Allen et al v. The City of Evergreen, Alabama et al

Defendant: Pete Wolff, III, Luther Upton, Maxine Harris, The City of Evergreen, Alabama, John Skinner, Jr., Diane Skipper, Vivian Fountain and Becky B. Robinson
Plaintiff: Dan Allen, Bobby Watkins and Alberta Lee
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00107
Filed: March 1, 2013
 
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Conecuh
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 36 renewed motion for entry of court-ordered redistricting plan and election schedule. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/20/2013. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mab)
April 24, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendants' 48 Motion to alter or amend; and granting Plaintiffs' 50 cross-motion for supplemental order. The May 21, 2013 special election date for the City of Evergreen is reconfirmed and the election shall go forward on that date. Defendants are ENJOINED to give all assistance to the Special Master who shall ensure the requirements as set forth in order. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall not contact the Special Master, nor shall the Special Master contact any party or party representative without notice to and participation of both parties, unless both participation is specially waived. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/24/2013. (Attachment: # 1 List of Eligible Voters) (mab)
April 29, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, telephonic hearings held 4/25/2013 & 4/29/2013. Defendants' 48 Motion to alter or amend is GRANTED. The date for the municipal election for the City of Evergreen is hereby scheduled for June 18, 2013. Parties will hereafter abide by all additional dates for the election and any needed run-off election as set out in the Special Master's affidavit attached to motion (Doc. 48-1), with exception that notice of the election will begin on 5/2/2013, rather than 4/25/2013. The qualifying period for candidates ended on 4/8/2013, and will not be re-opened. (copy to Special Master). Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/29/2013. (mab)
June 11, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plf's 55 Motion for Further Relief as to Certain Absentee Ballots as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/11/2013. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Allen et al v. The City of Evergreen, Alabama et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Wolff, III
Represented By: Dorman Walker
Represented By: Jesse Kirk Anderson
Represented By: James H. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Upton
Represented By: Dorman Walker
Represented By: Jesse Kirk Anderson
Represented By: James H. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxine Harris
Represented By: Jesse Kirk Anderson
Represented By: James H. Anderson
Represented By: Dorman Walker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Evergreen, Alabama
Represented By: Dorman Walker
Represented By: Jesse Kirk Anderson
Represented By: James H. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Skinner, Jr.
Represented By: Dorman Walker
Represented By: Jesse Kirk Anderson
Represented By: James H. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Skipper
Represented By: Dorman Walker
Represented By: Jesse Kirk Anderson
Represented By: James H. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Fountain
Represented By: Dorman Walker
Represented By: Jesse Kirk Anderson
Represented By: James H. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky B. Robinson
Represented By: James H. Anderson
Represented By: Jesse Kirk Anderson
Represented By: Dorman Walker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Allen
Represented By: John K. Tanner
Represented By: Amardo Wesley Pitters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Watkins
Represented By: John K. Tanner
Represented By: Amardo Wesley Pitters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberta Lee
Represented By: John K. Tanner
Represented By: Amardo Wesley Pitters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]