Tennenbaum v. Arizona City Sanitary District et al

Plaintiff: Michael E Tennenbaum
Defendant: Arizona City Sanitary District, Francis J. Slavin PC, Francis J Slavin and Carol J Slavin
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv02137
Filed: October 6, 2010
 
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
 
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2012 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Arizona City Sanitary District's 53 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's 67 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/7/2012.(LFIG)
September 14, 2012 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 122 Motion for Reconsideration is denied in part and granted in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the the 119 Order is vacated, but only to the extent that it is inconsistent with this order. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/14/2012.(LFIG)
February 5, 2013 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 175 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to 171 Slavin Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Response is extended to and including February 18, 2013. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/5/2013.(LFIG)
June 3, 2013 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that ACSD's 169 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. ORDERED that Slavin's 171 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/3/2013.(LFIG)
July 29, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/29/11.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tennenbaum v. Arizona City Sanitary District et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E Tennenbaum
Represented By: Jamey Green Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona City Sanitary District
Represented By: Milton W Hathaway, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis J. Slavin PC
Represented By: James K Kloss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis J Slavin
Represented By: James K Kloss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol J Slavin
Represented By: James K Kloss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]