MDY Industries, LLC v. Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. et al Featured Case

MDY Industries, LLC seeks a declaratory judgment that its product¬óWOWGLIDER¬ódoes not infringe on the Defendant\'s copyrights to World of Warcraft, violate the DMCA or interfere with the contractual relationships between Defendants and their World of Warcraft customers.

Counter_claimant: Vivendi Games Incorporated and Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated
Counter_defendant: MDY Industries LLC
Defendant: Vivendi Games Incorporated and Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Vivendi Games Incorporated and Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated
Plaintiff: MDY Industries LLC
Amicus: Public Knowledge
Thirdparty_defendant: Michael Donnelly
Case Number: 2:2006cv02555
Filed: October 25, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2009 148 Ninth Circuit Case Number 09-16044 for 134 Notice of Cross Appeal. (LSP)
July 16, 2009 147 Featured Case ORDER denying 132 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/16/2009.(NVO)
June 25, 2009 146 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD TRANSMITTED TO 9TH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re 134 Notice of Cross Appeal. (LAD)
June 22, 2009 145 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by MDY Industries, LLC for proceedings held on 6/26/08; 1/8/09; 1/9/09 before Judge David G. Campbell. (Meaney, Joseph)
June 19, 2009 144 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by MDY Industries, LLC for proceedings held on 6/26/2008; 1/8/2009; 1/9/2009 before Judge David G. Campbell. (Meaney, Joseph)
June 11, 2009 143 REPLY in Support re 132 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Court's March 10, 2009 Order filed by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Genetski, Christian)
June 1, 2009 142 RESPONSE to Motion re 132 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Court's March 10, 2009 Order filed by Michael Donnelly, MDY Industries, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Michael Donnelly)(Meaney, Joseph)
May 21, 2009 141 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT 139 and 140 (BAS, )
May 21, 2009 140 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Bench Trial Day 2 held on 1/9/09 before Judge David G Campbell. Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/11/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2009. (BAS, )
May 21, 2009 139 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Bench Trial Day 1 held on 1/8/09 before Judge David G Campbell. Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/11/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2009. (BAS, )
May 14, 2009 CADS Sent re 134 Notice of Cross Appeal: Civil Appeals docketing sent to 9th Circuit on this date. (LAD)
May 14, 2009 138 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT 137 (BAS, )
May 14, 2009 137 TRANSCRIPT filed for hearing on Motion Hearing for dates of 6/26/08 before Judge David G Campbell. Court Reporter: Elizabeth A Lemke. Re 134 Notice of Cross Appeal, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2009. (BAS, )
May 13, 2009 136 Copy of Electronically Filed CADS Sent re 134 Notice of Cross Appeal: Civil Appeals docketing sent to 9th Circuit on this date. (Counsel to submit on paper). (LAD)
May 13, 2009 135 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re: 134 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. Filed dates for: Notice of Appeal *5/12/2009*, *Complaint* *10/25/2006*, Appealed Order *4/1/09*, Appealed Judgment *4/1/09*. Court Reporter *Elizabeth Lemke 602-322-7247; Patricia Lyons 602-322-7257* Fee Status: *Paid on 5/12/2009 in the amount of $455.00*.************. Appellant Attorney: *Christian Stephen Genetski, Samuel Bryant Davidoff, Scott Jeremy Stein, Shane M. McGee, Shaun M. Klein* *(ret)* *cgenetski@sonnenschein.com, sdavidoff@sonnenschein.com, sstein@sonnenschein.com, smcgee@sonnenschein.com, sklein@sonnenschein.com*. Appellee Attorney: *Joseph Richard Meaney, Lance Christopher Venable* *(ret)* *docketing@vclmlaw.com, docketing@vclmlaw.com***. Copies sent to all parties and 9th Circuit. (LAD)
May 12, 2009 134 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL to 9th Circuit re judgment 123 by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. Filing fee received: $ 455.00, receipt number 09700000000002812911 (Attachments: # 1 Docketing Statement, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Genetski, Christian) Modified on 5/13/2009 to reflect document linkage (LAD).
