M.D.P., et al v. Houston County Health Care Authority, et al

Plaintiff: M. D. P., Gavin J. Pugh and Abby Nicole Pugh
Defendant: Houston County Health Care Authority, Dothan OBGYN, Inc., Guy Malcolm Middleton and Dawn Michelle Ralls
Case Number: 1:2011cv00461
Filed: June 14, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge: W. Harold Albritton
1 Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2013 190 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) Defendants Southeast Alabama Medical Center and Dawn Michelle Ralls's Daubert 109 Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Michelle Murray is GRANTED as to Michell Murray's testimony as to medical proximate cause as set out above, and DENIED to the extent that the Motion may seek to prohibit opinion testimony other than that; (2) The 110 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Michael Hall and 115 Motion toExclude Testimony of Michael H all are DENIED as moot as to the standard of care of nurses, and DENIED in all other respects; (3) The 114 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Linda Huffman is DENIED as moot, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 1/25/13. (scn, )
February 7, 2013 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as follows: 1. The 110 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Paul M. Deutsch and 113 Motion to Strike and Preclude Testimony by Dr. Paul Deutsch are DENIED. 2. The 167 Motion to Strike Exhibit G from Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants 9; Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Paul Deutsch is DENIED. 3. The Plaintiff's 136 Second Motion in Limine is DENIED. 4. The Plaintiff's 188 Alternative Motion to Reinstate Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Exhibits 104, 105, and 106 is GRANTED to the extent that Exhibit G to Doc. 149 is reinstated as Exhibit #104 in this case. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 2/7/2013. (dmn, )
November 3, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) The 10 and 11 Motions to Dismiss the personal claims of the Plaintiffs Gavin and Abby Pugh are GRANTED, and Gavin J. Pugh and Abby Nicole Pugh, individually for their separate claims for deri vative injury and damages, are DISMISSED with prejudice as parties Plaintiff; (2) The Defendants 10 and 11 Motions to Dismiss as to the claims of M.D.P. are DENIED; (3) The case will proceed on M.D.P.'s Count I and Count II. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/3/11. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (scn, )
November 3, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court RULE 26(f) ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than November 22, 2011, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/3/11. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.D.P., et al v. Houston County Health Care Authority, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. D. P.
Represented By: Lanny S. Vines
Represented By: Rufus Randolph Smith, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavin J. Pugh
Represented By: Rufus Randolph Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Lanny S. Vines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abby Nicole Pugh
Represented By: Rufus Randolph Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Lanny S. Vines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston County Health Care Authority
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dothan OBGYN, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Malcolm Middleton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Michelle Ralls
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]