Lane v. Bullock County Correctional Facility, et al

Defendant: M. Buck, Rebekah Stough, Dr. Siddig, Correctional Medical Services, Inc., Limestone Correctional Facility, Bullock County Correctional Facility, S. Garrison, N. Walton and Alabama Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Lori Lane
Case Number: 2:2013cv00280
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Madison
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) The 1 Complaint is STRICKEN, and the Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file an Amended Complaint conforming with this Order no later than July 12, 2013; (2) The 11 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/28/13. (scn, )
August 21, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) The 25 Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is GRANTED and all federal and state claims against the Bullock County Correctional Facility, Limestone Correctional Facili ty, and the Alabama Department of Corrections are DISMISSED, and they are DISMISSED as party Defendants; (2) Any fictitious parties referred to in the First Amended Complaint are also DISMISSED. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/21/13. (scn, )
November 15, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: 1) Plf's 37 Motion to Amend is DENIED; 2) This case is DISMISSED without prejudice, subject to the right of the Plf to re-file the remaining state-law claims in state court within 30 days from the date of this ORDER, pursua nt to 28 USC § 1367(d); 3) Costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/15/2013. (furn: Calendar, eb)(term: PTC for 06/30/2014; Jury Trial for 08/11/2014)(Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. Bullock County Correctional Facility, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Buck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebekah Stough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Siddig
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services, Inc.
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limestone Correctional Facility
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullock County Correctional Facility
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Garrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Walton
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Lane
Represented By: Richard Freeman Horsley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]