Johnson Outdoors Inc, et al v. Navico, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Johnson Outdoors Inc, and Johnson Outdoors Marine Electronics, Inc.
Defendant: Navico, Inc. and Sportsman's Outfitters, L.L.C.
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv00067
Filed: January 26, 2010
 
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2012 191 Featured Case ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice 190 , which comports with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this action has been dismissed by operation of Rule 41, on the terms agreed to and set out by the parties. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant are DIRECTED to retrieve from chambers on or before January 30, 2012, the courtesy copies and exhibits they provided the court during the course of this litigation so that they may retain or dispose of those documents in the manner they deem appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/13/2012. (jg, )
January 10, 2012 190 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Joint) by Johnson Outdoors Inc., Johnson Outdoors Marine Electronics, Inc.. (Kutas, Andrew)
April 20, 2011 94 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the claim term "image," as it appears in the claims of the Patents in suit, is construed as "a visual representation of the underwater environment produced by sound rather than light." Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 4/20/2011. (wcl, )
March 2, 2011 82 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Johnson Outdoors's 53 MOTION to Strike Certain Defenses and Counterclaims, and MOTION to Dismiss them with Prejudice are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as further set out. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 3/2/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(wcl, )
May 3, 2010 11 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM of Defendant Navico, Inc. against Johnson Outdoors Inc., Johnson Outdoors Marine Electronics, Inc. by Navico, Inc..(Gill, Charles)
March 29, 2010 10 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Sportsman's Outfitters, L.L.C..(Shealy, Steadman)
January 26, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against Navico, Inc., Sportsman's Outfitters, L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 4602012699.), filed by Johnson Outdoors Inc,, Johnson Outdoors Marine Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Filing Receipt)(cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Johnson Outdoors Inc, et al v. Navico, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Outdoors Inc,
Represented By: Edward Elmo Vassallo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Outdoors Marine Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Elmo Vassallo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navico, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sportsman's Outfitters, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]