Construction Brief, # 4 Declaration Of Deok Keun Matthew Ahn In Support Of, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 5, 2012 1185 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Hankil Kang in Support of Samsung's Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Samsung's Motions in Limine, # 4 Declaration of John D'Amato, # 5 Exhibit A to the D'Amato Declaration, # 6 Exhibit B to the D'Amato Declaration, # 7 Exhibit C to the D'Amato Declaration, # 8 Exhibit D to the D'Amato Declaration, # 9 Exhibit E to the D'Amato Declaration, # 10 Exhibit F to the D'Amato Declaration, # 11 Exhibit G to the D'Amato Declaration, # 12 Exhibit H to the D'Amato Declaration, # 13 Exhibit I to the D'Amato Declaration, # 14 Exhibit J to the D'Amato Declaration, # 15 Exhibit K to the D'Amato Declaration, # 16 Exhibit L to the D'Amato Declaration, # 17 Exhibit M to the D'Amato Declaration, # 18 Exhibit N to the D'Amato Declaration, # 19 Exhibit O to the D'Amato Declaration, # 20 Exhibit P to the D'Amato Declaration, # 21 Exhibit Q to the D'Amato Declaration, # 22 Exhibit R to the D'Amato Declaration, # 23 Exhibit S to the D'Amato Declaration, # 24 Exhibit T to the D'Amato Declaration, # 25 Exhibit U to the D'Amato Declaration, # 26 Exhibit V to the D'Amato Declaration, # 27 Exhibit W to the D'Amato Declaration, # 28 Exhibit X to the D'Amato Declaration, # 29 Exhibit Y to the D'Amato Declaration, # 30 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motions in Limine)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 5, 2012 1184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Apples Motions In Limine filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Cyndi Wheeler In Support Of Apples Administrative Motions To File Documents Under Seal Re Apples Motions In Limine, # 2 [Proposed] Order Granting Apple Inc.s Administrative Motion To File Documents Under Seal Re Apples Motions In Limine, # 3 Apples Motions In Limine, # 4 Declaration Of Jason Bartlett In Support Of Apples Motions In Limine, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 5, 2012 1183 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Claim Construction Brief filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Trac Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Samsung's Claim Construction Brief, # 4 Schmidt Declaration in Support of Claim Construction Brief, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 4, 2012 1182 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 1179 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply In Support of Opening Memorandum re Claim Construction (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/4/2012)
July 3, 2012 1181 Declaration of Bill Trac in Support of 1140 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 1140 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 3, 2012 1180 Declaration of Hankil Kang in Support of 1140 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 1140 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 3, 2012 1179 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply In Support of Opening Memorandum re Claim Construction filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Trac Declaration In Support Of Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order re Motion to Seal, # 3 Samsung's Reply In Support of Opening Memorandum re Claim Construction, # 4 Barach Declaration In Support Of Samsung's Reply, # 5 Barach Decl. Ex. 1, # 6 Barach Decl. Ex. 2, # 7 Barach Decl. Ex. 3)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 3, 2012 1178 Statement Joint Case Narrowing Statement by Apple Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 3, 2012 1177 REPLY (re 1089 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Apples Reply Regarding Design Patent Claim Construction filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Jason R. Bartlett In Support Of Apples Reply Regarding Design Patent Claim Construction, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 3, 2012 1176 Declaration of Cyndi Wheeler in Support of 1132 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Stay June 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal, 1139 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Claim Construction Brief filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 1132 , 1147 , 1139 ) (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 3, 2012 1175 Proposed Order re 1132 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Stay June 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal, 1139 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Claim Construction Brief [Proposed] Order Granting Samsung's Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 3, 2012 1174 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 3, 2012 1173 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 2, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing re 1167 Motion Hearing, Case Management Conference - Further, Set Hearings Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/24/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 1172 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) Apple's Notice of Prior Art Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282 (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 1171 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Mailing, # 2 Certificate of Mailing)(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 1170 Featured Case ORDER Denying Samsung's Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/2/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 1169 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Jury Selection. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/2/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 1168 NOTICE of REQUEST TO VIDEO RECORD July 30, 2012 Jury Trial as Part of the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. NO LATER THAN JULY 9, 2012, all parties must complete the attached Party Response to Request for Video Recording, and email it to cameras@cand.uscourts.gov. Further information about the Pilot Project may be found at http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachment: Party Response to Request for Video Recording) (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 1167 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/29/2012 before Judge Lucy H. KOh (Date Filed: 7/2/2012) re 927 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., 940 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.s Administrative Motion To File Documents Under Seal Re Apples Motion To Exclude Testimony Of Samsungs Experts filed by Apple Inc., Further Case Management Conference held on 6/29/2012 before Judge Lucy H. KOh (Date Filed: 7/2/2012). Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/24/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 1166 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06-29-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/1/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 1165 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06-21-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/1/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 1164 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06-21-12, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/1/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 1163 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06-19-12, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/1/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 30, 2012 1162 Declaration of Bill Trac in Support of 1125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Regarding Apples Administrative Motion For Leave To File Objection To Reply Evidence filed bySamsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Related document(s) 1125 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/30/2012)
June 30, 2012 1161 RESPONSE (re 1147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Stay June 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal ) Apple Inc.s Opposition To Samsungs Motion To Stay And Suspend The June 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal Or, Alternatively, Pending Decision By Federal Circuit On Stay Pending Appeal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Jason R. Bartlett In Support Of Apple Inc.s Opposition To Samsungs Motion To Stay And Suspend The June 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal Or, Alternatively, Pending Decision By Federal Circuit On Stay Pending Appeal, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Proposed Order)(McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 6/30/2012)
June 30, 2012 1160 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Regarding Apples Opposition To Samsungs Motion To Stay And Suspend The June 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal Or, Alternatively, Pending Decision By Federal Circuit On Stay Pending Appeal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/30/2012)
June 30, 2012 1159 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Mailing, # 2 Certificate of Mailing)(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2012)
June 30, 2012 1158 Featured Case ORDER Denying Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/29/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2012)
June 30, 2012 1157 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/29/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2012)
June 29, 2012 1156 Featured Case ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/29/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2012)
June 28, 2012 1155 JOINT STIPULATION and REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION and PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Pre-Trial Disclosures filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/28/2012) Modified text on 6/28/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2012 1154 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1146 Motion to Shorten Time (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 28, 2012 1153 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1150 MOTION for Extension of Time and to Seal Documents re 1024 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Re Apples Opposition To Samsungs Motion For Summary Judgment, 1022 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents R (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 28, 2012 1152 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1129 MOTION for Reconsideration re 1115 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,, 1105 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,, (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 28, 2012 1151 CLERKS NOTICE RE LOCATION FOR HEARING ON JUNE 29, 2012. THE MATTER WILL BE HEARD IN COURTROOM 1 ON THE 5TH FLOOR. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 28, 2012 1150 MOTION for Extension of Time and to Seal Documents re 1024 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Re Apples Opposition To Samsungs Motion For Summary Judgment, 1022 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Re Apples Opposition To Samsungs Motion For Summary Judgment, 1020 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Under Seal Re Apples Opposition To Samsungs Motion For Summary Judgment, 1023 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Re Apples Opposition To Samsungs Motion For Summary Judgment, 925 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 7,362,867 and Invalidity of U.S. Patent Numbers 7,456,893 and 7,577,460, 1013 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Under Seal Re Apples Opposition To Samsungs Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). Responses due by 7/2/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Samsung's Motion, # 2 Declaration of Anthony P. Alden in Support of Samsung's Motion, # 3 Exhibit 1 to the Alden Declaration, # 4 Declaration of Hankil Kang in Support of Samsung's Motion, # 5 Exhibit 1 to the Kang Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 2 to the Kang Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 3 to the Kang Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 4 to the Kang Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 5 to the Kang Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 6 to the Kang Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 7 to the Kang Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 8 to the Kang Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 9 to the Kang Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 10 to the Kang Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 