Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama et al v. Bentley et al Featured Case

Amicus: Dominican American National Roundtable, Equality Alabama, Federation of Southern Cooperatives/Land Assistance Fund, Hispanic Federation, Immigration Equality, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Montgomery Improvement Association, National Asian-Pacific Bar Association, National Association of Latino Elected and Appointed Officials, National Council of La Raza, National Employment Law Project, National Guestworker Alliance, National Immigration Law Project of the National Lawyers Guild, New Orleans Workers Center for Racial Justice, Sikh American Legal Defense and Education Fund, Society of American Law Teachers, Southern Christian Leadership Conference, Southern Coalition for Social Justice, United States Hispanic Leadership Institute, National Lawyers Guild, LULAC, META, Inc., Hispanic College Fund, United Mexican States, Argentina, Bolivia, Brazil, Chile, Colombia, Costa Rica, Dominican Republic, Ecuador, El Salvador, Guatemala, Honduras, Nicaragua, Paraguay, Peru, Uruguay, Hispanic Association of Colleges and Universities (HACU), National Education Association, Alabama Education Association, National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION, Central Alabama Fair Housing Center, Fair Housing Center of Northern Alabama, South Alabama Center for Fair Housing, Anti-Defamation League, Alabama Coalition Against Domestic Violence, NAACP Alabama Conference, ACHR, Alabama NOW, AALDEF and Birmingham Peace Project
Defendant: Robert Bentley, Luther Strange, Joseph B. Morton, Freida Hill, E. Casey Wardynski, Jamie Blair, Randy Fuller, Charles D. Warren, Barbara W. Thompson, Jeffery E. Langham, Robert L. Broussard and National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Aids Action Coalition, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Boat People SOS, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Christopher Barton Thau, Ellin Jimmerson, Robert Barber, Daniel Upton, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Michelle Cummings, Esayas Haile and Fiseha Tesfamariam
Movant: United States of America
 
Case Number: 5:2011cv02484
Filed: July 8, 2011
 
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Northeastern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Sharon Lovelace Blackburn
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2013 178 NOTICE by Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama Notice of Name Change (Oshiro, Erin)
July 19, 2013 Featured Case ORDER granting 176 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sin Yen Ling terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 07/19/2013. (SDB)
July 19, 2013 177 NOTICE by Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama Notice of Name Change (Kao, Winifred)
July 19, 2013 176 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Sin Yen Ling by Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama. (Kao, Winifred)
June 5, 2013 Featured Case ORDER granting 175 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mary Catherine Bauer terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 06/05/2013. (SDB)
June 4, 2013 175 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MARY BAUER by Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Jane Doe(#1, allowed at order 103 ), Jane Doe(#3 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#2 allowed by order [103), Jane Doe(#4 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#6 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#5 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#5, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#4, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#2 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(# 6, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#3, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#1, a minor, by his legal guardian Matt Webster, allowed by order 103 ), Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Bauer, Mary)
June 4, 2013 174 NOTICE of Change of Address by Justin Cox (Cox, Justin)
March 11, 2013 173 Featured Case ORDER granting 159 Motion for Dissolution of the Preliminary Injunction Against Section 8 of Act No. 2011-535 Based on Changed Circumstances, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay the Injunction. The courts Order enjoining the enforcement of Section 8 of the Actreferred to as HB 56 is VACATED. Plaintiffs challenge to Section 8 is DISMISSED asMOOT.. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 3/11/2013. (KAM, )
March 8, 2013 172 STATUS REPORT (Joint Report) by Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Robert Bentley, Jamie Blair, Boat People SOS, Robert L. Broussard, Larry E Craven, Michelle Cummings, Jane Doe(#1, allowed at order 103 ), Jane Doe(#3 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#2 allowed by order [103), Jane Doe(#4 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#6 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#5 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#5, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#4, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#2 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(# 6, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#3, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#1, a minor, by his legal guardian Matt Webster, allowed by order 103 ), Dreamactivist.org, Randy Fuller, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Freida Hill, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Jeffery E. Langham, Pamela Long, Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Luther Strange, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, Barbara W. Thompson, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, E. Casey Wardynski, Charles D. Warren, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. filed by Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Robert Bentley, Jamie Blair, Boat People SOS, Robert L. Broussard, Larry E Craven, Michelle Cummings, Jane Doe(#1, allowed at order 103 ), Jane Doe(#3 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#2 allowed by order [103), Jane Doe(#4 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#6 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#5 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#5, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#4, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#2 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(# 6, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#3, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#1, a minor, by his legal guardian Matt Webster, allowed by order 103 ), Dreamactivist.org, Randy Fuller, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Freida Hill, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Jeffery E. Langham, Pamela Long, Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Luther Strange, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, Barbara W. Thompson, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, E. Casey Wardynski, Charles D. Warren, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora (Messick, Misty)
January 7, 2013 Featured Case ORDER granting 169 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 01/07/2012. (SDB)
January 3, 2013 Featured Case ORDER granting 171 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 01/03/2013. (SDB)
January 2, 2013 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1829147, NDAL receipt #B4601039929. (Brooke, Samuel) Modified text on 1/7/2013 (KGE, ).
January 2, 2013 171 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney WINIFRED KAO on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS by Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Jane Doe(#1, allowed at order 103 ), Jane Doe(#3 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#2 allowed by order [103), Jane Doe(#4 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#6 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#5 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#5, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#4, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#2 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(# 6, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#3, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#1, a minor, by his legal guardian Matt Webster, allowed by order 103 ), Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Brooke, Samuel)
December 31, 2012 170 STATUS REPORT (Joint Report Noting the Issuance of the Eleventh Circuit's Mandate and Setting Out the Parties' Respective Positions Recommending Further Action) by Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Robert Bentley, Jamie Blair, Boat People SOS, Robert L. Broussard, Larry E Craven, Michelle Cummings, Jane Doe(#1, allowed at order 103 ), Jane Doe(#3 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#2 allowed by order [103), Jane Doe(#4 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#6 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#5 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#5, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#4, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#2 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(# 6, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#3, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#1, a minor, by his legal guardian Matt Webster, allowed by order 103 ), Dreamactivist.org, Randy Fuller, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Freida Hill, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Jeffery E. Langham, Pamela Long, Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Luther Strange, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, Barbara W. Thompson, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, E. Casey Wardynski, Charles D. Warren, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. filed by Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Robert Bentley, Jamie Blair, Boat People SOS, Robert L. Broussard, Larry E Craven, Michelle Cummings, Jane Doe(#1, allowed at order 103 ), Jane Doe(#3 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#2 allowed by order [103), Jane Doe(#4 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#6 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#5 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#5, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#4, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#2 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(# 6, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#3, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#1, a minor, by his legal guardian Matt Webster, allowed by order 103 ), Dreamactivist.org, Randy Fuller, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Freida Hill, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Jeffery E. Langham, Pamela Long, Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Luther Strange, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, Barbara W. Thompson, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, E. Casey Wardynski, Charles D. Warren, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora (Messick, Misty)
December 31, 2012 169 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (MOTION TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY DIANA SEN) by Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Jane Doe(#1, allowed at order 103 ), Jane Doe(#3 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#2 allowed by order [103), Jane Doe(#4 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#6 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#5 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#5, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#4, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#2 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(# 6, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#3, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#1, a minor, by his legal guardian Matt Webster, allowed by order 103 ), Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Brooke, Samuel)
October 22, 2012 Featured Case ORDER granting 168 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney R Cooper Shattuck terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 10/22/2012. (SDB)
October 18, 2012 168 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert Bentley. (Shattuck, R)
September 4, 2012 Featured Case ORDER finding as moot 155 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/4/2012. (KAM, )
September 4, 2012 167 Featured Case ORDER granting 166 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the first amended complaint; the report of parties and time for filing responsive pleadings are STAYED pending further order of the court. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/4/2012. (KAM, )
August 27, 2012 166 STATUS REPORT (Joint Report Requesting that the Court Further Stay the Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference Requirements and the Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint) (Messick, Misty) Modified on 9/4/2012 (KAM, ).
