Smith et al v. City of Montgomery et al

Defendant: BSR Trust, LLC, City of Montgomery, Alabama and Ferderdar Fannin
Plaintiff: Kaneshia Haigler, Isaiah Smith, Antonio Haigler and Carolyn Smith
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01037
Filed: November 27, 2012
 
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/28/2013. (jg, )
October 28, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the joint stipulation for dismissal with prejudice 38 , it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that defendant BSR Trust, LLC, and all claims against it are dismissed with prejudice, with the parties to bear their o wn costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Defendant BSR Trust, LLC, is terminated as a party. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case is not closed, for the claims by all plaintiffs against the other defendants remain pending. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/28/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(jg, )
June 26, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/26/2014. (wcl, )
June 26, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) Dft City of Montgomery's 56 motion for summary judgment is granted; (2) Judgment is entered in favor of dft City of Montgomery and against plfs Carolyn Smith, Isaiah Sm ith, and Antonio Haigler, with said plfs taking nothing by their complaint as to said dft; Dft City of Montgomery is terminated as a party; further ORDERED that costs are taxed against the Smith plfs and against plf Haigler, for which execution may i ssue; DIRECTING the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; This case is not closed; The summary-judgment motion is still pending as to the other dfts. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/26/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (wcl, ) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
July 22, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/22/2014. (wcl, )
July 22, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 93 stipulation of the parties: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) The claim brought by plf Kaneshia Haigler, as guardian and next friend of S.M., a minor, is dismissed with prejudice as to plf Haigler 9;s own ability to bring future litigation on S.M.'s behalf; (2) The claim brought by plf Kaneshia Haigler, as guardian and next friend of S.M., a minor, is dismissed without prejudice as to S.M.'s ability to bring future litigation on her own behalf, as further set out in judgment; further ORDERED that the parties are to bear their own costs; DIRECTING the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; This case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/22/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (wcl, )
July 23, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/23/2014. (furn: calendar, ag)(term: Jury Selection and Trial for 09/22/2014) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Smith et al v. City of Montgomery et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSR Trust, LLC
Represented By: Neah L. Mitchell
Represented By: Marion Jefferson Starling, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Montgomery, Alabama
Represented By: Jason Cole Paulk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferderdar Fannin
Represented By: Jason Cole Paulk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaneshia Haigler
Represented By: Mark Andrew Overall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Smith
Represented By: Mark Andrew Overall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Haigler
Represented By: Mark Andrew Overall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Smith
Represented By: Mark Andrew Overall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]