Patterson et al v. Walden et al

Defendant: Willie Lee Patrick, City of Atmore, Scott Walden and Jason Dean
Plaintiff: DeWayne Russell and Betty Patterson
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00109
Filed: March 5, 2013
 
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Escambia
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part denying in part 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Scott Walden, granting 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jason Dean, granting 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Atmore. Answer due from Scott Walden on 7/2/2013. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/18/2013. (tgw)
January 2, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 53 Motion for Default Judgment against Willie Patrick. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/2/2014. copy of order mailed to Willie Patrick, as directed. (sdb)
March 5, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 59 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to Willie Patrick. Evidentiary Hearing set for 4/2/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2A before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/3/2014. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Patterson et al v. Walden et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Lee Patrick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Atmore
Represented By: Erin B. Fleming
Represented By: Terry A. Sides
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Walden
Represented By: Erin B. Fleming
Represented By: Terry A. Sides
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Dean
Represented By: Erin B. Fleming
Represented By: Terry A. Sides
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeWayne Russell
Represented By: Larry C. Moorer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Patterson
Represented By: Larry C. Moorer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]