Jurich v. Compass Marine, Inc. et al

Defendant: ABC Shipping Co., Compass Marine, Inc. and REC Marine Logistics, LLC
Plaintiff: Nickolas Jurich
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00176
Filed: March 9, 2012
 
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
 
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2013 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 130 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 141 Motion to Certify Class; granting 143 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's remaining counts against the defendant are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/7/2013. (adk)
June 27, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot the 6 Motion to Dismiss, 27 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply, 28 Motion for Leave to Attach Exhibit, 32 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief, 34 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. REC's 23 Motion to Dismiss, to the extent based on an asserted lack of personal jurisdiction, is denied. In all other respects, RECs motion to dismiss is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/26/2012. (tgw)
November 8, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING without prejudice the defendants ABC Shipping Co., TiburonDivers, K&K Offshore, LLC, and Ranger Offshore, Inc.. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/8/2012. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jurich v. Compass Marine, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Shipping Co.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Marine, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REC Marine Logistics, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nickolas Jurich
Represented By: Dennis Michael O'Bryan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]