11 to the Kang Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 12 to the Kang Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 13 to the Kang Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 14 to the Kang Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 15 to the Kang Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 16 to the Kang Declaration, # 21 Exhibit 17 to the Kang Declaration, # 22 Exhibit 18 to the Kang Declaration Pt. 1 of 5, # 23 Exhibit 18 to the Kang Declaration Pt. 2 of 5, # 24 Exhibit 18 to the Kang Declaration Pt. 3 of 5, # 25 Exhibit 18 to the Kang Declaration Pt. 4 of 5, # 26 Exhibit 18 to the Kang Declaration Pt. 5 of 5, # 27 Exhibit 19 to the Kang Declaration, # 28 Exhibit 20 to the Kang Declaration, # 29 Exhibit 21 to the Kang Declaration, # 30 Exhibit 22 to the Kang Declaration, # 31 Exhibit 23 to the Kang Declaration, # 32 Exhibit 24 to the Kang Declaration, # 33 Exhibit 25 to the Kang Declaration, # 34 Exhibit 26 to the Kang Declaration, # 35 Exhibit 27 to the Kang Declaration, # 36 Exhibit 28 to the Kang Declaration, # 37 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Miscellaneous Administrative Request)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 27, 2012 1149 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Stay June 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 27, 2012 1148 Proposed Order re 1147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Stay June 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 27, 2012 1147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Stay June 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Samsung's Motion to Stay June 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal (Public Redacted Version), # 2 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 27, 2012 1146 MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing On Samsung's Motion to Stay June 26, 2012 Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Victoria F. Maroulis, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion to Shorten Time)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 27, 2012 1145 BOND in the amount of $2,600,000.00 Posted Pursuant to 1135 Order Granting Preliminary Injunction by Apple Inc. (Olson, Erik) (Filed on 6/27/2012) Modified text on 6/28/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2012 1144 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART MOTIONS TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORTS re 934 and 939 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 6/27/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 27, 2012 1143 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of 940 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apples's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Samsungs Expert Itay Sherman Based on His Qualifications by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/27/2012) Modified text on 6/28/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2012 1142 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 1140 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 26, 2012 1141 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. re 1139 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Claim Construction Brief (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 26, 2012 1140 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Wheeler Declaration in Support of Administrative Motion, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of Jason R. Bartlett, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16, # 20 Exhibit 17, # 21 Exhibit 18, # 22 Exhibit 19, # 23 Exhibit 20, # 24 Exhibit 21, # 25 Exhibit 22, # 26 Exhibit 23, # 27 Exhibit 24, # 28 Exhibit 25, # 29 Exhibit 26, # 30 Exhibit 27, # 31 Public Declaration of Peter W. Bressler, # 32 Exhibit 1, # 33 Exhibit 2, # 34 Exhibit 3, # 35 Exhibit 4, # 36 Exhibit 5, # 37 Exhibit 6, # 38 Exhibit 7, # 39 Exhibit 8, # 40 Exhibit 9, # 41 Exhibit 10, # 42 Exhibit 11, # 43 Exhibit 12, # 44 Exhibit 13, # 45 Exhibit 14, # 46 Exhibit 15, # 47 Exhibit 16, # 48 Exhibit 17, # 49 Exhibit 18, # 50 Exhibit 19, # 51 Exhibit 20, # 52 Exhibit 21, # 53 Exhibit 22, # 54 Exhibit 23, # 55 Exhibit 24, # 56 Exhibit 25, # 57 Exhibit 26, # 58 Exhibit 27, # 59 Exhibit 28, # 60 Exhibit 29, # 61 Exhibit 30, # 62 Exhibit 31, # 63 Exhibit 32, # 64 Exhibit 33, # 65 Exhibit 34, # 66 Exhibit 35, # 67 Exhibit 36, # 68 Exhibit 37, # 69 Exhibit 38, # 70 Exhibit 39, # 71 Exhibit 40, # 72 Exhibit 41, # 73 Exhibit 42, # 74 Exhibit 43, # 75 Exhibit 44, # 76 Exhibit 45, # 77 Exhibit 46, # 78 Exhibit 47, # 79 Exhibit 48, # 80 Exhibit 49, # 81 Exhibit 50, # 82 Exhibit 51, # 83 Exhibit 52, # 84 Exhibit 53, # 85 Exhibit 54, # 86 Exhibit 55, # 87 Exhibit 56, # 88 Exhibit 57, # 89 Exhibit 58, # 90 Exhibit 59, # 91 Exhibit 60, # 92 Exhibit 61, # 93 Exhibit 62, # 94 Exhibit 63, # 95 Exhibit 64, # 96 Exhibit 65, # 97 Exhibit 66, # 98 Exhibit 67, # 99 Exhibit 68, # 100 Exhibit 69, # 101 Exhibit 70, # 102 Exhibit 71, # 103 Exhibit 72, # 104 Exhibit 73, # 105 Exhibit 74, # 106 Exhibit 75, # 107 Exhibit 76, # 108 Exhibit 77)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/26/2012) Modified on 6/27/2012 pursuant to General Order No. 62, attachment #1 sealed (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2012 1139 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Claim Construction Brief filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Trac Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Claim Construction Brief, # 4 Cashman Declaration in Support of Samsung's Opposition, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/26/2012) Modified on 6/27/2012 pursuant to General order No. 62, attachment #1 sealed (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2012 1138 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to 1135 Order by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0971-6923684. Appeal Record due by 7/26/2012. