Central Alabama Fair Housing Center et al v. Magee et al

Defendant: Julie Magee and Jimmy Stubbs
Plaintiff: John Doe #2, Central Alabama Fair Housing Center, Fair Housing Center of Northern Alabama, Center for Fair Housing, Inc. and John Doe #1
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00982
Filed: November 18, 2011
 
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2011 100 Featured Case ORDER granting 95 Motion for Leave to File Additional Evidence. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/29/2011. (wcl, )
December 30, 2011 104 Featured Case ORDER directing that the 102 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint be set for Submission, without oral argument, on 1/9/2012, with all briefs due by said date. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/30/11. (djy, ) Modified on 12/30/2011 to correct typographical error (qc/djy, ).
January 10, 2012 114 Featured Case ORDER: (1) Defendant Julie Magee's 85 MOTION to Dismiss is reset for submission, without oral argument, on 1/31/2012. Motion Submission Deadline set for 1/31/2012. (2) By 1/17/2012, the defendants are to file a brief on whether the court' s preliminary injunction is still necessary. (3) By 1/24/2012, the plaintiffs are to file a brief on whether this case is moot and, if not, whether the preliminary injunction is still necessary. (4) By 1/31/2012, the defendants may file a reply. In their briefs, the parties should also address whether the court may dissolve a preliminary injunction while the injunction is on appeal. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/10/2012. (dmn, )
March 5, 2012 131 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 111 MOTION for Protective Order, as further set out in order; ORDERED that a Discovery Scheduling Conference be and is hereby set on 4/24/2012, at 01:30 PM by telephone set up by the plfs before Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/5/2012. (furn: Calendar, ws) (wcl, )
March 15, 2012 136 Featured Case JUDGMENT that pursuant to 127 notice of voluntary dismissal, plaintiff John Doe #1 and all his claims are dismissed without prejudice and plaintiff John Doe #1 is terminated as a party; that the other plaintiffs and their claims are not dismissed; that the clerk is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; that this case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/15/2012. (cc, )
March 16, 2012 138 Featured Case ORDER: (1) The 137 Motion to Stay Proceedings is granted. (2) All proceedings in this case are stayed. (Set STAYED flag.) (3) All outstanding motions are denied with leave to renew. (Motions terminated: 11 , 39 , 40 , 85 , 102 , 137 .) (4) Th e parties are to jointly notify this court when the appellant mandates have been issued in the HICA and United States v. Alabama cases. (5) All deadlines in this case are suspended. (6) This case is closed administratively. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/16/2012. (Deadlines terminated: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2012, Non Jury Trial set for 2/25/2013, Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2012.) Copies furnished to calendar group, AG. (dmn, )
May 8, 2014 167 Featured Case JUDGMENT, pursuant to the 166 stipulation of dismissal, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that the stay previously entered 165 is dissolved and that this case is Dismissed in its entirety without prejudice; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; this case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/8/14. (Attachments: # 1 civil appeals checklist)(djy, )
November 21, 2011 25 Featured Case ORDER that plaintiffs' 13 MOTION for a Preliminary Injunction is set for an Evidentiary Hearing on 11/23/2011 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 2FMJ before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. The defendants are to file a written response to the motion b y no later than noon on 11/22/2011. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to notify by telephone all defense counsel (those who appeared in person and by telephone at the status conference on 11/18/2011) of this order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/21/2011. Copies furnished to Calendar group, AG. Counsel notified by telephone as directed. (dmn)
November 21, 2011 26 Featured Case ORDER that plaintiffs' 13 MOTION for a Temporary Restraining Order is set for an Evidentiary Hearing on 11/23/2011 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 2FMJ before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. The defendants are to file a written response to the mot ion by no later than noon on 11/22/2011. The court misspoke during the on-the-record conference on 11/18/2011, when it said that the motion for a TRO was "folded" into the motion for a preliminary injunction. Instead, the two motions will b e considered as separate motions on 11/23/2011. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to notify by telephone all defense counsel (those who appeared in person and by telephone at the status conference on 11/18/2011) of this order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/21/2011. Copies furnished to Calendar group and AG. Counsel notified by telephone as directed. (dmn)
November 22, 2011 41 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the plaintiffs as to why Magee's 39 Motion to Change Venue filed by Julie Magee should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 7:00 a.m. on 11/23/2011. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/22/11. (djy, )
November 22, 2011 42 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing, by the plaintiffs as to why 40 Motion in Limine filed by Julie Magee should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 7:00 a.m. on 11/23/2011. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/22/11. (djy, )