May 12, 2009 133 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 132 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Court's March 10, 2009 Order (Proposed Order Text) by Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Genetski, Christian)
May 12, 2009 132 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Court's March 10, 2009 Order by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit S. McGee Letter, # 2 Exhibit Rupprecht Letter, # 3 Exhibit Rupprecht Letter, # 4 Exhibit Rupprecht Letter, # 5 Exhibit Rupprecht Email, # 6 Exhibit 9th Circuit Order, # 7 Exhibit Donnelly Forum Post)(Genetski, Christian)
May 12, 2009 131 MANDATE of 9th Circuit (Certified Copy), granting the parties' motion to dismiss this appeal. The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal re case number 09-15649, as to 121 Notice of Appeal, filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 NDA) (LAD)
May 11, 2009 130 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 09-15932 for 128 Notice of Appeal. (LAD)
May 1, 2009 129 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re: 128 Notice of Appeal,, filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. Filed dates for: Notice of Appeal *4/29/2009*, *Complaint* *10/25/2006*, Appealed Order *4/1/09*, Appealed Judgment *4/1/09*. Court Reporter *Patricia Lyons: 602-322-7257; Elizabeth Lemke: 602-322-7247* Fee Status: *Paid on 4/29/2009 in the amount of $455.00*.************. Appellant Attorney: *Joseph Richard Meaney; Lance Christopher Venable*** *docketing@vclmlaw.com*. Appellee Attorney: *Christian Stephen Genetski; Scott Jeremy Stein; Shane M.McGee; Shaun M. Klein*** *cgenetski@sonnenschein.com; sstein@sonnenschein.com; smcgee@sonnenschein.com; sklein@sonnenschein.com***. Copies sent to all parties and 9th Circuit. (SAT)
April 29, 2009 128 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit, as to 122 Order on Motion for Judgment, 123 Judgment,, by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. Filing fee received: $ 455.00, receipt number 09700000000002779392. (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Information Civil Appeals Docketing Statement - Part 1, # 2 Appeal Information Civil Appeals Docketing Statement - Part 2, # 3 Appeal Information Civil Appeals Docketing Statement - Part 3, # 4 Appeal Information Civil Appeals Docketing Statement - Part 4, # 5 Appeal Information Civil Appeals Docketing Statement - Part 5)(Venable, Lance) Modified on 5/1/2009 (SAT). DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO CORRECT LINKAGE.
April 13, 2009 127 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. for proceedings held on 06/26/2008, 01/08/2009-01/09/2009 before Judge Campbell. (Genetski, Christian)
April 9, 2009 CADS Sent re 121 Notice of Appeal: Civil Appeals docketing sent to 9th Circuit on this date. (ESL, )
April 8, 2009 126 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jonathan Lee Riches. Reason for return: Return to Sender: Inmate No Longer at this Facility. Document number #121 and #124. (REK)
April 7, 2009 125 Ninth Circuit Case Number 09-15649 for 121 Notice of Appeal,. (ESL, )
April 1, 2009 124 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re: 121 Notice of Appeal, filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. Filed dates for: Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory; *3/30/2009*, *Complaint* *10/25/2006*, Appealed Order *3/10/09***. Court Reporter *Patricia Lyons 602-322-7257; Liz Lemke 602-322-7247* Fee Status: *Paid on 3/30/2009 in the amount of $455.00*.************. Appellant Attorney: *Lance Venable; Joseph Meaney* *(Retained)* *docketing@vclmlaw.com*. Appellee Attorney: *Christian Genetski; Scott Stein; Shane McGee; Shaun Klein;* *(Retained)* *cgenetski@sonnenscheins.com;sstein@sonnenschein.com; smcgee@sonnenschein.com; sklein@sonnenschein.com***. Copies sent to all parties and 9th Circuit. (REW, )
April 1, 2009 Copy of CADS Sent re 121 Notice of Appeal, Civil Appeals Docketing Statement sent to 9th Circuit on this date (attorney notified to submit original in paper form). (REW, )
April 1, 2009 123 JUDGMENT: Blizzard shall be entitled to recover the total sum of $6,500,00 as monetary damages for counts I, II, III and IV of its counterclaims and 3rd party complaint related to the sale of Glider. Blizzard should not be entitled to multiple recover for counts I, II, III and IV. That is, Blizzard shall be entitled to receive a total of $6,500,000 for counts I, II, III and IV. Should liability on less than all counts be reversed on appeal, any remaining count shall independently support the $6,500,000 award. Michael Donnelly is personally liable for the $6,500,000 damage award under counts I, II, III and IV. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/1/2009. (LAD)
April 1, 2009 122 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 113 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/1/2009.(NVO)