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 26, 2012 1137 Declaration of Susan Kare in Support of 1136 Response ( Non Motion ) Declaration of Susan Kare in Support of Apple's Response to Samsung's Opening Memorandum Regarding Design Patent Claim Construction filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 1136 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 26, 2012 1136 RESPONSE to re 1090 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE'S RESPONSE TO SAMSUNG'S OPENING MEMORANDUM REGARDING DESIGN PATENT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 26, 2012 1135 Featured Case ORDER Granting Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/26/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 26, 2012 1134 CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT FOR THE UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT 2012-1105: This cause having been heard and considered, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: AFFIRMED IN PART, VACATED IN PART, and REMANDED. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012) (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2012 1133 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1132 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 26, 2012 1132 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Samsung's Motion For Leave to Seek Reconsideration of the Court's June 25, 2012 Order (Public Redacted Version), # 2 Declaration of Thomas Watson, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion For Leave to Seek Reconsideration)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 25, 2012 1131 Featured Case ORDER Regarding June 25, 2012 Hearing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/25/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 25, 2012 1130 Featured Case OPINION AND JUDGMENT OF THE UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT 2012-1105 Affirmed in Part, Vacated in Part, and Remanded ***Appeal Terminated: 460 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Apple Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012) (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2012 1129 MOTION for Reconsideration re 1115 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,, 1105 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Samsung's Motion, # 2 Declaration of Hankil Kang in Support of Samsung's Motion, # 3 Exhibit 1 to the Kang Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 2 to the Kang Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 3 to the Kang Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 4 to the Kang Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 5 to the Kang Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 6 to the Kang Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 7 to the Kang Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 8 to the Kang Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 9 to the Kang Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 10 to the Kang Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 11 to the Kang Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 12 to the Kang Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 13 to the Kang Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 14 to the Kang Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 15 to the Kang Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 16 to the Kang Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 17 to the Kang Declaration, # 20 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Motion for Reconsideration)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 23, 2012 1128 RESPONSE (re 1119 MOTION for Leave to File Apple Inc.s Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Response Re Arguments Made At June 21 Hearing ) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/23/2012)
June 23, 2012 1127 RESPONSE (re 1121 MOTION for Leave to File Apples Administrative Motion For Leave To File Objection To Reply Evidence ) Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Objection to Reply Evidence filed bySamsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/23/2012)
June 22, 2012 1126 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 1125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Regarding Apples Administrative Motion For Leave To File Objection To Reply Evidence filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 1124 Proposed Order re 1123 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document re [DOCKET NO. 1121-1] Granting Apples Motion To Remove Incorrectly Filed Document [Docket No. 1121-1] by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 1123 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document re [DOCKET NO. 1121-1] filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 1122 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Regarding Apples Administrative Motion For Leave To File Objection To Reply Evidence filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 1121 *** EXHIBIT A FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. *** MOTION for Leave to File Objection To Reply Evidence filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Declaration Of Jason R. Bartlett In Support Of Apples Administrative Motion For Leave To File Objection To Reply Evidence, # 3 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/22/2012) Modified on 6/25/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 6/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2012 1119 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Response Re Arguments Made At June 21 Hearing filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Jason R. Bartlett In Support Of Apples Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Response Re Arguments Made At June 21 Hearing, # 2 Declaration Of Nathan Sabri In Support Of Apples Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Response Re Arguments Made At June 21 Hearing, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/22/2012) Modified text on 6/27/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2012 1118 Minute Entry: Telephonic Hearing on Samsungs Motion for Limited Stay of Courts June 21, 2012 Order held. The court stays 6/21/2012 order for purpose of allowing Samsung to file motion for reconsideration. Motion to be filed no later than 6/25/2012 by 9:00 a.m. and is to be directed to Judge Grewal. (Date Filed: 6/22/2012). (Court Reporter FTR: (1:31 to 1:40.