Hamilton v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 2)

Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections, Cassandra Conway and Dewayne Estes
Plaintiff: David D. Hamilton
Case Number: 2:2013cv00281
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Limestone
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER: On 7/9/2013, the Magistrate Judge filed a Recommendation in this case to which no timely objections have been filed. (Doc. 22 ) Upon an independent review of the file in this case and upon consideration of the Recommendation of th e Magistrate Judge, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 22 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED; that the Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Dewayne Este be GRANTED, that Defendant Dewayne Estes be DISMISSED with prejudice as party to this action and the Plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 8/21/2013. (dmn, )
September 25, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER re 14 Recommendation and 15 Recommendation. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge be and are hereby ADOPTED; that Plaintiff's claims against the the Alabama Department of Corrections b e DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process under 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (e)(2)(B)(I) and that the Alabama Department of Corrections be DISMISSED as a party to this cause of action; that Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction be DENIED and that the Plaintiffs claims against the remaining defendants be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 9/25/2013. (dmn, )
November 26, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff's 48 Objection is OVERRULED. It is further ORDERED that this case is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate action. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 11/26/2013. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 2)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Conway
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewayne Estes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David D. Hamilton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]