Doe 1, et al v. Hobson, et al

Plaintiff: Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 2 and John Doe 1
Defendant: Spencer Collier and Rich Hobson
Case Number: 2:2013cv00079
Filed: February 7, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDERas follows: (1) The 20 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; and (2) The other pending motions (Docs. # 2 , 4 , 32 ) are DENIED as moot; If the Does can amend their complaint to cure the standing problems identified in this o pinion, they may do so on or before 8/14/2013, at which time the parties may renew any other motions that remain relevant, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/31/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (wcl, )
January 6, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that: (1) Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration (Doc. # 39 ) is GRANTED; (2) The Memorandum Opinion and Order entered July 31, 2013 (Doc. # 38 ) is VACATED; (3) Plaintiffs' motion for class certific ation (Doc. # 2 ), motion to proceed under pseudonyms (Doc. # 4 ), and motion for relief under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(d) (Doc. # 32 ), and Defendants' motion to dismiss, or alternatively, for summary judgment (Doc. # 20 ), are RE INSTATED as pending motions; (4) On or before January 20, 2014, the parties may supplement their briefing concerning Defendants' motion to dismiss and alternative motion for summary judgment (Doc. # 20 ) and Plaintiffs' Rule 56(d) motion for discovery (Doc. # 32 ). Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/6/14. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(scn, )
May 2, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that: (1) Defendants' motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, motion for summary judgment (Doc. # 20 ) is DENIED; (2) Plaintiffs' motion for relief pursuant to Rule 56(d) (Doc. # 32 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/2/14. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(scn, )
May 20, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that Plaintiffs' motion for leave to proceed under pseudonyms (Doc. # 4 ) is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiffs may withhold their true identities from the public and proceed as Jane Doe #1, etc.; Plain tiffs' motion is DENIED, however, to the extent that Plaintiffs seek to withhold their identities from Defendants; further ORDERED the parties should confer, and if possible, file a joint motion for protective order that satisfies Plaintiffs' concerns for confidentiality. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/20/14. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe 1, et al v. Hobson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 2
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Karen Cassandra Tumlin
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Omar C Jadwat
Represented By: Kristi L. Graunke
Represented By: Justin B. Cox
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Karen Cassandra Tumlin
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Omar C Jadwat
Represented By: Kristi L. Graunke
Represented By: Justin B. Cox
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 2
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Justin B. Cox
Represented By: Kristi L. Graunke
Represented By: Omar C Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Karen Cassandra Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 1
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Karen Cassandra Tumlin
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Omar C Jadwat
Represented By: Kristi L. Graunke
Represented By: Justin B. Cox
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Collier
Represented By: James William Davis
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Hobson
Represented By: James William Davis
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.