In Re: In the Matter of the Complaint of Kirby Inland Marine, LP

Plaintiff: In the Matter of the Complaint of Kirby Inland Marine, LP
Claimant: Casey Tyson, Justin Kyle Benoit, Maebell Muns Benoit, Oil Recovery Company, Inc. of Alabama and ORCA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00319
Filed: June 17, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Marine-Exoneration from/or Limitation of Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 12 & 37 Motions to Clarify or, if necessary, to amend the limitation injunction. The motions to clarify are granted, as set out. The motions to amend the injunction limitation are denied as moot. The 26 Motion for Oral Argument is denied. The similar request for oral argument (Doc. 28 ) is likewise denied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/6/2013. (tgw)
August 6, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 28 request, construed as a motion, to preclude the Tyson-Benoit claimants and all other potential state court plaintiffs from prosecuting their claims against ORCA in state court pending this Court's determination of liability. The requests for oral argument (Docs. 26 & 28) are denied Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/6/2013. (tgw)
August 8, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the 14 & 38 Motions for an order to increase the limitation fund and security therefor. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/8/2013. (tgw)
August 30, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion to Consolidate. Lead Case No.: 13-318-WS-C, Member Case No.: 13-319-WS-C, 13-321-WS-C. All future pleadings to be filed in the Lead Case. The Clerk is directed to extract documents 1-67 in 3-0319-WS-C, and documents 1-57 in 13-0321-WS-C, and to make those documents a part of the court file in 13-0318-WS-C. The Clerk is directed to statistically close 13-0319-WS-C and 13-0321-WS-C. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/30/2013. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: In the Matter of the Complaint of Kirby Inland Marine, LP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: In the Matter of the Complaint of Kirby Inland Marine, LP
Represented By: J. Dwight LeBlanc, III
Represented By: Lara N. DiCristina
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Casey Tyson
Represented By: David A. Bagwell
Represented By: David S. Cain, Jr.
Represented By: George W. Finkbohner, III
Represented By: David G. Wirtes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Justin Kyle Benoit
Represented By: David A. Bagwell
Represented By: David S. Cain, Jr.
Represented By: George W. Finkbohner, III
Represented By: David G. Wirtes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Maebell Muns Benoit
Represented By: David A. Bagwell
Represented By: David S. Cain, Jr.
Represented By: George W. Finkbohner, III
Represented By: David G. Wirtes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Oil Recovery Company, Inc. of Alabama
Represented By: M. Kathleen Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ORCA, Inc.
Represented By: M. Kathleen Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]