March 30, 2009 121 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit, as to 116 Order, Permanent Injunction, by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. Filing fee received: $ 455.00, receipt number 09700000000002692521. (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Information Civil Appeals Docketing Statement, # 2 Appeal Information Order Appealed from District Court)(Venable, Lance)
March 25, 2009 120 Featured Case ORDER denying 118 Motion for Reconsideration; finding as moot 119 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/25/2009.(NVO)
March 24, 2009 119 MOTION to Stay re the Court's permanent injunction pending disposition of MDY's Motion for Reconsideration by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance)
March 24, 2009 118 MOTION for Reconsideration re the Court's March 10, 2009 Order by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance)
March 18, 2009 117 REPLY in Support re 113 MOTION for Judgment Damages on DMCA by Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Genetski, Christian) Modified on 3/19/2009 INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM (Reply) to (Reply in Support of Motion) (KMG).
March 10, 2009 116 Featured Case ORDER AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. The permanent injunction set forth in this paragraph (1) shall be stayed pending appeal. Within 30 days after all appeals being exhausted, the parties shall file a joint status report regarding the appropriate disposition of the escrow funds. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to hold proceedings and to enter further orders as may be appropriate to implement or enforce the provisions of this Order and Permanent Injunction (see order for details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/10/09. (TLJ)
March 10, 2009 115 RESPONSE to Motion re 113 MOTION for Judgment Damages on DMCA filed by Michael Donnelly, MDY Industries, LLC. (Meaney, Joseph)
March 3, 2009 114 Featured Case ORDER AND STIPULATED JUDGMENT pursuant to 112 Stipulation: ORDERED: 1. Blizzard shall be entitled to recover the total sum of $6,500,000 as monetary damages for counts I, II and III of its Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint related to the sale of Glider up through and including 2/23/09. 2. Blizzard shall be entitled to double or triple recovery for counts I, II and III. That is, Blizzard shalll be entitled to $6,500,000 in damages for counts I, II and III. However, should liability on any one or two of the counts be reversed on appeal, any remaining count shall independently support the $6,500,000 award. 3. Michael Donnelly is personally liable for the $6,500,000 damage award under counts I, II and III. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/2/2009. (LAD)
February 24, 2009 113 MOTION for Judgment Damages on DMCA by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Genetski, Christian)
February 23, 2009 112 STIPULATION as to Damages by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order and Stipulated Judgment)(Genetski, Christian)
February 13, 2009 111 MEMORANDUM re: Memorandum in Support of MDY and Donnelly's Request to Stay the Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff MDY Industries, LLC, ThirdParty Defendant Michael Donnelly, Counter Defendant MDY Industries, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order re Injunction, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Michael Donnelly, # 3 Exhibit B1 to Donnelly's Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B2 - to Donnelly's Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C - Patry Blog Articles, # 6 Exhibit D - UNC Law Review, # 7 Exhibit E - Jurimetrics Law Journal, # 8 Exhibit F - McSherry Article, # 9 Exhibit G - Siy Article, # 10 Exhibit H - Ars Technica Article)(Venable, Lance)
February 13, 2009 110 LODGED Proposed Proposed Order. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Genetski, Christian)
February 13, 2009 109 MEMORANDUM re: Memorandum Opposing Stay of Permanent Injunction re 108 Order by Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Genetski, Christian)
January 28, 2009 108 Featured Case ORDER re bench trial. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/28/2009. (NVO)
January 16, 2009 107 Featured Case ORDER. At the end of the recent bench trial, the Court informed the parties that it would try to issue a decision this week. The Court has not completed its decision. The decision likely will be issued next week. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1-16-09. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC)
January 9, 2009 106 Exhibit List by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., et al.(TLJ)
January 9, 2009 105 Exhibit List by MDY Industries, LLC.. (TLJ)
January 9, 2009 104 Witness List by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., et al.(TLJ)
January 9, 2009 103 Witness List by MDY Industries, LLC. (TLJ)