August 13, 2012 Featured Case ORDER granting 165 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joshua Kerry Payne terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 08/13/2012. (SDB, )
August 13, 2012 165 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Larry E Craven, Freida Hill, Luther Strange. (Payne, Joshua)
August 3, 2012 Featured Case ORDER granting 164 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 08/03/2012. (SDB, )
August 1, 2012 164 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samuel Brooke for Attorney Kristi Graunke by Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Jane Doe(#1, allowed at order 103 ), Jane Doe(#3 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#2 allowed by order [103), Jane Doe(#4 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#6 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#5 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#5, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#4, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#2 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(# 6, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#3, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#1, a minor, by his legal guardian Matt Webster, allowed by order 103 ), Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
August 1, 2012 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1723488. (Brooke, Samuel) NDAL rec# B4601035852 Modified on 8/2/2012 (KAM, ).
June 11, 2012 163 REPLY to Response to Motion re 159 MOTION to Stay State Defendants' Motion for Dissolution of the Preliminary Injunction Against Section 8 of Act No. 2011-535 Based on Changed Circumstances, or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay the Injunction filed by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Larry E Craven, Freida Hill, Luther Strange. (Davis, James)
June 7, 2012 162 RESPONSE in Opposition re 159 MOTION to Stay State Defendants' Motion for Dissolution of the Preliminary Injunction Against Section 8 of Act No. 2011-535 Based on Changed Circumstances, or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay the Injunction filed by Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Jane Doe(#1, allowed at order 103 ), Jane Doe(#3 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#2 allowed by order [103), Jane Doe(#4 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#6 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#5 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#5, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#4, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#2 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(# 6, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#3, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#1, a minor, by his legal guardian Matt Webster, allowed by order 103 ), Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Ex 1-Index, # 2 Ex 2-Brooke Decl, # 3 Ex 3-LESC Webpage, # 4 Ex 4-SAVE List-Summary, # 5 Ex 5-SAVE List-Federal, # 6 Ex 6-SAVE List-State, # 7 Ex 7-SAVE List-Local, # 8 Ex 8-SAVE List-DMV, # 9 Ex 9-Pell City SAVE MOU, # 10 Ex 10-SAVE Webpage, # 11 Ex 11-Commr Magee Dec 1 Memo, # 12 Ex 12-Commr Magee Nov 28 Memo)(Brooke, Samuel)
June 5, 2012 Featured Case ORDER granting 160 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Prim Formby Escalona terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 06/05/2012. (SDB, )
June 5, 2012 Featured Case ORDER granting 161 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 06/05/2012. (SDB, )
June 4, 2012 161 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice attorney Justin Cox by Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cox, Justin)
June 4, 2012 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1676769. (Cox, Justin)
June 1, 2012 160 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Prim F. Escalona by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Freida Hill, Luther Strange. (Escalona, Prim)
May 24, 2012 159 MOTION to Stay State Defendants' Motion for Dissolution of the Preliminary Injunction Against Section 8 of Act No. 2011-535 Based on Changed Circumstances, or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay the Injunction by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Larry E Craven, Freida Hill, Luther Strange. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Payne, Joshua)
May 23, 2012 158 STIPULATION of United States, HICA Plaintiffs, and State Defendants by Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama. filed by Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brooke, Samuel)
May 17, 2012 Featured Case ORDER granting 157 Motion to Withdraw as Allison Neal as Attorney.. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 5/17/2012. (KAM, )
May 17, 2012 157 MOTION to by Allison Neal to Withdraw as Attorney for ACLU (Neal, Allison)
May 1, 2012 Featured Case ORDER granting 156 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kenneth J Sugarman terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 05/01/2012. (SDB, )
April 27, 2012 156 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kenneth Sugarman by Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sugarman, Kenneth)
February 17, 2012 Featured Case ORDER granting 130 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 02/17/2012. (SDB, )
January 12, 2012 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Northern District of Alabama certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: Notice of Cross Appeal, 139 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,,,,,, Appeal No. 11-14535. The entire record on appeal is available electronically (KAM, )
January 10, 2012 155 Joint MOTION to Stay (Joint Report Requesting that the Court Further Stay the Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference Requirements and the Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint) (Fairbanks, Misty)
December 30, 2011 154 NOTICE of Appearance by R Cooper Shattuck on behalf of Robert Bentley (Shattuck, R)
November 7, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 153 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 11/7/2011. (SDB, )
November 4, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1517284. (Neal, Allison) NDAL rec# B4601028190 Modified on 11/7/2011 (KAM, ).
