Regions Equipment Finance Corporation v. M/V ACCU I (Official Number 533962) et al

Plaintiff: Regions Equipment Finance Corporation
Defendant: M/V ACCU I (Official Number 533962) and AT 1800B (Official Number 530112)
Case Number: 1:2010cv00258
Filed: May 19, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Regions' Motion for Summary Judgment against the defendant vessels in rem; finding as moot 42 Motion to Strike paragraphs of the Henry Wuerst affidavit. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/27/2010. (cmj)
March 10, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 74 Order on Motion to Confirm Sale. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/10/2011. (copy to USM) (cmj)
June 1, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds re: doc. 90 . Waterways' claim for attorney's fees is allowed and Waterways is awarded a reasonable attorney's fee in the amount of $6,689.10. Further, Waterways' claim for additional service charges in the amount of $417.70 is allowed. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to disburse from the sale proceeds of the vessels the sum of $7,106.80, payable to Waterways, and deliver the payment to Waterways' counsel. Upon delivery, Waterways' claim shall be discharged. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/1/2011. copies to parties & emailed to Finance & PWP. (sdb)
August 22, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 93 Motion for Disbursement of Funds; granting 94 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to disburse the remaining balance from the proceeds of the sales to Regions as further set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/22/2011. copies to parties and emailed to Finance. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regions Equipment Finance Corporation v. M/V ACCU I (Official Number 533962) et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regions Equipment Finance Corporation
Represented By: E. Barry Johnson Parker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V ACCU I (Official Number 533962)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT 1800B (Official Number 530112)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]