Givens v. Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc. et al

Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. and Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Margaret Taylor Givens
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00245
Filed: May 1, 2013
 
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Saxon's 48 Motion for Summary Judgment - denied as to Counts One and Two of the Amended Complaint only to the extent Givens claims she was fraudulently induced to enter into the HAMP modification process, is denied as to Count Six of the Amended Complaint, and is otherwise granted; granting RCS's 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/30/14. (cmj)
June 13, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court Order setting this action for MEDIATION on 6/20/2014 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Judge's Chambers (Room 459), 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/13/2014. copies to parties. (sdb)
June 20, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, DENYING Defendant Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.'s 72 Motion to Reconsider Order Regarding Saxon's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/20/2014. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Givens v. Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Taylor Givens
Represented By: John R. Parker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]