November 4, 2011 153 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Jane Doe(#1, allowed at order 103 ), Jane Doe(#3 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#2 allowed by order [103), Jane Doe(#4 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#6 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#5 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#5, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#4, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#2 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(# 6, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#3, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#1, a minor, by his legal guardian Matt Webster, allowed by order 103 ), Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Neal, Allison)
October 20, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 152 Motion to Stay Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f) requirements and to extend time to respond to first amended complaint to the extent that by January 12, 2012, the parties will provide the court with a report on the status of the pending cross appeals and with an update on their respective positions regarding how to proceed regarding the Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f) requirements and the filing of responsive pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 10/20/2011. (SMH)
October 14, 2011 152 Motion (joint report) to stay Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f) requirements and extend time to respond to first amended complaint. (Fairbanks, Misty) Modified on 10/20/2011 (KAM, )
October 14, 2011 151 Featured Case ORDER of USCA, before Carnes, Barkett and Hull, USCJ, the motion for injunction pending appeal is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; The State of Alabama is Enjoined from enforcement of HB 56 - Section 10 and Section 28 pending appeal and until further order by the merits panel; Motion is denied as to Sections 12, 18, 27 and 30. (KAM, )
October 11, 2011 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number B46010274724 re Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Luther Strange, Larry E Craven, Robert L. Broussard, Freida Hill, Robert Bentley (KAM, )
October 7, 2011 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 138 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 137 Memorandum Opinion by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Larry E Craven, Freida Hill, Luther Strange. SEE DOCUMENT 150(KAM, )
October 7, 2011 150 NOTICE by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Larry E Craven, Freida Hill, Luther Strange State Defendants' Notice of Cross-Appeal (Davis, James)
October 7, 2011 149 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Jane Doe(#1, allowed at order 103 ), Jane Doe(#3 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#2 allowed by order [103), Jane Doe(#4 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#6 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#5 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#5, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#4, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#2 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(# 6, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#3, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#1, a minor, by his legal guardian Matt Webster, allowed by order 103 ), Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. Amendment to 139 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,,,,, AMENDED NOTICE. (Joaquin, Linton)
October 6, 2011 148 USCA Case Number 11-14535 C for 139 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,,,,, filed by Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Pamela Long, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Juan Pablo Black Romero, John Doe, Ellin Jimmerson, Huntsville International Help Center, Jane Doe, Dreamactivist.org, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Esayas Haile, Service Employees International Union, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Maria D. Ceja Zamora, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Matt Webster, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Robert Barber, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Aids Action Coalition, Daniel Upton, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Greater Birmingham Ministries. (KAM, )
October 5, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 146 Motion for Leave to File State Defendants' Motion to Adopt and Incorporate by Reference Their Opposition Brief Filed in Compansion Case,United States v. State of Alabama, et al. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 10/5/2011. (KAM, )
October 5, 2011 147 Featured Case ORDER denying 140 Motion to Enjoin Portions of H.B. 56 Pending Appeal as further set out in this order.. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 10/5/2011. (KAM, )
October 4, 2011 146 MOTION for Leave to File State Defendants' Motion to Adopt and Incorporate by Reference Their Opposition Brief Filed in Compansion Case,United States v. State of Alabama, et al. (U.S. Doc. 98) by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Larry E Craven, Freida Hill, Luther Strange. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Davis, James)
October 3, 2011 145 REPLY to Response to Motion re 140 Emergency MOTION to Stay /Enjoin Portions of HB56 Pending Appeal filed by Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama. (Brooke, Samuel)
October 3, 2011 144 RESPONSE in Opposition re 140 Emergency MOTION to Stay /Enjoin Portions of HB56 Pending Appeal (Doc. 140) filed by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Larry E Craven, Freida Hill, Luther Strange. (Davis, James)
October 2, 2011 143 NOTICE by Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama re 140 Emergency MOTION to Stay /Enjoin Portions of HB56 Pending Appeal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Tumlin, Karen)
September 30, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 142 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew H Turner terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/30/11. (SMH)
September 30, 2011 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 139 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,,,,, (KAM, )
September 29, 2011 142 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew H. Turner by Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Andrew)
September 29, 2011 141 Featured Case ORDER re 140 Emergency MOTION to Stay /Enjoin Portions of HB56 Pending Appeal; Any opposition is due by 10/3/2011 no later than 9:00am Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/29/2011. (KAM, )
September 29, 2011 140 Emergency MOTION to Stay /Enjoin Portions of HB56 Pending Appeal by Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Jane Doe(#1, allowed at order 103 ), Jane Doe(#3 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#2 allowed by order [103), Jane Doe(#4 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#6 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#5 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#5, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#4, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#2 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(# 6, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#3, allowed by order 103 ), Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Brooke, Samuel)
September 29, 2011 139 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 138 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, 137 Memorandum Opinion by Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Jane Doe(#1, allowed at order 103 ), Jane Doe(#3 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#2 allowed by order [103), Jane Doe(#4 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#6 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#5 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#5, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#4, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#2 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(# 6, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#3, allowed by order 103 ), Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1126-1491589. (Brooke, Samuel) ALND rec # B4601027083 Modified on 9/30/2011 (KAM, ).
September 28, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 136 UNOPPOSED Motion to Stay 26(f) Conference and Stay Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/28/11. (SMH)
September 28, 2011 138 Featured Case ORDER in accordance with the memo opn entered contemporaneously, granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, The Motion is GRANTED as to Section 8; the last sentence of Sections 10(e), 11(e), and13(h); and Section 11(f) and (g) of H.B. 56. The dfts are ENJOINED from enforcing those sections; Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (doc. 37), is MOOT as to theirrequest for an injunction preliminarily enjoining Section 11(a) and Section 13 of H.B. 56.These Section have been enjoined pending final judgment in United States v. Alabama, CaseNo. 2:11-CV-2746-SLB. The Motion is DENIED as to H.B. 56 in its entirety, and as to Section 10 (except the lastsentence of Section 10(e)), and Sections 12, 18-20, 27, 28, and 30 of H.B. 56.. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/28/2011. (KAM, )
September 28, 2011 137 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/28/2011. (KAM, )
September 27, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 108 Motion for Leave to filed amicus brief. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/27/11. (SMH)
September 27, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 106 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/27/11. (SMH)
September 27, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 98 Motion to Amend/Correct Amicus Brief. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/27/11. (SMH)
September 26, 2011 136 MOTION to Stay UNOPPOSED Motion to Stay 26(f) Conference and Stay Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint obo all plaintiffs by Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Jane Doe(#1, allowed at order 103 ), Jane Doe(#3 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#2 allowed by order [103), Jane Doe(#4 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#6 allowed by order 103 ), Jane Doe(#5 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#5, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#4, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#2 allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(# 6, allowed by order 103 ), John Doe(#3, allowed by order 103 ), Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tumlin, Karen)
September 22, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 133 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 11/22/2011. (SDB, )
September 20, 2011 135 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Kerry Payne on behalf of Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Freida Hill, Joseph B. Morton, Luther Strange (Payne, Joshua)
September 19, 2011 134 NOTICE by Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama re 37 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support of Supplemental Evidence Regarding Section 30 of HB 56 (Attachments: # 1 Montgomery Water Works, # 2 Allgood Water Works, # 3 Houston County Probate Office)(Brooke, Samuel)
September 19, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1483453. (Brooke, Samuel)
September 19, 2011 133 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Chris Newman, obo all pltfs., by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
September 17, 2011 132 NOTICE by Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora re 37 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support regarding supplemental authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ninth Circuit en banc decision)(Viramontes, Victor)
September 16, 2011 131 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Michelle Cummings, Esayas Haile, Service Employees International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Dreamactivist.org, Aids Action Coalition, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Christopher Barton Thau, Ellin Jimmerson, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Robert Barber, Pamela Long, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Boat People SOS, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Huntsville International Help Center, Matt Webster, Daniel Upton, Maria D. Ceja Zamora, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United. (Attachments: # 1 HB 56 / Act 2011-535)(Brooke, Samuel)
September 9, 2011 130 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Vivek Mittal by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mittal, Vivek)
September 6, 2011 129 Featured Case ORDER granting 36 Motion for More Definite Statement; plaintiffs shall by 9/16/2011 file an amended complaint; denying 36 Motion to Strike w/out prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/6/2011. (KAM, )
September 1, 2011 128 Featured Case ORDER for case management purposes and ease of appellate review; the 8/3/2011 order of consolidation is vacated; the parties shall file all future pleadings in the individual cases as appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/1/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 30, 2011 127 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/24/2011, before Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber Julie Martin. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court forms/transcripts/Transcript Redaction Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 9/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 29, 2011 126 Featured Case ORDER that Act 2011-535 [H.B. 56] is TEMPORARILY ENJOINED, and may not be executed or enforced. In entering this order the court specifically notes that it is in no way addressing the merits of the motions. The court will issue detailed Memorandum Opinions and Orders ruling on the merits of the pending Motions for Preliminary Injunction no later than September 28, 2011. This temporary injunction shall remain in effect until September 29, 2011, or until the court enters its rulings, whichever comes first. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/29/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 25, 2011 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine R Brown on behalf of Henry N. Parsley, Jr Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Brown, Katherine)
August 25, 2011 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C Allen on behalf of Henry N. Parsley, Jr Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Allen, Andrew)
August 25, 2011 123 NOTICE of Appearance by J Mark White on behalf of Henry N. Parsley, Jr Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(White, J)
August 24, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn: Motion Hearing held on 8/24/2011 re Pltfs' MOTIONS for Preliminary Injunction. (Court Reporter Julie Martin.) Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(SMH)
August 23, 2011 122 MOTION to Dismiss the United States' Complaint (Doc. 1 in Case No. 11-cv-2746) by Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Davis, James)
