Honeywell International Incorporated v. Western Support Group Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Honeywell International Incorporated
Defendant: Western Support Group Incorporated, Douglas C Harmon and Cynthia A Harmon
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00645
Filed: March 27, 2012
 
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Western Support's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/4/13.(TLJ)
May 29, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 54 Motion for Protective Order. ORDER amending the Rule 16 Scheduling Order 26 . Discovery due by 8/1/13 and dispositive motions due by 8/30/13 (see order for complete information). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/29/13.(TLJ)
June 26, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 73 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney without prejudice. The motion is not in compliance with LRCiv 83.3(b)(2). ORDERED granting 73 Motion to Vacate June 26, 2013 Hearing. The Hearing re: discovery dispute set for 6/26/2013 at 1:3 0 P.M. is hereby vacated. If no motion to withdraw is filed within 3 days of this Order, Plaintiff may seek to reset a discovery dispute as set forth in the Court's Rule 16 Scheduling Order. (see attached Order for details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/26/2013.(TLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Honeywell International Incorporated v. Western Support Group Incorporated et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honeywell International Incorporated
Represented By: Brett L Dunkelman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Support Group Incorporated
Represented By: Steven M Weinberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas C Harmon
Represented By: Steven M Weinberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia A Harmon
Represented By: Steven M Weinberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]