MDM Group Associates, Inc. v. L.A. Real Estate et al

Plaintiff: MDM Group Associates, Inc.
Defendant: L.A. Real Estate, Debbie Harper, John Harper and Carol Peters
Case Number: 1:2010cv00234
Filed: May 5, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 20 Suggestion of Bankruptcy as to Dft Debbie Harper. This action is STAYED as to Debbie Harper. Plf is to notify the court w/i 30 days of the resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings or lift of stay, whichever occurs first. Court's 16 Order directing USM to serve Debbie Harper is RESCINDED. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/31/10. (tot)
December 14, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to L.A. Real Estate filed by MDM Group Associates, Inc. Court finds that Plf is entitled to a permanent injunction against L.A. Real Estate as well as statutory damages in the amount of $150,000.00 for copyright infringement, & attnys fees & costs in the amount of $19,212.85. Court finds that a hrg is necessary to determine the amount of actual damages Plf is entitled to recover under its Lanham Act & common law unfair competition claim. Hearing set for 12/17/2010 at 09:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2B, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Judge Callie V. S. Granade.. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/14/10. (tot)
December 17, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of MDM Group Associates, Inc. against L.A. Real Estate in the amount of $459,837.85 as set out. MDM Group Associates, Inc. is entitled to a permanent injunction as set out & is entitled to an order requiring destructio n, impoundment, or other reasonable disposition of all copies of the MDM Waiver Program & any infringing materials in possession of L.A. Real Estate, & L.A. Real Estate is to deliver all materials & copies as set out similar & related to the work of MDM as set out, together w/all records, software, & other means for making such copies. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/17/10. (copy mailed to L.A. Real Estate on 12/20/10) (tot)
January 20, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plf's 29 MOTION to Dismiss & DISMISSING Plf's claims against Dfts John Harper & Debbie Harper w/o prejudice as set out. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/20/2011. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MDM Group Associates, Inc. v. L.A. Real Estate et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MDM Group Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Edward A. Dean
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.A. Real Estate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Harper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Harper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Peters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]