Quinn v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al

Plaintiff: Derek Quinn
Defendant: Novastar Mortgage Funding Trust, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc. and Ocwen Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00115
Filed: March 8, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to motions for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/17/2014. (tgw)
February 25, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Derek Quinn. The Clerk is directed to to unrestrict the audio file (Doc. 49) as to Quinn, so that he may access it if he so desires. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/25/2014. (tgw)
March 12, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings; finding as moot 62 Motion to Strike and the 59 Jury Demand; granting 42 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. A separate judgment will enter. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/12/2014. (tgw)
April 11, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 68 Motion for New Trial or to Alter, Amend or Vacate Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/11/2014. (tgw)
May 15, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 74 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/15/2014. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinn v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Quinn
Represented By: Robert E. Rone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novastar Mortgage Funding Trust
Represented By: Robert Jason Crane
Represented By: Kent D. McPhail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Kent D. McPhail
Represented By: Robert Jason Crane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Steven Anderson
Represented By: Graham Webster Gerhardt
Represented By: Michael R. Pennington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Robert Jason Crane
Represented By: Kent D. McPhail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]