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 1117 MOTION for a Limited Stay of the Court's June 21, 2012 Order filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). Responses due by 6/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anthony P. Alden, # 2 Exhibit A to the Alden Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Emergency Miscellaneous Administrative Request)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 21, 2012 1120 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2012 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 6/21/2012) re 930 Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., 925 Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 7,362,867 and Invalidity of U.S. Patent Numbers 7,456,893 and 7,577,460 filed by Apple Inc.. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 1116 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Dismissing Claims Concerning U.S. Patent No. D617,334 Without Prejudice filed by Apple Inc.. (McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 1115 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 1109 MOTION TO STAY ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL, FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME, AND TO SEAL DOCUMENTS entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Even as it acknowledges that it did not file any timely declaration pursuant to Civ. L.R. 79-5(d) justifying the sealing of the documents at issue in the underlying motion, Samsung now asks this court to seal many of those same documents without complying--again-- with that same rule. Rule 79-5(d) is explicit in requiring that any proposed order be "narrowly tailored" to avoid depriving the public of access to material that it is entitled to see. Samsung's request fails this test. In particular, sections of various exhibits that give rise to no discernible proprietary interest at all are requested to be kept from the public eye. See, e.g. Docket No. 799, Ex. 5 at 9 (noting Samsung's sponsorships of the NFL and NASCAR and community activities); Ex. 9 at 2 (announcing vacation plans); and Ex. 12 at 5 (quoting well-known management expert Peter Drucker). This standard may be exacting, but it is necessary in light of the Ninth Circuit's direction that public access must be respected unless truly unwarranted. Given Samsung's repeated disregard for the rule, this court's previous guidance to Samsung in response to its request to seal transcripts, and the pressing need to turn to other, more substantial disputes in this case, the court must decline the invitation to give Samsung yet another chance. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 21, 2012 1114 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 6/21/2012) re 965 Samsung's Motion to Enforce April 12, 2012 Order, 934 Samsung's Motion to Strike, 895 Apple's Motion for Adverse Inference Jury Instructions, 968 Samsung's MOTION for Sanctions, 939 Apple's Motion to Strike and 885 Apples Motion For Clarification Of April 12, 2012 Order. The Court takes matters under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/21/2012)
June 20, 2012 1113 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice Of Intent To Dismiss Claims Concerning U.S. Patent No. D617,334 Without Prejudice (McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 1112 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING TIME ON 6/21/2012 MOTIONS: 6/21/2012 10:00 AM Motions (In Re: Docket Nos. 885 , 895 , 934 , 939 , 965 and 968 ) reset to 9:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 1111 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1107 Stipulation (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 1110 Declaration of Hankil Kang filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 1109 MOTION TO STAY ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, AND TO SEAL DOCUMENTS filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). Responses due by 7/5/2012. Replies due by 7/12/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anthony Alden, # 2 Declaration of Hankil Kang, # 3 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 19, 2012 1108 Declaration of Cyndi Wheeler in Support of 1088 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1090 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 [Proposed] Order Granting Samsungs Administrative Motion To File Documents Under Seal Re Samsungs Opening Memorandum Regarding Claim Construction, # 5 [Proposed] Order Granting Samsungs Administrative Motion To File Documents Under Seal Re Samsungs Reply In Support Of Motion For Sanctions)(Related document(s) 1088 , 1090 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 19, 2012 1107 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Permitting Use Of Equipment In The Courtroom filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 19, 2012 1106 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal GRANTING 922 Samsung's Motion for Clarification of the court's May 4, 2012 Order (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 19, 2012 1105 Featured Case ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal, denying 769 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 799 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 822 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 824 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 845 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 19, 2012 1104 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/19/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 6/19/2012) re 922 Samsung's Motion for Clarification Regarding the Court's May 4, 2012 Order. The Court takes matter under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/19/2012)
June 18, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 940 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.s Administrative Motion To File Documents Under Seal Re Apples Motion To Exclude Testimony Of Samsungs Experts, 927 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2012 01:30 PM before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
June 18, 2012 1103 Featured Case ORDER Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/18/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
