GBC International Bank v. MISS CORINNE, official number 607659 et al

Plaintiff: GBC International Bank
Defendant: MISS CORINNE, official number 607659 and F/V MISS CORINNE LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00035
Filed: February 16, 2012
 
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: Sharon L. Gleason
Referring Judge: John D. Roberts
 
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JDR ORDER granting Motion 4 for In Rem Arrest of Vessel. Order signed by Judge John D. Roberts 2/17/2012. cc: USM (JAM, Chambers Staff)
June 5, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JDR ORDER granting Motion 35 for Interlocutory Sale of Vessel. cc:USM/Finance (JAM, Chambers Staff)
July 9, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 49 MOTION for confirmation of vessel sale filed by GBC International Bank. Magistrate Judge recommendas GRANTING motion. Signed by Judge John D. Roberts on 7/9/12. (CLW, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: GBC International Bank v. MISS CORINNE, official number 607659 et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GBC International Bank
Represented By: Mark C. Manning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MISS CORINNE, official number 607659
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V MISS CORINNE LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]