August 23, 2011 121 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint of Plaintiffs Parsley, et al. (Doc. 50 in Case No. 11-cv-2736) by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Luther Strange. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Davis, James)
August 23, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting (102) Motion for Leave Appear PHV by Michael D. Simpson in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB; granting (61) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:11-cv-02746-SLB; granting (53) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:11-cv-02736-SLB. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/23/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 23, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1465176. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Gardner, J)
August 23, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting (105) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB; granting (64) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02746-SLB; granting (56) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02736-SLB. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/23/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 23, 2011 120 UNITED STATES OF AMERICAS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by United States of America. (Deemed filed 8/22/2011 in 5:11cv2746) Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 23, 2011 Featured Case ORDER in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB; granting (71) Motion to correct cover page reflecting consolidated case numbers in case 5:11-cv-02736-SLB. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/23/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 23, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting (101) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB; granting (60) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02746-SLB; granting (52) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02736-SLB. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/23/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 23, 2011 119 MOTION Leave to File Corrected Cover Page of Reply Brief by United States of America. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Reeves, C)
August 22, 2011 118 NOTICE by Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama Notice of Supplemental Evidence (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Turner, Andrew)
August 22, 2011 117 Opposition to (Surreply to) Church Leaders' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 99) filed by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Luther Strange. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Parker, William)
August 21, 2011 116 Brief HICA Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefing on Section 28 Equal Protection Challenge. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Brooke, Samuel)
August 20, 2011 115 Brief (State Defendants' Supplemental Briefing Addressing Equal Protection Challenge) filed by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Freida Hill, Joseph B. Morton, Luther Strange. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Fleming, Margaret)
August 20, 2011 114 NOTICE by Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley, Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Freida Hill, Joseph B. Morton, Luther Strange re (82 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB) Response in Opposition to Motion,, (110 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB) Response in Opposition to Motion, Correction Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Neiman, John)
August 19, 2011 113 NOTICE by Robert J. Baker, Benedictine Sisters of Cullman, Alabama, Inc, Benedictine Society of Alabama, Henry N. Parsley, Jr, Thomas J. Rodi, William H. Willimon, United States of America, Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora re (37 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Napolitano Memo)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Tumlin, Karen)
August 19, 2011 112 REPLY to Response to Motion re (47 in 5:11-cv-02736-SLB) Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Robert J. Baker, Benedictine Sisters of Cullman, Alabama, Inc, Benedictine Society of Alabama, Henry N. Parsley, Jr, Thomas J. Rodi, William H. Willimon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Dowd, Augusta)
August 17, 2011 111 Evidentiary Material re:(47 in 5:11-cv-02736-SLB) Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Dowd, Augusta)
August 15, 2011 110 RESPONSE in Opposition re (2 in 5:11-cv-02746-SLB) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Neiman, John)
August 15, 2011 109 REPLY to Response to Motion re (37 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Wang, Cecillia)
August 15, 2011 108 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Alabama Legislators. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit proposed amicus brief, # 2 Exhibit list of individual amici, # 3 Exhibit 1996 OLC opinion, # 4 Exhibit 2002 Bybee memo)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Williams, Stephen)
August 15, 2011 107 RESPONSE in Opposition re (57 in 5:11-cv-02746-SLB, 47 in 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 99 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB) Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (State Defendants' Response to Church Leaders' Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support) filed by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Luther Strange. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Fairbanks, Misty)
August 15, 2011 PHV Fee paid for Carla Gorniak, Henry Solano and Christopher Clark, receipt number B4601025753, $150 (for Motion 101 in lead case). Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(CVA)
August 15, 2011 106 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by American Unity Legal Defense Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Park, John)
August 15, 2011 105 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Barnaby Zall by American Unity Legal Defense Fund. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Park, John) Modified on 8/15/2011 (CVA).
August 12, 2011 104 Opposition to re (36 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 36 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB) Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendants' Motion for More Definite Statement and To Strike filed by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic College Fund, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration with Exhibits)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Viramontes, Victor)
August 12, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting (88) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (89) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (100) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB; granting (44) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (45) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (59) Motion for Leave to Appear PHVin case 5:11-cv-02746-SLB; granting (35) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (36) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (51) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02736-SLB. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/12/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 12, 2011 103 Featured Case ORDER granting (2) Motion for leave to proceed under pseudonyms in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/12/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(KAM, )
August 12, 2011 102 MOTION for Leave to File Pro Hac Vice by Alabama Education Association, National Education Association. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Gardner, J)
August 12, 2011 101 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV by United Mexican States for Carla Gorniak, Henry Solano and Christopher Clark. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Still, Edward) Modified on 8/15/2011 (CVA).
August 12, 2011 100 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Dale M. Schwartz, Esquire by Anti-Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Schoen, David)
August 12, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1458556. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Schoen, David) ALND rec# B4601025745 Modified on 8/12/2011 (KAM, ).
August 10, 2011 99 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Robert J. Baker, Henry N. Parsley, Jr, Thomas J. Rodi, William H. Willimon. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Dowd, Augusta)
August 10, 2011 98 MOTION to Amend/Correct (95 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB) Trial Brief, (amicus) by United Mexican States. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Still, Edward)
August 10, 2011 97 NOTICE by Alabama Education Association, National Education Association Certification of Service of Motion for Leave, Brief and Corporate Disclosure Statement Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Gardner, J)
August 10, 2011 96 Brief re(66 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 22 in 5:11-cv-02746-SLB, 13 in 5:11-cv-02736-SLB) MOTION for Leave to File As Amici Curiae. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Gardner, J)
August 10, 2011 95 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF by Argentina, Bolivia, Brazil, Chile, Colombia, Costa Rica, Dominican Republic, Ecuador, El Salvador, Guatemala, Honduras, Nicaragua, Paraguay, Peru, United Mexican States, Uruguay. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(Still, Edward)
August 9, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $50, receipt number 4601025632 re: Flores. (doc 89 in lead; doc 36 in 2736 and doc 45 in 2746). Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(FNC)
August 9, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $50, receipt number 4601025631 re: Garcia (doc 88 in lead, doc 35 in 2736 and doc 44 in 2746) Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 5:11-cv-02746-SLB(FNC)
August 9, 2011 94 MOTION to certify question to the Supreme Court of Alabama by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Luther Strange. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB, 2:11cv2746 50 (KAM, )
August 9, 2011 93 Amicus Curiae Brief re(37 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB) by Alabama Coalition Against Domestic Violence in Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Injunction. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Tedrow, Klari)
August 9, 2011 92 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Neiman, Jr on behalf of Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Luther Strange, Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Freida Hill, Joseph B. Morton Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Neiman, John)
August 9, 2011 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Prim Formby Escalona on behalf of Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Luther Strange, Alabama, State of, Robert J Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Freida Hill, Joseph B. Morton Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Escalona, Prim)
August 9, 2011 90 Featured Case ORDER the court will not hear oral argument on motion for more definite statement and to strike - hearing set for 8/24/2011 is cancelled; any opposition to the motion remains due by 8/12/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/9/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(KAM, )
August 9, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting (66) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (69) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (73) Motion for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae; granting (75) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (78) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (79) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae; granting (87) Motion for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB; granting (22) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (25) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (29) Motion for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae; granting (31) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (34) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (35) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (43) Motion for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae in case 2:11-cv-02746-SLB; granting (13) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (16) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (20) Motion for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae; granting (22) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (25) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (26) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief; granting (34) Motion for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiaein case 5:11-cv-02736-SLB ; Amici are DIRECTED to electronically file their briefs FORTHWITH. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/9/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(KAM)
August 9, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting (65) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (72) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (80) Motion Appear PHV; granting (81) Motion Appear PHV; granting (84) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (85) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (86) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB; granting (20) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (28) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (36) Motion Appear PHV; granting (37) Motion Appear PHV; granting (40) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (41) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (42) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 2:11-cv-02746-SLB; granting (19) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (27) Motion Appear PHV; granting (28) Motion Appear PHV; granting (31) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (32) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (33) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting (11) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02736-SLB ; Counsel are reminded that they must register for electronic filing through this court's website www.alnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/9/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(KAM, )
August 9, 2011 PHV Fee paid: for Stephen P. Rice and Thy B. Bui $100, receipt number B4601025575 Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(KAM, )
August 8, 2011 89 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV for Gaela K. Gehring Flores by NAACP Alabama Conference. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(KAM, )
August 8, 2011 88 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV by Bonard I. Molina Garcia by NAACP Alabama Conference. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(KAM, )
August 8, 2011 87 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae by Anti-Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" - ADL Amicus Brief [DE 71])Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Schoen, David)
August 8, 2011 PHV Fee paid: for Stephen Dane $ 50, receipt number 1126-1454707. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Blacksher, James) ALND rec# B4601025583 Modified on 8/9/2011 (KAM, ).
