United States of America v. Li

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Grace Xunmei Li
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00482
Filed: March 8, 2012
 
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2013 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 109 motion to exclude defendant's expert. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/3/2013.(DGC, nvo)
December 19, 2013 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 125 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying 128 Motion to Compel. Mr. Gang Chen's deposition shall be completed by video conference. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/19/2013.(DGC, nvo)
March 6, 2014 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 134 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 157 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/2014.(DGC, nvo)
August 26, 2014 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re bench trial. In-Court Hearing set for 9/18/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Plaintiff shall file a memorandum (not to exceed 5 pages) on or before 9/11/2014; Defendant shall file response (not to exceed 5 pages) on or before 9/15/2014. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/2014. (DGC, nvo)
September 10, 2014 220 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER - Grace Xunmei Li's certificate of naturalization (No. 28 687 569) is hereby cancelled. Defendant Li is precluded from claiming or exercising any rights, privileges, or advantages of United States citizenship based on he r May 5, 2005 naturalization or any document which evidences her citizenship based on her May 5, 2005 naturalization. By September 26, 2014, Defendant Li shall surrender to counsel for the United States her original certificate of naturalization (No. 28 687 569) and any United States passport issued to her. The Court understands that, between now and September 26, 2014, Defendant Li shall seek to obtain an I-94 card reflecting her status as a lawful permanent resident alien. Based on statements by counsel for the government at a hearing on September 9, 2014, the Court understands that the I-94 card will be issued immediately and will reflect Defendant Li's lawful permanent resident status. The Court also understands that Defendant Li c an then apply for a new green card and will receive one in due course. Defendant Li shall file a motion to stay the effect of this judgment by October 3, 2014. The United States shall file a response by October 7, 2014. Defendant Li shall file a re ply by October 24, 2014. The United States shall hold Defendant Li's certificate of naturalization and passport at the office of the United States Attorney in Phoenix, Arizona until this Court and, if necessary, the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, has ruled on her motion to stay. If either Court grants the motion to stay, the United States shall promptly return the certificate of naturalization and passport to Defendant Li. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/10/2014. (KMG)
January 14, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/14/2013.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Li
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lana Lunskaya Vahab
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Xunmei Li
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]