Costa v. Sam's East, Inc.

Plaintiff: Eugene M. Costa
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00297
Filed: June 7, 2011
 
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Butler
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2012 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 109 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or in the Alternative, Motion for New Trial or in the Alternative, Motion for Remittitur. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/31/2012. (tgw)
June 26, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion to Alter, Amend or Vacate. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/26/2012. (tgw)
July 13, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 Motion to Substitute Parties without the need for plaintiff to refile the Complaint to effect the change. All filings in this action should identify the plaintiff in the style of the action as "EVA COSTA, as Personal Representative for the Estate of EUGENE M. COSTA, deceased." Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/13/2012. (sdb)
August 6, 2012 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Motion in Limine; granting 68 Motion in Limine; Defendants catch-all 71 Motion in Limine is moot as to the issues of parties' wealth/poverty and Ms. Costa's injuries or damages. The 71 Motion isgranted as to the purported Blue Cross / Blue Shield lien, as further set out.; granting in part 72 Motion in Limine; denying 74 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/6/2012. (sdb)
August 8, 2012 86 Opinion or Order of the Court Order addressing the Objections (doc. 77) to Plaintiffs Deposition Testimony Designations (doc. 70), as set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/8/2012. (tgw)
August 9, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court Order to guide the parties in their trial preparation efforts. This action will not be tried as a premises liability case, but will rather be presented to the jury in the traditional negligence framework, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/9/2012. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Costa v. Sam's East, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene M. Costa
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc.
Represented By: Chad Marchand
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]