Bryant et al v. Community Bankshares, Inc. et al

Defendant: Edwin B. Burr, Elton Collins, Wesley A. Dodd, Jr., Mary Wilkerson, Community Bankshares, Inc. and Steve Adams
Plaintiff: Dave Bryant and Vikki Bryant
Case Number: 2:2012cv00562
Filed: June 29, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Bullock
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that Plaintiffs respond to the 23 Motion to Dismiss by Friday, September 28, 2012; further ordered that Defendants reply to Plaintiffs' response by Friday, October 5, 2012, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 9/24/12. (scn, )
February 20, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that: 1. Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend their Complaint on or before 3/1/2013; and 2. Defendants' 23 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT with leave to re-file following the amendment of Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/20/2013. (dmn, )
March 3, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that Defendants' motion to dismiss amended complaint (Doc. # 34 ) is GRANTED, and the Bryants' claims in this action are DISMISSED without PREJUDICE so that they may pursue their administrative remedies. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/3/14. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant et al v. Community Bankshares, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin B. Burr
Represented By: Thomas Heflin Christopher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elton Collins
Represented By: Thomas Heflin Christopher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley A. Dodd, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Heflin Christopher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Wilkerson
Represented By: Thomas Heflin Christopher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Bankshares, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Heflin Christopher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Adams
Represented By: Thomas Heflin Christopher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Bryant
Represented By: Stephen D Wadsworth
Represented By: Caroline Smith Gidiere
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vikki Bryant
Represented By: Stephen D Wadsworth
Represented By: Caroline Smith Gidiere
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]