Barclay v. Fuller

Plaintiff: Timothy Barclay
Defendant: Marcus M. Fuller
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00169
Filed: August 23, 2011
 
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: Timothy M. Burgess
 
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2012 34 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Timothy Barclay, 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Timothy Barclay, 20 MOTION for Hearing filed by Timothy Barclay, 19 MOTION for Oral Argument filed by Timothy B arclay, 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Marcus M. Fuller. Magistrate Judge Recommends DENYING MOTIONS. Objections to R&R due by 4/9/2012 ; Reply to Objections to R&R due by 4/16/2012. Signed by Judge John D. Roberts on 4/4/12. (CLW, COURT STAFF) =
June 14, 2012 37 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 34 Recommendation DENYING 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, DENYING 13 Motion for Summary Judgment, DENYING 16 Motion for Summary Judgment, DENYING 19 Motion for Oral Argument; and DENYING 20 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 6/14/12. (SRL, CHAMBERS STAFF)
February 22, 2013 63 Featured Case JDR ORDER denying 53 Motion to Compel. Order signed by Judge John D. Roberts on 2/21/2013. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
November 15, 2013 74 Featured Case JDR MINUTE ORDER re Scheduling and Planning Order. A scheduling and Planning Conference was held on 11/13/2013. Pursuant to that hearing a new Scheduling and Planning Schedule will issue under separate cover. Signed by Judge John D. Roberts on 11/15/13. (JAM, Chambers Staff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Barclay v. Fuller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Barclay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus M. Fuller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]