Penn v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Charles E. Penn
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00082
Filed: February 21, 2013
 
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2013 24 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER entered. Upon consideration of the administrative record and the memoranda of the parties, it is ORDERED that the decision of the Commissioner be AFFIRMED and that this action be DISMISSED, as further set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 11/18/2013. (clr)
November 19, 2013 25 Featured Case AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER entered...Upon consideration of the administrative record and the memoranda of the parties, it is ORDERED that the decision of the Commissioner be REVERSED and REMANDED to the Social Security Administration for further action not inconsistent with the Orders of the Court, as further set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 11/19/2013. (clr)
November 19, 2013 26 Featured Case JUDGMENT entered in accordance with the Order entered this date in favor of Plaintiff Charles E. Penn and against Defendant Carolyn W. Colvin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 11/19/2013. (clr)
February 14, 2014 29 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER entered re 27 Motion for Attorney Fees (EAJA). It is ORDERED that the Motion be GRANTED and that Plaintiff be AWARDED an EAJA attorneys fee in the amount of $3,807.46, as further set out in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 2/14/2014. (clr)
February 14, 2014 30 Featured Case JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. In accordance with the Order entered this date, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that JUDGMENT be entered in favor of Plaintiff Charles E. Penn and against Defendant Carolyn W. Colvin. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff be AWARDED an EAJA attorneys fee in the amount of $3,807.46. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 2/14/2014. (clr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Penn v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Penn
Represented By: Byron A. Lassiter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]