January 9, 2009 102 Minute Entry for Proceedings (Court Trial) held before Judge David G Campbell: Trial Day #2 - Reconvene. Michael Donnelly examined further. Witness excused. Closing argument. The matter is taken under advisement. Court is adjourned. Dft's exhibits are released to cnsl. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) (SAT)
January 8, 2009 101 AMENDED Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Bench Trial begun on 1/8/2009. (Amended to reflect admission of Exhibit 7). (See document for full details). (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.)(LAD)
January 8, 2009 100 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell. Bench trial - Day 1 - Bench Trial begun on 1/8/2009. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.)(LMR, )
November 24, 2008 99 Featured Case ORDER denying Jonathan Riches' 98 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/21/08.(REW, )
November 3, 2008 98 MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs, MOTION for Reconsideration En Banc and Clarification, MOTION for Amicus Brief by Jonathan Lee Riches. (TLJ)
October 20, 2008 97 Proposed Findings of Fact by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance)
September 29, 2008 96 Featured Case ORDER: Bench Trial set for 1/8/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/29/2008. (NVJ)
September 29, 2008 95 Featured Case ORDER AND STIPLATED JUDGMENT - Blizzard shall be entitled to recover the total sum of $6,000,000 as monetary damages for counts I, II and III of its Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint related to the sale of Glider up through and including September 1, 2008. Blizzard shall not be entitled to double or triple recovery for counts I, II and III. That is, Blizzard shall be entitled to receive a total of $6,000,000 in damages for counts I, II and III. However, should liability on any one or two of the counts be reversed on appeal, any one of these counts independently supports the $6,000,000 award. In the event that the Court determines that Michael Donnelly is personally liable, either individually or jointly and severally, under counts I, II, or III, this stipulation shall extend to him. The parties shall submit their disputed and undisputed statements of facts and law related to the DMCA claim on September 10, 2008. Counts V and VII of Blizzard's Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint alleging trademark infringement and unjust enrichment are hereby dismissed by stipulation of the parties. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/26/08. (KMG)
September 25, 2008 94 STIPULATION as to damages by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Order and Stipulated Judgment)(Venable, Lance)
September 25, 2008 92 LODGED Proposed Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Order. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance)
September 24, 2008 93 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell. Appearances: Joseph Meaney and Lance Venable for pla; Shane McGee and Christian Genetski for dfts. Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/24/2008. Bench trial set for 1/8/2009 for 2 days. Separate order to issue. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR, )
September 18, 2008 91 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 84 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/18/2008.(NVJ)
September 10, 2008 90 Exhibit List by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly.. (Venable, Lance)
September 10, 2008 89 Exhibit List by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc... (Venable, Lance)
September 10, 2008 88 Proposed Findings of Fact by MDY Industries, LLC, Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance)
September 2, 2008 87 Featured Case ORDER re proposed final pretrial order due 9/10/2008. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/2/2008. (NVJ)
August 25, 2008 86 REPLY in Support re 84 MOTION for Permanent Injunction or in the Alternative to Amend the Judgment Entered July 14, 2008 filed by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Genetski, Christian)
August 14, 2008 85 RESPONSE in Opposition re 84 MOTION for Permanent Injunction or in the Alternative to Amend the Judgment Entered July 14, 2008 filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Michael Donnelly, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Deposition Excerpt of Gregory Ashe, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - MDY's Letter of 7-25-08 to Blizzard, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Blizzard Press Release)(Venable, Lance)
July 28, 2008 84 MOTION for Permanent Injunction or in the Alternative to Amend the Judgment Entered July 14, 2008 by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, Declaration with Attached Exhibits, # 4 Exhibit D, Affidavit, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Genetski, Christian)
