Bobo v. AGCO Corporation et al

Defendant: Tennessee Valley Authority, Unilever United States, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Ford Motor Company, Consolidated Aluminum Corporation, Dana Companies LLC, CBS Corporation, CONOPCO, Inc. and AGCO Corporation
Plaintiff: Barbara Bobo
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv01930
Filed: May 21, 2012
 
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Northeastern Office
County: Lauderdale
Presiding Judge: C Lynwood Smith
 
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2013 174 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that TVA's first motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as more fully set out thereon; the parties are ORDERED to inform this court in their proposed, amended scheduling order of not only t he date on which they anticipate that TVA's second motion for summary judgment will be ripe for decision, but also whether additional briefs in support of and opposition to that motion will be required as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 10/28/2013. (AHI )
August 25, 2014 188 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the 129 MOTION Exclude Specific Causation Opinion of Doctor Wulsin is MOOT and of Doctor Mark is DENIED as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 8/25/2014. (AHI)
April 15, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the Tennessee Valley Authority's motion to dismiss plaintiff's punitive damages claim and strike her jury demand is GRANTED, and plaintiff's motion for leave to amend her complaint is DENIED as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 4/15/2013. (AHI) Modified on 4/15/2013 (AHI).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bobo v. AGCO Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Valley Authority
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unilever United States, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael A Vercher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: W Larkin Radney, IV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Aluminum Corporation
Represented By: Clifton Wayne Jefferis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Represented By: Evelyn Fletcher Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: James A Harris, III
Represented By: Nicole Mapp Hardee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONOPCO, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGCO Corporation
Represented By: Stacey Leigh Strain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Bobo
Represented By: Rachel Perkins
Represented By: Christopher J Panatier
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]