Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company v. Mr. Charlie Adventures, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Kim P. Kornegay and Mr. Charlie Adventures, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00458
Filed: September 13, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Guy Plaisance; granting 35 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Gary Jones. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/5/2014. copies to parties. (sdb)
November 7, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, GRANTING Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and summary judgment; granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 58 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 59 Motion to Strike ; denying 62 Motion for Oral Argument. The parties are ORDERED to submit a proposed judgment on or before 11/21/2014 and to advise the court of any remaining issues. The Pretrial Conference scheduled for Monday, November 10, 2014 is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/7/2014. (mab)
May 5, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Dfts' 78 Motion to Alter or Amend as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/5/2015. (tot)
May 19, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that judgment is entered (1) in favor of Defendants, Mr. Charlie Adventures, LLC and Kim P. Kornegay, and against the Plaintiff, Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, on Plaintiff's cla im for a declaratory judgment; (2) in favor of Defendants, Mr. Charlie Adventures, LLC and Kim P. Kornegay, and against the Plaintiff, Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, on Defendants' counterclaim for breach of contract in the amount of  6;862,431.22; (3) in favor of Plaintiff, Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, and against the Defendants, Mr. Charlie Adventures, LLC and Kim P. Kornegay, on the Defendants' counterclaim for bad faith. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/19/2015. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company v. Mr. Charlie Adventures, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Represented By: William E. Shreve, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim P. Kornegay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Charlie Adventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.