July 14, 2008 83 Featured Case ORDER re Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/24/2008 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Motions in limine due by 9/3/2008; rsponses to motions in limine due by 9/10/2008; no replies permitted. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/3/2008. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/14/2008. (NVJ)
July 14, 2008 82 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. A final pretrial conference will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/14/2008.(NVJ)
July 2, 2008 81 SEALED EXHIBITS re 57 filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit W)(MAP)
July 2, 2008 80 SEALED EXHIBITS re 45 filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit I)(MAP)
July 2, 2008 79 Featured Case SEALED ORDER granting 56 Motion; granting 59 Motion. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/1/08.(MAP)
June 26, 2008 78 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell. Appearances: Joseph Meaney and Lance Venable for pla; Christian Genetski and Shane McGee for dfts. Motion Hearing held on 6/26/2008 re 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly, and 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. IT IS ORDERED taking the matters under advisement. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Lemke.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR, )
June 20, 2008 77 RESPONSE re 75 Brief (Non Appeal) to the Brief of Amicus Curiae Public Knowledge by Defendants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Third Party Plaintiffs Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Genetski, Christian)
June 10, 2008 76 Featured Case ORDER re additional briefing re amicus curiae brief by Public Knowledge. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/10/2008. (NVJ)
May 30, 2008 75 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF in Support of Neither Party, re: 45 , 39 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment by Amicus Public Knowledge filed by Public Knowledge. (REW, )
May 30, 2008 74 Featured Case ORDER granting Public Knowledge's 63 Motion to File Amicus Curiae in Support of Neither Party on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment; the Clerk is directed to file the 67 lodged brief. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/29/08.(REW, )
May 27, 2008 73 Minute Order: Oral Argument is set as to 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support :. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2008 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVJ)
May 20, 2008 72 Featured Case ORDER granting 68 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/20/2008.(NVJ)
May 12, 2008 71 Reply re 58 Statement, of Facts by Defendants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Third Party Plaintiffs Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index & Ex. 59, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 60, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 61)(Genetski, Christian) Modified on 5/13/2008 DOCUMENT LINKED INCORRECTLY. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED TO LINK TO #58. (REW, ).
May 12, 2008 70 REPLY in Support re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Genetski, Christian)
May 12, 2008 69 REPLY in Support re 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance)
May 9, 2008 68 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for the parties reply briefs in support of their motions for summary judgment by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Venable, Lance)
May 6, 2008 67 LODGED Proposed Public Knowledge Amicus Curiae Brief, re: 63 Motion for Leave to File. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Public Knowledge. (Mableson, Connie) Modified on 5/7/2008 TO ADD TEXT AND LINKAGE TO MOTION (REW, ).
May 6, 2008 66 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 65 Memorandum, filed by Public Knowledge. Description of deficiency: Document not electronically lodged using LODGED PROPOSED DOCUMENT EVENT. ATTORNEY NOTICED TO RE-FILE (OPEN DOCUMENT FOR FULL DETAILS). (REW, )
May 5, 2008 65 LODGED Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief of Public Knowledge in Support of Neither Party on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by Amicus Public Knowledge. (Mableson, Connie) Modified on 5/6/2008 INCORRECT DOCUMENT EVENT SELECTED. ATTORNEY NOTICED TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT. (REW, ).
May 5, 2008 64 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 63 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Public Knowledge. Description of deficiency: Lodged Proposed Document must not be attached or made a part of the motion. ATTORNEY NOTICED TO RE-FILE. (REW, )
May 2, 2008 63 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Neither Party on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by Public Knowledge. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Curiae Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Public Knowledge's Request to File an Amicus Brief)(Mableson, Connie) Modified on 5/5/2008 LODGED PROPOSED DOCUMENT EVENT NOT ENTERED. (REW, ).