August 8, 2011 PHV Fee paid: for Katherine Gillaspie $ 50, receipt number 1126-1454704. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Blacksher, James)ALND rec # B4601025584 Modified on 8/9/2011 (KAM, ).
August 8, 2011 PHV Fee paid: for Jamie L. Crook $ 50, receipt number 1126-1454701. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Blacksher, James) ALND rec # B4601025582 Modified on 8/9/2011 (KAM, ).
August 8, 2011 86 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Central Alabama Fair Housing Center, Fair Housing Center of Northern Alabama, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc., South Alabama Center for Fair Housing. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Blacksher, James)
August 8, 2011 85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Central Alabama Fair Housing Center, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc., South Alabama Center for Fair Housing, Fair Housing Center of Northern Alabama. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Blacksher, James)
August 8, 2011 84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Central Alabama Fair Housing Center, Fair Housing Center of Northern Alabama, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc., South Alabama Center for Fair Housing. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Blacksher, James)
August 6, 2011 83 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by David Gespass on behalf of NAACP Alabama Conference. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Gespass, David)
August 5, 2011 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re (37 in 5:11-cv-02484-SLB) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Freida Hill, Joseph B. Morton, Luther Strange. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Haran Lowe), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Declaration of Jerry Bassett), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Letter from Superintendent Morton), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Letter from Chancellor Hill))Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Davis, James)
August 5, 2011 81 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Thy B. Bui by Alabama Coalition Against Domestic Violence. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Tedrow, Klari)
August 5, 2011 80 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Steven P. Rice by Alabama Coalition Against Domestic Violence. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Tedrow, Klari)
August 5, 2011 79 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by NAACP Alabama Conference, ACHR, Alabama NOW, AALDEF, Birmingham Peace Project, Dominican American National Roundtable, Equality Alabama, Federation of Southern Cooperatives/Land Assistance Fund, Hispanic Federation, Immigration Equality, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Montgomery Improvement Association, National Asian-Pacific Bar Association, National Association of Latino Elected and Appointed Officials, National Council of La Raza, National Employment Law Project, National Guestworker Alliance, National Immigration Law Project of the National Lawyers Guild, New Orleans Workers Center for Racial Justice, Sikh American Legal Defense and Education Fund, Society of American Law Teachers, Southern Christian Leadership Conference, Southern Coalition for Social Justice, United States Hispanic Leadership Institute, National Lawyers Guild. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief of Amici Curiae & Appendix)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Gespass, David)
August 5, 2011 78 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Alabama Coalition Against Domestic Violence. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Attachment B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Tedrow, Klari)
August 5, 2011 77 NOTICE of Appearance by David I Schoen on behalf of Anti-Defamation League Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Schoen, David)
August 5, 2011 76 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion (15 in 5:11-cv-02736-SLB) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Oral argument set for 8/24/2011 09:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn; dfts shall file their opposition by 8/15/2011; plas' reply is due by 8/22/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/5/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(KAM, )
August 5, 2011 75 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Central Alabama Fair Housing Center, Fair Housing Center of Northern Alabama, South Alabama Center for Fair Housing, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Amicus Brief, # 3 Disclosure Statement)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Blacksher, James)
August 5, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1454047. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Badrinath, Vikram)
August 5, 2011 74 Brief of Amicus Curiae (AILA). Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Badrinath, Vikram)
August 5, 2011 73 MOTION for Leave to Appear As Amicus Curiae by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Badrinath, Vikram)
August 5, 2011 72 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Badrinath, Vikram)
August 5, 2011 71 Brief of Amicus Curiae Anti-Defamation League in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Schoen, David)
August 5, 2011 70 Amicus Curiae brief on behalf of Hispanic Association of Colleges and Universities (HACU), Hispanic College Fund, LULAC, META, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Dear Colleage Letter 1997, # 2 Exhibit B-Delaration MPV, # 3 Exhibit C-Declaration M. Fix, # 4 Exhibit D-Declaration Dr. Castro)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Perez-Vargas, Miguel)
August 5, 2011 69 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Preliminary Injunction by National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Spina, Thomas)
August 5, 2011 68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Henry N. Parsley, Jr. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Dowd, Augusta)
August 5, 2011 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alabama Education Association, National Education Association. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Gardner, J)
August 5, 2011 66 MOTION for Leave to File As Amici Curiae by National Education Association, Alabama Education Association. (Attachments: # 1 Brief)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Gardner, J)
August 4, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1453466. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Brooke, Samuel)ALND rec # B4601025531 Modified on 8/9/2011 (KAM, ).
