Shepherd v. Colvin (CONSENT)

Plaintiff: Sandy Jean Shepherd
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00277
Filed: April 22, 2013
 
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Terry F. Moorer
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay Briefing in Light of United States Government Cessation 13 is GRANTED; that Defendant shall notify the court when funds are appropriated so that the Court can reset the scheduling deadlines. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/2/2013. (jg, )
November 1, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Lift Stay 15 is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 11/1/2013. (jg, )
November 1, 2013 18 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER that the defendant's Motion to 16 be and hereby is GRANTED; that the decision of the Commissioner be and is hereby REVERSED and this case be and is hereby REMANDED to the Commissioner for further proceedings; that, in accord ance with Bergen v. Comm'r of Soc. Sec., 454 F3d 1273, 1278 fn.2 (11th Cir. 2006), the plaintiff shall have ninety (90) days after she receives notice of any amount of past due benefits awarded to seek attorney's fees as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 11/1/2013. (jg, ) certified copy mailed to SSA Chief Judge; SSA Admin.
December 4, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why 19 Motion for Attorney Fees, filed by Sandy Jean Shepherd should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 12/16/2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 12/4/2013. (jg, )
December 13, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER that the application for attorney's fees 19 be and hereby is GRANTED to the extent that the plaintiff be and is hereby AWARDED fees in the amount of $3,753.74. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 12/13/2013. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Shepherd v. Colvin (CONSENT)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Jean Shepherd
Represented By: Walter Allen Blakeney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Robert Randolph Neeley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]