May 2, 2008 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Connie Jo Mableson on behalf of Public Knowledge (Mableson, Connie)
April 30, 2008 61 SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit W to the Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Response to the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re: 59 SEALED MOTION to Seal Document re Exhibits A and W of Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Response to the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. Filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance)
April 30, 2008 60 SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit A to Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re: 59 SEALED MOTION to Seal Document re Exhibits A and W of Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Response to the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. Filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance)
April 30, 2008 59 SEALED MOTION to Seal Document re Exhibits A and W of Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Response to the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order granting the plaintiffs' motion to files documents under seal)(Venable, Lance)
April 24, 2008 58 STATEMENT OF FACTS and Disputed Facts and Exhibits A to Z and Exhibits AA to CC re 57 Response to 39 Motion by Plaintiff MDY Industries, LLC, ThirdParty Defendant Michael Donnelly, Counter Defendant MDY Industries, LLC filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit P, # 16 Exhibit Q, # 17 Exhibit S, # 18 Exhibit T, # 19 Exhibit U, # 20 Exhibit V, # 21***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER #79, FILED 7/2/08***Exhibit W # 22 Exhibit X, # 23 Exhibit Y, # 24 Exhibit Z, # 25 Exhibit AA, # 26 Exhibit BB, # 27 Exhibit CC)(Venable, Lance) Modified on 4/25/2008 INCORRECT DOCUMENT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM (Declaration) TO (Statement of Facts); LINKAGE ADDED. (REW). MODIFIED ON 7/2/08 TO STRIKE EXHIBIT W ON (MAP).
April 24, 2008 57 RESPONSE to Motion re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance)
April 24, 2008 56 Third SEALED MOTION to Seal Document re Exhibits B & I of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Greg Ashe)(Venable, Lance)
April 23, 2008 55 RESPONSE TO 46 Statement of Facts, RE: 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index & Ex. 50, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 51, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 52, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 53, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 54, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 55, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 56, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 57, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 58)(Genetski, Christian) Modified on 4/24/2008 INCORRECT DOCUMENT EVENT SELECTED; DOCUMENT NOT LINKED CORRECTLY. LINKAGE ADDED AND TEXT CORRECTED TO REFLECT CORRECT DOCUMENT DESCRIPTION. (REW, ).
April 23, 2008 54 RESPONSE to Motion re 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Genetski, Christian)
April 9, 2008 53 Featured Case ORDER denying 52 Motion to Seal Document. Plaintiff's second motion to seal documents asserts that the Court should grant the request to seal because the parties agreed that the documents in question are confidential and the Court entered a protective order. Dkt. #52 at 1. This argument misreads the Ninth Circuit's Kamakana decision. The Ninth Circuit said in Kamakana that the entry of a protective ordered justifies the sealing of documents only when filed in connection with a non-dispositive motion. 447 F.3d at 1179-1180. Plaintiff seeks to seal documents in connection with a dispositive motion -- a motion for summary judgment. For this, Kamakana makes clear that Plaintiff must satisfy the compelling reasons test, and that the test is not satisfied merely by the previous entry of a protective order. Id. Although Plaintiff asserts that the documents to be sealed include trade secrets, it provides the Court with nothing to support that assertion and certainly does not enable the Court to "base its decision on a compelling reason and articulate the factual basis for its ruling, without relying on hypothesis or conjecture." Kamakana, 447 F.3d at 1179. Plaintiff's motion is denied one final time without prejudice to Plaintiff making the showing required by the compelling reasons test. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4-9-08. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC)
March 31, 2008 52 Second SEALED MOTION to Seal Document re Exhibits B and I to Plaintiff and Third-Party Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order granting motion to file documents under seal)(Venable, Lance)