August 4, 2011 65 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by - Jessica Karp obo all pltfs in 5:11-2484-SLB (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Brooke, Samuel)
August 4, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting (60) Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae brief by Hispanic College Fund, LULAC, META, Inc; granting (62) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae by United Mexican States; granting (63) Motion for Leave to join Amicus Curiae by Argentina, Bolivia, Brazil, Chile, Comombia, Costa Rica, Dominican Republic, Ecuador, El Salvador, Guatemala, Honduras, Nicaragua, Paraguay, Peru, Uraguay; granting (64) Motion for Leave to join brief of Amici Curiae by HACU in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB; granting (19) Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae brief; granting (13) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae in case 2:11-cv-02746-SLB; granting (6) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae; granting (10) Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae in case 5:11-cv-02736-SLB. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/4/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(KAM, )
August 4, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting (57) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Roger Rice; granting (61) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Miguel Perez-Vargas in case 5:11-cv-02484-SLB; granting (14) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 2:11-cv-02746-SLB; granting (7) Motion for Leave to Appear PHV in case 5:11-cv-02736-SLB. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/4/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(KAM)
August 4, 2011 64 MOTION for Leave to File to Join Brief of Amici Curiae by Hispanic College Fund, LULAC, META, Inc., Hispanic Association of Colleges and Universities (HACU). Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Perez-Vargas, Miguel)
August 3, 2011 63 MOTION for leave to file Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Edward Still on behalf of Argentina, Bolivia, Brazil, Chile, Colombia, Costa Rica, Dominican Republic, Ecuador, El Salvador, Guatemala, Honduras, Nicaragua, Paraguay, Peru, Uruguay. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Still, Edward) Modified on 8/4/2011 (KAM, ).
August 3, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1452513. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Perez-Vargas, Miguel) NDAL rec# B4601025475 Modified on 8/4/2011 (KAM, ).
August 3, 2011 62 MOTION for leave to file Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Edward Still on behalf of United Mexican States. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix brief, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Still, Edward) Modified on 8/4/2011 (KAM, ).
August 3, 2011 61 MOTION for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE by Hispanic College Fund, LULAC, META, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Perez-Vargas, Miguel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2011: # 1 Exhibit) (KAM, ).
August 3, 2011 60 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by Hispanic College Fund, LULAC, META, Inc.. (Attachments: # Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-SLB, 5:11-cv-02736-SLB(Rice, Roger) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2011: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit) (KAM, ).
August 3, 2011 59 Featured Case ORDER granting motions to consolidate; motions for additional time are denied; PARTIES SHALL FILE ALL PLEADINGS IN LEAD CASE 5:11CV2484 SLB; Oral argument on the pending motions for preliminary injunction is set for 8/24/2011 09:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn. Dfts shall file their opposition to USA's motion for preliminary injunction by 8/15/2011; USA shall reply by 8/22/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/3/2011. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02484-SLB, 2:11-cv-02746-LSC, 5:11-cv-02736-CLS(KAM, )
August 3, 2011 58 RESPONSE to Motion re 53 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 54 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Additional Time NOT OPPOSING MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE, BUT OPPOSING MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME filed by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Brooke, Samuel)
August 3, 2011 57 MOTION for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE by LULAC, META, Inc., Hispanic College Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rice, Roger) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2011: # 1 cert, # 2 po) (KAM, ).
August 3, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1452083. (Rice, Roger) NDAL rec# B4601025474 Modified on 8/4/2011 (KAM, ).
August 3, 2011 56 RESPONSE to Motion re 53 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Freida Hill, Joseph B. Morton, Luther Strange. (Davis, James)
August 3, 2011 55 Featured Case ORDER re 53 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by United States of America; parties shall file any opposition to the motion by 8/8/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/3/2011. (KAM, )
August 3, 2011 54 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Additional Time by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Freida Hill, Joseph B. Morton, Luther Strange. (Davis, James)
August 2, 2011 53 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by United States of America. (Reeves, C)
August 1, 2011 52 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 36 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint : any opposition is due by 8/12/2011; Oral argument is set for 8/24/2011 09:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn.. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 8/1/2011. (KAM, )
August 1, 2011 51 ANSWER to Complaint by Jamie Blair, Randy Fuller, Jeffery E. Langham, Barbara W. Thompson, E. Casey Wardynski, Charles D. Warren.(Brooks, Taylor)
July 29, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 47 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV for Amy Pedersen 48 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV for Martha L. Gomez; granting 49 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV for Nina Perales; granting 50 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV for PHV for Victor Viramontes. Counsel must register for electronic case filing.. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 7/29/2011. (KAM, )
July 28, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1447844. (Brooke, Samuel) NDAL rec # B4601025223 for Victor Viramontes Modified on 7/29/2011 (KAM, ).
July 28, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1447842. (Brooke, Samuel) ALND rec# B4601025226 for Nina Perales Modified on 7/29/2011 (KAM, ).
July 28, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1447841. (Brooke, Samuel) ALND rec# B4601025227 for Martha L. Gomez Modified on 7/29/2011 (KAM, ).
July 28, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1447833. (Brooke, Samuel) ALND rec# B4601025224 for Amy Pendersen Modified on 7/29/2011 (KAM, ).
July 28, 2011 50 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Victor Viramontes by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 28, 2011 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Nina Perales by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 28, 2011 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Martha Gomez by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 28, 2011 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Amy Pedersen by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 26, 2011 46 RESPONSE to Motion re 2 MOTION for leave to proceed under pseudonyms filed by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Freida Hill, Joseph B. Morton, Luther Strange. (Fairbanks, Misty)
July 22, 2011 45 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 37 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support : Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2011 09:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 7/22/11. (ASL)
July 22, 2011 44 Featured Case ORDER that any amicus curiae brief shall be filed on or before 8/5/11. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 7/22/11. (ASL)
July 21, 2011 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor P Brooks on behalf of Jamie Blair, Randy Fuller, Jeffery E. Langham, Barbara W. Thompson, E. Casey Wardynski, Charles D. Warren (Brooks, Taylor)
July 21, 2011 42 NOTICE of Appearance by J R Brooks on behalf of Jamie Blair, Randy Fuller, Jeffery E. Langham, Barbara W. Thompson, E. Casey Wardynski, Charles D. Warren (Brooks, J)
July 21, 2011 41 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 37 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support : Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2011 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn; any opposition to plas' motion shall be filed on or before 8/5/11; plas may file their argument in reply on or before 8/15/11. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 7/21/11. (ASL)
July 21, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 38 Motion for Leave to Appear ; granting 39 Motion for Leave to Appear ; granting 40 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 07-21-2011. (SDB, )
July 21, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1443393. (Brooke, Samuel) USDC Rcpt #: B4601025105 - Modified on 7/21/2011 (FNC).
July 21, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1443392. (Brooke, Samuel) USDC Rcpt #: B4601025104 - Modified on 7/21/2011 (FNC).
July 21, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1443391. (Brooke, Samuel) USDC Rcpt #: B4601025103 - Modified on 7/21/2011 (FNC).