June 17, 2012 1102 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 1101 (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/17/2012) Modified on 6/18/2012 linking entry to document # 1101 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2012 1101 NOTICE of Lodging of Corrected Exhibit B to the Declaration of Mia Mazza in Support of Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts by Apple Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/17/2012) Modified text on 6/18/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2012 1100 Declaration of Bill Trac in Support of 1056 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Declaration of Marc J. Pernick in Support of Apple's Motion to Strike Portions of Samsung's Expert Reports, 1052 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, 1059 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apply's Reply to Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain of Samsung's Experts filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1056 , 1052 , 1059 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 14, 2012 1099 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Apple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 14, 2012 1098 Declaration of Cyndi Wheeler in Support of 1061 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply In Support of Motion To Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts, 1067 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1060 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1069 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Trac Declaration in Support of Reply to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, 1074 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1063 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 1061 , 1067 , 1060 , 1069 , 1074 , 1063 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 14, 2012 1097 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING 6/26/2012 MOTION TO STRIKE: 6/26/2012 Motion to Strike (In Re: Docket No. 934 ) reset to 6/21/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 13, 2012 1096 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 1089 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 13, 2012 1095 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 13, 2012 1094 CLERKS NOTICE CHANGING COURTROOM LOCATION FOR MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUNE 21, 2012. THE MATTER WILL BE HEARD IN COURTROOM 1, FIFTH FLOOR. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 13, 2012 1093 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 27,2012, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Christine Bedard, Telephone number (925) 548-2789. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2012. (mz, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 13, 2012 1092 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1090 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1091 Declaration in Support,,,,, (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 13, 2012 1091 Declaration of Adam S. Cashman in Support of 1090 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8, # 8 Exhibit 9, # 9 Exhibit 10, # 10 Exhibit 11, # 11 Exhibit 12, # 12 Exhibit 13, # 13 Exhibit 16, # 14 Exhibit 21, # 15 Exhibit 22, # 16 Exhibit 23, # 17 Exhibit 24, # 18 Exhibit 26, # 19 Exhibit 27, # 20 Exhibit 28, # 21 Exhibit 29, # 22 Exhibit 30, # 23 Exhibit 31, # 24 Exhibit 32, # 25 Exhibit 33, # 26 Exhibit 34, # 27 Exhibit 35, # 28 Exhibit 36, # 29 Exhibit 37, # 30 Exhibit 38, # 31 Exhibit 39, # 32 Exhibit 40, # 33 Exhibit 41, # 34 Exhibit 42, # 35 Exhibit 43, # 36 Exhibit 44, # 37 Exhibit 45, # 38 Exhibit 46, # 39 Exhibit 47, # 40 Exhibit 48, # 41 Exhibit 49, # 42 Exhibit 50, # 43 Exhibit 51, # 44 Exhibit 52, # 45 Exhibit 53, # 46 Exhibit 54, # 47 Exhibit 55, # 48 Exhibit 56, # 49 Exhibit 57, # 50 Exhibit 58, # 51 Exhibit 59, # 52 Exhibit 60, # 53 Exhibit 61, # 54 Exhibit 52, # 55 Exhibit 63)(Related document(s) 1090 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 12, 2012 1090 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Samsung's Opening Claim Construction Memorandum)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 12, 2012 1089 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cyndi Wheeler, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 [Public] Apple's Opening Design Patent Claim Construction Brief, # 4 Declaration of Mia Mazza, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Errata 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6 Part 1, # 11 Exhibit 6 Part 2, # 12 Exhibit 6 Part 3, # 13 Exhibit 6 Part 4, # 14 Exhibit 7 Part 1, # 15 Exhibit 7 Part 2, # 16 Exhibit 8, # 17 Exhibit 9, # 18 Exhibit 10, # 19 Exhibit 11, # 20 Exhibit 12, # 21 Exhibit 13)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/12/2012) Modified on 6/13/2012. Pursuant to General Order No. 62, attachment #1 sealed (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2012 1088 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Reply in Support of Motion for Rule 37 Sanctions, # 3 Reply Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 12, 2012 1087 REPLY (re 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Enforce April 12, 2012 Order ) Samsung's Reply Brief In Support Of Motion To Enforce April 12 Order filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan In Support of Motion to Enforce April 12 Order, # 2 Exhibit A to Reply Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan In Support of Motion to Enforce April 12 Order, # 3 Exhibit B to Reply Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan In Support of Motion to Enforce April 12 Order, # 4 Exhibit C to Reply Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan In Support of Motion to Enforce April 12 Order, # 5 Exhibit D to Reply Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan In Support of Motion to Enforce April 12 Order, # 6 Exhibit E to Reply Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan In Support of Motion to Enforce April 12 Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 12, 2012 1086 Declaration of MIA MAZZA in Support of 1085 MOTION to Strike 1040 Opposition filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 1085 ) (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 6/12/2012) Modified text on 6/13/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2012 1085 MOTION to Strike 1040 Opposition to Notice of Motion for Clarification of April 12, 2012 Order, filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 6/26/2012. Replies due by 7/3/2012. (Bartlett, Jason) (Filed on 6/12/2012) Modified text on 