March 26, 2008 51 Featured Case ORDER denying 48 Motion to Seal Document. The Ninth Circuit has held that parties must show "compelling reasons" to seal documents submitted in connection with dispositive motions. Kamakana v. City of Honolulu, 447 F.3d 1172, 1179 (9th Cir. 2006). The motion of Plaintiff and Third-Party Defendant asks the Court to permit the filing of motion for summary judgment exhibits under seal because the parties have stipulated to their confidentiality. The motion does not address the Ninth Circuit test and a mere stipulation does not satisfy it. The motion will be denied without prejudice to Plaintiff and Third-Party Defendant filing a motion that satisfies the Ninth Circuit standard. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3-26-08. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC)
March 25, 2008 50 SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit I to Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment re: 48 SEALED MOTION to Seal Document re Exhibits B and I of Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. Filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance)
March 25, 2008 49 SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit B to Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment re: 48 SEALED MOTION to Seal Document re Exhibits B and I of Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. Filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance)
March 25, 2008 48 SEALED MOTION to Seal Document re Exhibits B and I of Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order granting the plaintiffs' motion to file documents under seal)(Venable, Lance)
March 21, 2008 47 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 46 Additional Attachments to Main Document,, Exhibits L and N to Plaintiff's and Third Party Defendant's Statement of Facts in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff MDY Industries, LLC, ThirdParty Defendant Michael Donnelly, Counter Defendant MDY Industries, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit N)(Venable, Lance)
March 21, 2008 46 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Statement of Facts and Supporting Exhibits (Excluding Exhibits B, I, L, and N) by Plaintiff MDY Industries, LLC, ThirdParty Defendant Michael Donnelly, Counter Defendant MDY Industries, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit M)(Venable, Lance)
March 21, 2008 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance)
March 21, 2008 44 Additional Attachments to Main Document Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Third Party Plaintiffs Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 42, # 2 Exhibit 43, # 3 Exhibit 44, # 4 Exhibit 45, # 5 Exhibit 46, # 6 Exhibit 47, # 7 Exhibit 48, # 8 Exhibit 49)(Genetski, Christian)
March 21, 2008 43 Additional Attachments to Main Document Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Third Party Plaintiffs Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 32, # 2 Exhibit 33, # 3 Exhibit 34, # 4 Exhibit 35, # 5 Exhibit 36, # 6 Exhibit 37, # 7 Exhibit 38, # 8 Exhibit 39, # 9 Exhibit 40)(Genetski, Christian)
March 21, 2008 42 Additional Attachments to Main Document Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Third Party Plaintiffs Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 22, # 2 Exhibit 23, # 3 Exhibit 24, # 4 Exhibit 25, # 5 Exhibit 26, # 6 Exhibit 27, # 7 Exhibit 28, # 8 Exhibit 29, # 9 Exhibit 30)(Genetski, Christian)
March 21, 2008 41 Additional Attachments to Main Document Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Third Party Plaintiffs Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12, # 2 Exhibit 13, # 3 Exhibit 14, # 4 Exhibit 15, # 5 Exhibit 16, # 6 Exhibit 17, # 7 Exhibit 18, # 8 Exhibit 19, # 9 Exhibit 20)(Genetski, Christian)
March 21, 2008 40 STATEMENT of of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by Defendants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Third Party Plaintiffs Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Genetski, Christian)
March 21, 2008 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Genetski, Christian)
March 21, 2008 38 Featured Case ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/21/2008.(NVJ)
March 21, 2008 37 LODGED Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend the Page Limit for Motions for Summary Judgment and Responses re: 35 Joint MOTION filed by Vivendi Games, Inc., MDY Industries, LLC, Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Michael Donnelly. (Genetski, Christian) Modified on 3/24/2008 INCORRECT DOCUMENT EVENT SELECTED, EXCESS TEXT REMOVED. DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED. (REW, ).