July 21, 2011 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Diana Sen by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 21, 2011 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Ghita Schwartz by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 21, 2011 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Foster Maer by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 21, 2011 37 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Ex 1-Index of Exhibits, # 2 Ex 2-Decl of Isabel Rubio, # 3 Ex 3-Decl of Mary Elizabeth Marr, # 4 Ex 4-Decl of Rosa Toussaint, # 5 Ex 5-Decl of Jemise Ray, # 6 Ex 6-Decl of John Pickens, # 7 Ex 7-Decl of Eliseo Medina, # 8 Ex 8-Decl of Harris Raynor, # 9 Ex 9-Decl of Joseph Hansen, # 10 Ex 10-Decl of Mohammad Abdollahi Ali-Beik, # 11 Ex 11-Decl of Scott Douglas, # 12 Ex 12-Decl of Grace Scire, # 13 Ex 13-Decl of Matt Webster, # 14 Ex 14-Decl of Maria D. Ceja Zamora, # 15 Ex 15-Decl of Pamela Long, # 16 Ex 16-Decl of Juan Pablo Black Romero, # 17 Ex 17-Decl of Christopher Barton Thau, # 18 Ex 18-Decl of Ellin Jimmerson, # 19 Ex 19-Decl of Robert Barber, # 20 Ex 20-Decl of Daniel Upton, # 21 Ex 21-Decl of Jeffrey Beck, # 22 Ex 22-Decl of Michelle Cummings, # 23 Ex 23-Decl of Esayas Haile, # 24 Ex 24-Decl of Fiseha Tesfamariam, # 25 Ex 25-Decl of Jane Doe #1, # 26 Ex 26-Decl of Jane Doe #2, # 27 Ex 27-Decl of Jane Doe #3, # 28 Ex 28-Decl of Jane Doe #4, # 29 Ex 29-Decl of Jane Doe #5, # 30 Ex 30-Decl of Jane Doe #6, # 31 Ex 31-Decl of John Doe #1, # 32 Ex 32-Decl of John Doe #2, # 33 Ex 33-Decl of John Doe #3, # 34 Ex 34-Decl of John Doe #4, # 35 Ex 35-Decl of John Doe #5, # 36 Ex 36-Decl of John Doe #6, # 37 Ex 37-Decl of Todd Entrekin, # 38 Ex 38-Decl of Mike Hale, # 39 Ex 39-Decl of George Gascn, # 40 Ex 40-Decl of Eduardo Gonzalez, # 41 Ex 41-Decl of Abraham Lowenthal, # 42 Ex 42-Decl of Rosi Gross-Smith with Exhibits A-E, # 43 Exhibits F-M to Gross-Smith Decl, # 44 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 20, 2011 36 MOTION for More Definite Statement, MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint by Robert Bentley, Robert L. Broussard, Freida Hill, Joseph B. Morton, Luther Strange. (Fairbanks, Misty)
July 20, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 07/20/2011. (SDB, )
July 20, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1442565. (Brooke, Samuel) ALND Rcpt #: B4601025093 - Modified on 7/21/2011 (FNC).
July 20, 2011 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Michael Tan by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 19, 2011 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen C Tumlin, Sin Yen Ling, Erin Emi Oshiro, Vivek Mittal, Daniel Werner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (PHV appearance granted) (KAM, )
July 15, 2011 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Long, Maria D. Ceja Zamora, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Boat People SOS, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Dreamactivist.org, Michelle Cummings, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Matt Webster, Robert Barber, Daniel Upton, Christopher Barton Thau, Aids Action Coalition, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Ellin Jimmerson, Service Employees International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Esayas Haile, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Huntsville International Help Center. Charles D. Warren served on 7/13/2011, answer due 8/3/2011. (Tsu, Naomi)
July 15, 2011 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Long, Maria D. Ceja Zamora, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Boat People SOS, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Dreamactivist.org, Michelle Cummings, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Matt Webster, Robert Barber, Daniel Upton, Christopher Barton Thau, Aids Action Coalition, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Ellin Jimmerson, Service Employees International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Esayas Haile, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Huntsville International Help Center. E. Casey Wardynski served on 7/11/2011, answer due 8/1/2011. (Tsu, Naomi)
July 15, 2011 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Long, Maria D. Ceja Zamora, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Boat People SOS, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Dreamactivist.org, Michelle Cummings, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Matt Webster, Robert Barber, Daniel Upton, Christopher Barton Thau, Aids Action Coalition, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Ellin Jimmerson, Service Employees International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Esayas Haile, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Huntsville International Help Center. Barbara W. Thompson served on 7/12/2011, answer due 8/2/2011. (Tsu, Naomi)
July 15, 2011 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Long, Maria D. Ceja Zamora, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Boat People SOS, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Dreamactivist.org, Michelle Cummings, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Matt Webster, Robert Barber, Daniel Upton, Christopher Barton Thau, Aids Action Coalition, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Ellin Jimmerson, Service Employees International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Esayas Haile, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Huntsville International Help Center. Luther Strange served on 7/12/2011, answer due 8/2/2011. (Tsu, Naomi)
July 15, 2011 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Long, Maria D. Ceja Zamora, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Boat People SOS, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Dreamactivist.org, Michelle Cummings, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Matt Webster, Robert Barber, Daniel Upton, Christopher Barton Thau, Aids Action Coalition, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Ellin Jimmerson, Service Employees International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Esayas Haile, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Huntsville International Help Center. Joseph B. Morton served on 7/12/2011, answer due 8/2/2011. (Tsu, Naomi)
July 15, 2011 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Long, Maria D. Ceja Zamora, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Boat People SOS, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Dreamactivist.org, Michelle Cummings, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Matt Webster, Robert Barber, Daniel Upton, Christopher Barton Thau, Aids Action Coalition, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Ellin Jimmerson, Service Employees International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Esayas Haile, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Huntsville International Help Center. Jeffery E. Langham served on 7/12/2011, answer due 8/2/2011. (Tsu, Naomi)
July 15, 2011 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Long, Maria D. Ceja Zamora, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Boat People SOS, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Dreamactivist.org, Michelle Cummings, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Matt Webster, Robert Barber, Daniel Upton, Christopher Barton Thau, Aids Action Coalition, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Ellin Jimmerson, Service Employees International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Esayas Haile, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Huntsville International Help Center. Freida Hill served on 7/12/2011, answer due 8/2/2011. (Tsu, Naomi)
July 15, 2011 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Long, Maria D. Ceja Zamora, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Boat People SOS, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Dreamactivist.org, Michelle Cummings, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Matt Webster, Robert Barber, Daniel Upton, Christopher Barton Thau, Aids Action Coalition, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Ellin Jimmerson, Service Employees International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Esayas Haile, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Huntsville International Help Center. Randy Fuller served on 7/13/2011, answer due 8/3/2011. (Tsu, Naomi)
July 15, 2011 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Long, Maria D. Ceja Zamora, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Boat People SOS, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Dreamactivist.org, Michelle Cummings, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Matt Webster, Robert Barber, Daniel Upton, Christopher Barton Thau, Aids Action Coalition, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Ellin Jimmerson, Service Employees International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Esayas Haile, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Huntsville International Help Center. Robert L. Broussard served on 7/8/2011, answer due 7/29/2011. (Tsu, Naomi)
July 15, 2011 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Long, Maria D. Ceja Zamora, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Boat People SOS, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Dreamactivist.org, Michelle Cummings, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Matt Webster, Robert Barber, Daniel Upton, Christopher Barton Thau, Aids Action Coalition, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Ellin Jimmerson, Service Employees International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Esayas Haile, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Huntsville International Help Center. Jamie Blair served on 7/13/2011, answer due 8/3/2011. (Tsu, Naomi)
July 15, 2011 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Long, Maria D. Ceja Zamora, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Boat People SOS, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Dreamactivist.org, Michelle Cummings, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Matt Webster, Robert Barber, Daniel Upton, Christopher Barton Thau, Aids Action Coalition, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Ellin Jimmerson, Service Employees International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Esayas Haile, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Huntsville International Help Center. Robert Bentley served on 7/12/2011, answer due 8/2/2011. (Tsu, Naomi)
July 14, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Shiu-Ming Cheer; granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Katherine Desormeau; granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Lee Gelernt; granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Omar Jadwat; granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Linton Joaquin; granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Melissa Keaney; granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Michelle Lapointe; granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Sin Yen Ling; granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Vivek Mittal; granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Elora Mukherjee; granting 15 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Erin Oshiro; granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Andre Segura; granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by G. Brian Spears; granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Kenneth Sugarman; granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Naomi Tsu; granting 20 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Karen Tumlin; granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Cecilia Wang; granting 22 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Daniel Werner. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 7/14/2011. (KAM, )
July 14, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Tanya Broder. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 7/14/2011. (KAM, )
July 14, 2011 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Lapointe, Naomi Tsu, Lee Gelernt, Elora Mukherjee, G Brian Spears, Cecilia Wang, Katherine Desormeau, Andre Segura, Tanya Broder, Omar Jadwat, Kenneth J Sugarman, Linton Joaquin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (KAM, )
July 14, 2011 NOTICE ALND rec#B4601024963 in the amount of $950.00 for 19 motions to appear phv paid via credit card (KAM, )
July 14, 2011 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald B Sweeney, Jr on behalf of Randy Fuller (Sweeney, Donald)
