Thalassinos v. Adair et al

Defendant: Ellis Automobile Sales Company, Doug Jones, Kalle Ellis, A. Jayson Adair, Copart, Chris Barto and J. P. Nagel
Plaintiff: Ted Thalassinos
Case Number: 1:2013cv00187
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court Order directing the Plaintiff to file an amended complaint by 6/3/2013. Plaintiff is also ordered by 6/10/2013 to file supplemental legal & evidentiary showing to support his contention that he validly served process on defendants Kalle Ellis, Jones, Barto, Adair and Nagel. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/20/2013. Copy mailed to Plaintiff and to defendants as set out. (tgw)
June 26, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the 17 Motion to Reconsider. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/26/2013. Copy mailed to Plaintiff & Byron Ellis c/o Ellis Automobile Sales Company. (tgw)
May 9, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 5 Answer to Complaint filed by Ellis Automobile Sales Company. Ellis Automobile is ordered by 5/30/2013 to notify the Court via notice of appearance the name & address of the counsel it has retained to represent its interests in this action. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/9/2013. Copy mailed to Plaintiff & Byron Ellis c/o Ellis Automobile Sales Company (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thalassinos v. Adair et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellis Automobile Sales Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalle Ellis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Jayson Adair
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copart
Represented By: Jarrod J. White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Barto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. P. Nagel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Thalassinos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]