March 18, 2008 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaun M Klein on behalf of Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Klein, Shaun)
March 18, 2008 35 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion for Summary Judgment and Responses by Vivendi Games, Inc., MDY Industries, LLC, Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Michael Donnelly, Vivendi, SA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Genetski, Christian)
February 11, 2008 34 Featured Case ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time. Dispositive motions due by 3/21/2008. The parties are advised that the Court will not grant additional extensions absent truly extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/08. (NVJ)
February 7, 2008 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to file dispositive motions by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Venable, Lance)
January 2, 2008 32 Featured Case ORDER granting 31 Amended Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Samuel Bryant Davidoff terminated for Defendants, Counter-Claim Plaintiffs, and Third Party Plaintiffs Blizzard Entertainment Inc and Vivendi Games Inc. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/2/08.(REW, )
December 24, 2007 31 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davidoff, Samuel)
December 18, 2007 30 Featured Case ORDER denying 29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Motion does not comply with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 83.3(b). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/18/07.(NVJ)
December 13, 2007 29 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Davidoff, Samuel)
October 2, 2007 28 Notice re Joint Report on Settlement Talks As Required Under The Court's April 6, 2007 Order by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly (Venable, Lance)
July 18, 2007 27 Featured Case Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/18/07. (NVJ)
July 13, 2007 26 STIPULATION for Protective Order by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance)
June 22, 2007 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Davidoff, Samuel)
June 1, 2007 24 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 1, 2007 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX058575 as to Shane M McGee. (BAS, )
June 1, 2007 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX058574 as to Samuel Bryant Davidoff. (BAS, )
June 1, 2007 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Shane M McGee on behalf of Vivendi Games, Inc., and Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (BAS, )
June 1, 2007 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Samuel Bryant Davidoff on behalf of Vivendi Games, Inc., and Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (BAS, )
May 8, 2007 21 Notice re service of document requests and interrogatories by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Genetski, Christian)
April 9, 2007 20 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 1/25/2008. Dispositive motions due by 2/29/2008. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/6/07. (LMR, )
April 4, 2007 19 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell. Appearances: Lance Venable for plas; Christian Genetski for dfts. Scheduling Conference held on 4/4/2007. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR, )
April 3, 2007 18 Notice re Initial Disclosures by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Genetski, Christian)
April 3, 2007 17 Notice re Initial Disclosure by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly (Venable, Lance)
March 27, 2007 16 REPORT re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Vivendi Games, Inc., MDY Industries, LLC, Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance)
March 26, 2007 15 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
March 26, 2007 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX055970 as to Christian S Genetski. (BAS, )
March 26, 2007 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Christian S Genetski on behalf of Vivendi Games, Inc., and Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (BAS, )
March 15, 2007 13 ANSWER to Counterclaim, ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly.(Venable, Lance)
February 21, 2007 12 Summons Issued as to Michael Donnelly. (PEM)
February 20, 2007 11 Featured Case ORDER re Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2007 04:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/20/07. (NVJ)
February 16, 2007 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Michael Donnelly, COUNTERCLAIM against MDY Industries, LLC by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Stein, Scott)
January 4, 2007 9 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to Local Rule 3.8(a), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned to by random draw to Judge David G. Campbell. All further pleadings should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CIV-06-2555-PHX-DGC FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause hearing scheduled for 1/16/07 is hereby vacated (MAP)
December 27, 2006 8 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. TEXT ONLY ENTRY, NO PDF DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (MAP)
December 20, 2006 7 Ordered that MDY Industries, LLC show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.8(a) before Judge Stephen M McNamee; Show Cause Hearing set for 1/16/2007 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen M McNamee. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(MAP)
December 11, 2006 6 Summons Issued as to Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Vivendi Games)(ESL)
December 1, 2006 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. ; Party Vivendi, SA terminated, filed by MDY Industries, LLC.(Venable, Lance)
October 26, 2006 4 Summons Issued as to Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. and Vivendi, SA. (Attachments: # 1 Vivendi)(entered by HIH)
October 26, 2006 3 Filing fee paid 10/26/2006, receipt number PHX049754. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Virgina A. Mathis. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV06-2555-PHX-VAM. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: # 1 Instructions) (entered by HIH)
October 25, 2006 1 COMPLAINT, filed by MDY Industries, LLC.(Meaney, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MDY Industries, LLC v. Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Vivendi Games Incorporated
Represented By: Christian Stephen Genetski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated
Represented By: Christian Stephen Genetski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: MDY Industries LLC
Represented By: Joseph Richard Meaney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivendi Games Incorporated
Represented By: Christian Stephen Genetski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated
Represented By: Christian Stephen Genetski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Vivendi Games Incorporated
Represented By: Christian Stephen Genetski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated
Represented By: Christian Stephen Genetski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MDY Industries LLC
Represented By: Joseph Richard Meaney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Public Knowledge
Represented By: Connie Jo Mableson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Michael Donnelly
Represented By: Lance Christopher Venable
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]