July 13, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1437509. (Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1437507. (Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1437503. (Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1437501. (Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1437498. (Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1437496. (Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1437495. (Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1437494. (Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1437493. (Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1437492. (Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1437491. (Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1437490. (Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1437489. (Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1437487. (Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1437486. (Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1437485. (Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1437484. (Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1437476. (Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1437474. (Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Daniel Werner by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Cecillia Wang by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Karen Tumlin by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Naomi Tsu by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Kenneth Sugarman by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - G. Brian Spears by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Andre Segura by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Erin Oshiro by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Elora Mukherjee by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Vivek Mittal by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Sin Yen Ling by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Michelle Lapointe by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Melissa Keaney by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Linton Joaquin by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Omar Jadwat by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Lee Gelernt by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Katherine Desormeau by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Shiu-Ming Cheer by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 13, 2011 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Tanya Broder by Aids Action Coalition, Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc., Robert Barber, Jeffrey Allen Beck, Boat People SOS, Michelle Cummings, Dreamactivist.org, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Esayas Haile, Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama, Huntsville International Help Center, Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama, Ellin Jimmerson, Pamela Long, Juan Pablo Black Romero, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United, Fiseha Tesfamariam, Christopher Barton Thau, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 1657, Daniel Upton, Matt Webster, Maria D. Ceja Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Samuel)
July 8, 2011 3 Summons Issued as to all Defendnants by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (SPT )
July 8, 2011 2 MOTION for leave to Proceed under Pseudonyms by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Index of Memorandum, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6 Part 1, # 9 Exhibit 6 Part 2, # 10 Proposed Order)(SPT )
July 8, 2011 1 COMPLAINT with Exibits against all Defendants filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(SPT )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama et al v. Bentley et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Dominican American National Roundtable
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Equality Alabama
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Federation of Southern Cooperatives/Land Assistance Fund
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Hispanic Federation
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Immigration Equality
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Montgomery Improvement Association
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Asian-Pacific Bar Association
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Association of Latino Elected and Appointed Officials
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Council of La Raza
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Employment Law Project
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Guestworker Alliance
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Immigration Law Project of the National Lawyers Guild
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: New Orleans Workers Center for Racial Justice
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Sikh American Legal Defense and Education Fund
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Society of American Law Teachers
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Southern Christian Leadership Conference
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Southern Coalition for Social Justice
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: United States Hispanic Leadership Institute
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Lawyers Guild
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: LULAC
Represented By: Miguel A Perez-Vargas
Represented By: Roger L Rice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: META, Inc.
Represented By: Miguel A Perez-Vargas
Represented By: Roger L Rice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Hispanic College Fund
Represented By: Miguel A Perez-Vargas
Represented By: Roger L Rice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: United Mexican States
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Argentina
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Bolivia
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Brazil
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Chile
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Colombia
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Costa Rica
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Dominican Republic
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Ecuador
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: El Salvador
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Guatemala
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Honduras
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Nicaragua
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Paraguay
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Peru
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Uruguay
Represented By: Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Hispanic Association of Colleges and Universities (HACU)
Represented By: Miguel A Perez-Vargas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Education Association
Represented By: J Cecil Gardner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Alabama Education Association
Represented By: J Cecil Gardner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Represented By: Thomas J Spina
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Vikram Badrinath
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Central Alabama Fair Housing Center
Represented By: James U Blacksher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Fair Housing Center of Northern Alabama
Represented By: James U Blacksher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: South Alabama Center for Fair Housing
Represented By: James U Blacksher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Anti-Defamation League
Represented By: David I Schoen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Alabama Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Klari B Tedrow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: NAACP Alabama Conference
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: ACHR
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Alabama NOW
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: AALDEF
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Birmingham Peace Project
Represented By: David Gespass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bentley
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Winfield J Sinclair
Represented By: William G Parker, Jr
Represented By: Margaret L Fleming
Represented By: Misty S Fairbanks
Represented By: James W Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Strange
Represented By: Winfield J Sinclair
Represented By: William G Parker, Jr
Represented By: Margaret L Fleming
Represented By: Misty S Fairbanks
Represented By: James W Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph B. Morton
Represented By: Winfield J Sinclair
Represented By: William G Parker, Jr
Represented By: Margaret L Fleming
Represented By: Misty S Fairbanks
Represented By: James W Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freida Hill
Represented By: Winfield J Sinclair
Represented By: William G Parker, Jr
Represented By: Margaret L Fleming
Represented By: Misty S Fairbanks
Represented By: James W Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Casey Wardynski
Represented By: Taylor P Brooks
Represented By: J R Brooks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Blair
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Taylor P Brooks
Represented By: J R Brooks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Fuller
Represented By: Donald B Sweeney, Jr
Represented By: Taylor P Brooks
Represented By: J R Brooks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. Warren
Represented By: Taylor P Brooks
Represented By: J R Brooks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara W. Thompson
Represented By: Taylor P Brooks
Represented By: J R Brooks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery E. Langham
Represented By: Taylor P Brooks
Represented By: J R Brooks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Broussard
Represented By: Winfield J Sinclair
Represented By: William G Parker, Jr
Represented By: Margaret L Fleming
Represented By: Misty S Fairbanks
Represented By: James W Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: James U Blacksher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hispanic Interest Coalition of Alabama
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aids Action Coalition
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huntsville International Help Center
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interpreters and Translators Assocation of Alabama
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Inc.
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Service Employees International Union
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers United
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Food and Commercial Workers International Union
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 1657 United Food and Commercial Workers International Union
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dreamactivist.org
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater Birmingham Ministries
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boat People SOS
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Webster
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria D. Ceja Zamora
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Long
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Pablo Black Romero
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Barton Thau
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellin Jimmerson
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Barber
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Upton
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Allen Beck
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Cummings
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esayas Haile
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiseha Tesfamariam
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel J Brooke
Represented By: Ben E Bruner
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martha L Gomez
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Represented By: Michelle Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Foster S Maer
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Vivek Mittal
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Erin Emi Oshiro
Represented By: Amy Pedersen
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Diana S Sen
Represented By: G Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth J Sugarman
Represented By: Michael Kt Tan
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H Turner
Represented By: Victor G Viramontes
Represented By: Cecilia Wang
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: United States of America
Represented By: C Lee Reeves, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]