Drago et al v. Holiday Isle, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Chip Drago and Kathy Jumper Drago
Defendant: Holiday Isle, LLC, The Mitchell Company, Inc. and Bay Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2007cv00430
Filed: June 13, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1701 Interstate Land Sales Full Disclosure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2008 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for parties to file a joint status report as to the arbitration and the bankruptcy. Status Report due by 1/9/2009.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/17/08. (cmj)
January 13, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for parties to file joint status report. ( Status Report due by 3/13/2009.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/13/09. (cmj)
September 28, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion to Consolidate Civil Action 07-0430-KD-B with 07-0771-WS-M. Lead Case No.: 07-0771-WS-M, Member Case No.: 07-0430-KD-B. The Clerk is directed to extract documents 1-41 from Civil Action No. 07-0430-KD-B and to make those documents a part of the court file in Civil Action No. 07-0771-WS-M. All future pleadings to be filed in the Lead Case. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 9/28/09. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drago et al v. Holiday Isle, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chip Drago
Represented By: Melissa Mutert Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Jumper Drago
Represented By: Melissa Mutert Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Isle, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mitchell Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.