6/13/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2012 1084 Declaration of Daniel Shim in Support of 1047 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Reply in Support of Motion for Adverse Inference Jury Instructions Due to Samsung's Spoliation of Evidence (Dkt. 895) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1047 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 12, 2012 1083 Declaration of CYNDI WHEELER in Support of 1044 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply In Support of Motion For Clarification of May 4, 2012 Order filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 1044 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 11, 2012 1082 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Thomas Watson In Support of Samsung's Motion For Leave To Seek Reconsideration of the Court's May 21, 2012 Order filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibit 11, # 8 Exhibit 15)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
June 11, 2012 1081 REDACTION Samsung's Motion For Leave To Seek Reconsideration of the Court's May 21, 2012 Order (Revised Redacted Version) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
June 11, 2012 1080 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
June 11, 2012 1079 OPPOSITION to Apple's Motion Pursuant to Rule 62(c) For Entry of Preliminary Injunction Without Further Hearing (Revised Redacted Version) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/11/2012) Modified text on 6/12/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2012 1078 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1067 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1074 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 1077 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 1060 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 1076 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) re 999 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 1075 Declaration of Todd Briggs in Support of 1067 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1074 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 1067 , 1074 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 1074 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, # 2 Declaration of Trevor Darrell in Support of Samsung's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Facts and Theories, # 3 Exhibit A to Darrell Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Darrell Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Darrell Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Darrell Declaration, # 7 Exhibit E to Darrell Declaration)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 1073 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 1059 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apply's Reply to Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain of Samsung's Experts (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 1072 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 1056 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Declaration of Marc J. Pernick in Support of Apple's Motion to Strike Portions of Samsung's Expert Reports (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 1071 Declaration of Bill Trac in Support of 1060 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1061 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply In Support of Motion To Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts, 1069 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Trac Declaration in Support of Reply to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, 1067 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1063 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySamsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Related document(s) 1060 , 1061 , 1069 , 1067 , 1063 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 1070 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. re 1069 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Trac Declaration in Support of Reply to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment, 1063 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 1069 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Trac Declaration in Support of Reply to Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 1068 Declaration of Bill Trac in Support of 1063 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySamsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28)(Related document(s) 1063 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 1067 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, # 2 Declaration of Brian von Herzen in Support of Samsung's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undisclosed Facts and Theories, # 3 Exhibit 1 to von Herzen Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 2 to von Herzen Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 3 to von Herzen Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 4 to von Herzen Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 5 to von Herzen Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 6 to von Herzen Declaration)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 1066 Supplemental Declaration of Adam Bogue in Support of 1063 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySamsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 1063 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/8/2012) Modified text on 6/11/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2012 1065 Declaration of Stephen Gray in Support of 1063 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySamsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Related document(s) 1063 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 1064 Declaration of Joby Martin in Support of 997 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Document Under Seal Re Apples Opposition To Samsungs Motion For Summary Judgment, 1004 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Under Seal Re Apples Opposition To Samsungs Motion For Summary Judgment, 991 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Re Apples Opposition To Samsungs Motion To Exclude Opinions Of Certain Of Apple Experts, 1035 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 1033 , 1033 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal)(Related