November 23, 2011 50 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER that: (1) plaintiffs' 13 MOTION for a Temporary Restraining Order is granted; (2) Defendants Julie Magee and Jimmy Stubbs, and all those acting in concert with them, are hereby ENJOINED from requiring any person who attempts to pay the annual registration fee, required by 1975 Ala. Code § 40-12-255, to prove his or her U.S. citizenship or lawful immigration status; (3) Defendants Magee and Stubbs, and all those acting in concert with them, are ENJOINED from refusing to issue the manufactured home decal required by 1975 Ala. Code § 40-12-255 to any person because that person cannot prove his or her U.S. citizenship or lawful immigration status; (4) Defendant Magee is hereby ORDERED to immediately notify all county officials who are responsiblefor enforcing the manufactured home registration requirements of 1975 Ala. Code § 40-12-255 of this temporary restraining order; (5) This injunction shall expire on December 7, 2011, at 4:30 p.m. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/23/2011 at 4:30 p.m. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cc, )
December 1, 2011 74 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER that defendant Julie Magee's 57 Motion to Dissolve the Temporary Restraining Order is denied as further set out in the opinion and order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/1/2011. (dmn, )
December 1, 2011 75 Featured Case ORDER: Based upon the representations made in open court on 11/23/2011, it is ORDERED that plaintiffs' 9 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym is granted, subject to the conditions stated in court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/1/2011. (dmn, )
December 7, 2011 83 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER that the temporary restraining order entered on 11/23/2011, (doc. no. 50 ), is extended to 12/12/2011, at 4:30 p.m., at which time it will expire. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/7/2011. (dmn, )
December 12, 2011 87 Featured Case OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/12/2011. (dmn, )
December 12, 2011 88 Featured Case PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: In accordance with the opinion issued today, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) The plaintiffs' 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is granted. (2) Defendants Julie Magee and Jimmy Stubb s, and all those acting in concert with them, are preliminarily ENJOINED as further set out in the order. (3) Defendants Magee and Stubbs, and all those acting in concert with them, are preliminarily ENJOINED as further set out in the order. (4) Defe ndant Magee is to notify immediately all county officials, who are responsible for enforcing the manufactured home registration requirements of 1975 Ala. Code § 40-12-255, of this preliminary injunction. (5) The court preliminarily DECLARES that it is not a criminal violation of § 30 of HB 56 for an individual who owns, maintains, or keeps a manufactured home to make or attempt to make a registration payment and obtain a registration decal without providing proof of U.S. citizenship or lawful immigration status. The plaintiffs are not required to post any security while this preliminary injunction remains in effect. 42 U.S.C. § 3613(b)(2). Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Central Alabama Fair Housing Center et al v. Magee et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Magee
Represented By: James William Davis
Represented By: Misty S. Fairbanks
Represented By: Margaret Lindsey Fleming
Represented By: William G. Parker, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua K. Payne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Stubbs
Represented By: Fred Lee Clements, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #2
Represented By: Mary C Bauer
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Justin Cox
Represented By: Jamie L. Crook
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Kristi L. Graunke
Represented By: Alvaro M. Huerta
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: John Foster S. Maer
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: Karen Cassandra Tumlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Alabama Fair Housing Center
Represented By: Kristi L. Graunke
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Jamie L. Crook
Represented By: Justin Cox
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Mary C Bauer
Represented By: Alvaro M. Huerta
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: John Foster S. Maer
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: Karen Cassandra Tumlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Center of Northern Alabama
Represented By: Mary C Bauer
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Kristi L. Graunke
Represented By: Alvaro M. Huerta
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: John Foster S. Maer
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: Karen Cassandra Tumlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Fair Housing, Inc.
Represented By: Mary C Bauer
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Justin Cox
Represented By: Jamie L. Crook
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Kristi L. Graunke
Represented By: Alvaro M. Huerta
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: John Foster S. Maer
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: Karen Cassandra Tumlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #1
Represented By: Mary C Bauer
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Justin Cox
Represented By: Jamie L. Crook
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Kristi L. Graunke
Represented By: Alvaro M. Huerta
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: John Foster S. Maer
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: Karen Cassandra Tumlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]