In Re: Natures Way Marine, LLC

Plaintiff: Natures Way Marine, LLC
Claimant: Charles E Brunson
Case Number: 1:2012cv00390
Filed: June 12, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2013 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 83 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by FlexiCrew Staffing, Inc. is DENIED. Apex/FCC, LLC's request for leave to amend its cross-claim against FlexiCrew Staffing, Inc. is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/28/2013. (cmj)
September 24, 2013 264 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Apex, LLC's, d/b/a FCC Oilfield Services 187 Motion for Summary Judgment as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/24/2013. (cmj)
October 1, 2013 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Natures Way Marine, LLC's 241 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Brunson's negligence claim. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/1/2013. copies to parties. (sdb)
October 11, 2013 269 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 268 Motion for Reconsideration or in the Alternative Motion for Interlocutory Appeal, for reasons set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/11/2013. (cmj)
November 25, 2013 276 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding Flexicrew's 178 Motion for Summary Judgment is moot as to Natures Way's claims against it and granted as to Apex's claims against it. It is further ordered that USES' 190 Motion for Summary Judgment is moot as to Natures Way's claims against it and denied at this time as to Apex's claim against it. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/25/2013. (cmj)
November 25, 2013 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART Apex's 244 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Brunson's state law claims for negligence and wantonness; and Brunson's LHWCA claims are CARRIED TO TRIAL. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/25/2013. (cmj)
September 17, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Motion to Strike Brunson's stipulations ; granting 28 Motion to Strike Brunson's jury demand; denying 9 Motion to Lift Stay; denying as moot 17 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/17/2012. (cmj)
November 8, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Consolidating Cases. Lead Case No.: 12-0390-KD-N, Member Case No.: 12-0507-WS-N, All future pleadings to be filed in the Lead Case. The Clerk is directed to extract Docs. 1-21 & make them a part of the court file in 12-390. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/8/2012. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Natures Way Marine, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natures Way Marine, LLC
Represented By: Marion A. Quina, Jr.
Represented By: John P. Kavanagh, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Marriott Wood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Charles E Brunson
Represented By: Dwain C Denniston
Represented By: Dwain Churchill Denniston, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]