document(s) 997 , 1004 , 991 , 1035 , 1033 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 7, 2012 1063 *** ATTACHMENT 2 FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply in Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Reply in Support of Samsung's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/7/2012) Modified on 6/8/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2012 1062 Declaration of Joby Martin in Support of 996 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Under Seal Re Apples Opposition To Samsungs Motion To Strike Expert Testimony filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Related document(s) 996 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 7, 2012 1061 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Reply In Support of Motion To Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Samsung's Reply In Support of Motion To Exclude Opinions of Certain of Apple's Experts, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Joby Martin, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Proposed Order Granting Samsung's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 7, 2012 1060 *** Declaration of Trevor Darrell in Support of Samsung's Reply and Exhibit D and E to Darrell Declaration FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. *** Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Samsung's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Expert Testimony Based on Undislcosed Facts and Theories, # 3 Declaration of Christopher E. Price in Support of Samsung's Reply, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Price Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Price Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Price Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Price Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 5 to Price Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 6 to Price Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 7 to Price Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 8 to Price Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 9 to Price Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 10 to Price Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 11 to Price Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 12 to Price Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 13 to Price Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 14 to Price Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 15 to Price Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 16 to Price Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 17 to Price Declaration, # 21 Exhibit 18 to Price Declaration, # 22 Exhibit 19 to Price Declaration, # 23 Exhibit 20 to Price Declaration, # 24 Exhibit 21 to Price Declaration, # 25 Exhibit 22 to Price Declaration, # 26 Exhibit 23 to Price Declaration, # 27 Exhibit 24 to Price Declaration, # 28 Exhibit 25 to Price Declaration, # 29 Exhibit 26 to Price Declaration, # 30 Exhibit 27 to Price Declaration, # 31 Exhibit 28 to Price Declaration, # 32 Exhibit 29 to Price Declaration, # 33 Exhibit 30 to Price Declaration, # 34 Exhibit 31 to Price Declaration, # 35 Declaration of Michael J. Wagner in Support of Samsung's Reply, # 36 Exhibit A to Wagner Declaration, # 37 Exhibit B to Wagner Declaration, # 38 Exhibit C to Wagner Declaration, # 39 Declaration of Trevor Darrell in Support of Samsung's Reply, # 40 Exhibit A to Darrell Declaration, # 41 Exhibit B to Darrell Declaration, # 42 Exhibit C to Darrell Declaration, # 43 Exhibit D to Darrell Declaration, # 44 Exhibit E to Darrell Declaration)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/7/2012) Modified on 6/8/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2012 1059 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apply's Reply to Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Certain of Samsung's Experts filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Public Reply, # 2 Reply Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 7, 2012 1058 EXHIBITS re 1057 Declaration in Support,, Exhibit L to Declaration of Cyndi Wheeler in Support of Samsung's Administrative Motions to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1057 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 7, 2012 1057 Declaration of Cyndi Wheeler in Support of 999 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 1007 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment and Documents in Support Thereto , Samsung's Oppotiion to Apple's Motion to Strike, and Samsung's Opposition to Motion to Exclude filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 999 , 1007 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 7, 2012 1056 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Declaration of Marc J. Pernick in Support of Apple's Motion to Strike Portions of Samsung's Expert Reports filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Marc J. Pernick in Support of Reply re Apple's Motion to Strike Portions of Samsung's Expert Reports, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 7, 2012 1055 Declaration of Yakov Zolotorev in Support of 1054 Reply to Opposition/Response re Apple's Motion to Strike Portions of Samsung's Expert Reports filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1054 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 7, 2012 1054 REPLY (re 939 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal ) filed byApple Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 7, 2012 1053 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc.(a California corporation) re 1052 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 7, 2012 1052 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Reply Brief, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 7, 2012 1051 Declaration of Peter Kolovos in Support of 999 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Samsung's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Portions of Samsung's Expert Reports filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 999 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 6, 2012 1050 NOTICE of Lodging re 940 Corrected Exhibit 11 to the Declaration of Jason Bartlett in Support of Apple's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Samsung's Expert by Apple Inc. (J