Cahaba Forests, LLC v. Hay et al

Defendant: Pamela Twilley Wellborn, Amelia D. Twilley, Josephine V. Caldwell, Willie E. Caldwell, Lynda Marie East Rice Woodall, Jimmy Ray East, Jennings Felix East, Jr., Donald L. Rush, Nancy R. Scott, Michael D. Twilley, Janice Twilley Bryan, W. David Twilley, Carol Ann Twilley Dewberry, James Floyd Caldwell, Betty Ann Hansen, Mary George East Hay and Doris East Ragsdale
Plaintiff: Cahaba Forests, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00423
Filed: June 2, 2011
 
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
 
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2012 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's Objections to Orders of the Magistrate Judge 113 OVERRULED; if the Plaintiff, on or before November 26, 2012, files a motion to amend, with a proposed amendment to its answer to the counterclaim and a proposed amendment to any references to a good faith defense contained in any summary judgment motion, the court will grant the motion and refer this case back to the Magistrate Judge for reconsideration of her Withdrawal Order in light of the amendments. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/21/2012. (jg, )
February 28, 2013 224 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as follows: 1. Cahaba's and Hancock's Second Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to Cahaba's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment as further set out; 2. The Twilleys' Motion for Partial Summar y Judgment is DENIED; 3. Cahaba's and Hancock's Second Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to all Counter-Claims and Third-Party Claims of the Twilleys, and those claims are DISMISSED with prejudice; 4. A separate judgment will be entered in favor of Cahaba and Hancock and against the Defendants; 5. Costs are taxed against all Defendants except Hay and Scott. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 2/28/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(jg, )
September 30, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the defendant's 30 motion for partial summary judgment will be deemed submitted to this Court on October 28, 2011, without oral argument, as further set out; Affidavits, briefs, depositions, or other documents which Plaintiff wish to file in opposition to said motion shall be filed on or before October 21, 2011; Defendants shall have until October 28, 2011, to file any replies it wishes to file. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/30/11. (scn, )
September 30, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon consideration of the Defendants' 32 Rule 56(d) Response, it is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall show cause, if any there be, on or before October 7, 2011, why the motion should not be granted; The motion will be taken under submission on that day for determination without oral argument. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/30/11. (scn, )
February 6, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as follows: 1. Cahaba has standing to bring this action, the court has jurisdiction by diversity of citizenship, and the Twilleys' motion is DENIED to that extent. 2. The effect of Bowater's deemed rejection of the Master Lease and Sublease pursuant to § 365 of the Bankruptcy Code was to give the Twilleys the right to terminate the Master Lease, and its termination would have the effect of terminating the Sublease. Cahaba's motion is DENIED, and the Twilleys' motion is GRANTED to that extent. 3. All other issues are reserved for future determination. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 2/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cahaba Forests, LLC v. Hay et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Twilley Wellborn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amelia D. Twilley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josephine V. Caldwell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie E. Caldwell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynda Marie East Rice Woodall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Ray East
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennings Felix East, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald L. Rush
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy R. Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Twilley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Twilley Bryan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. David Twilley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Ann Twilley Dewberry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Floyd Caldwell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Ann Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary George East Hay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris East Ragsdale
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cahaba Forests, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell David Greggs
Represented By: Mac Mitchell Moorer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]