Watkins v. Regions Mortgage Inc et al

Defendant: Sirote & Permutt PC, Regions Mortgage Inc and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: Trinae D Watkins
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv03902
Filed: November 19, 2012
 
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Northeastern Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2013 28 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 11 and 12 , Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, are GRANTED with respect to the FDCPA claims, but DENIED in all other respects, as further set out in order. Plaintiff's FDCPA claims against Regions and Sirote are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 01/07/13. (CVA)
February 11, 2013 56 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: As further set out in order, 52 , Motion for Extension of Time to Pay the Required Bond, is DENIED. The Preliminary Injunction bond is DISSOLVED. 39 , Defendant Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation's Motion to Dismiss, is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The court DENIES Freddie Mac's motion to dismiss the TILA claim, but GRANTS the motion in all other respects. Accordingly, Watkins's FDCPA and wrongful foreclosure claims against Freddie Mac are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 02/11/13. (CVA)
May 31, 2013 98 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: As further set out in order, Plaintiff's motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED, but Defendant's motion for Summaray Judgment is GRANTED. Accordingly, the court quiets title to the Property in favor of Defendants and this lawsuit is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 05/31/2013. (CVA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Watkins v. Regions Mortgage Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sirote & Permutt PC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Mortgage Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinae D Watkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]