Collinge et al v. Intelliquick Delivery Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: David Collinge, Melonie Priestly and Heather Arras
Defendant: Intelliquick Delivery Incorporated, Keith Spizzirri, Miriam Spizzirri, Transportation Authority LLC, Robert F Lorgeree, Jr., Majik Leasing LLC, Felicia Tavison, Jason Mittendorf and Jeffrey Lieber
Case Number: 2:2012cv00824
Filed: April 19, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2013 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 137 Motion to Compel. Within 28 days Defendants shall fully respond to the outstanding discovery requests pertaining to written contracts and related written communications (including electronic communica tions) IntelliQuick had with customers for whom IntelliQuick provided pick-up, delivery, courier or other transportation services which could be provided by freight drivers, route drivers or on-demand drivers during the period between April 19, 2009, and June 26, 2013. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a motion seeking to recover a portion of their reasonable expenses on or before December 13, 2013, to which Defendants shall respond on or before December 22, 2013. No reply may be filed unless requested by the court. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 12/3/13.(JWS)
December 8, 2013 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 140 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiffs may NOT add KMS or MT I as defendants, but may add ME as a defendant. Plaintiffs may add the other text changes contained in the second amended complaint lodged at docket 140-1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: Plaintiffs shall promptly file a second amended complaint that complies with this order and promptly perfect service on ME. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 12/6/13.(JWS)
June 9, 2014 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 200 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Defendants Intelliquick Delivery, Inc. and the marital community of Keith Spizzeri are jointly liable to pay Plaintiffs the sum of $13,253.63. They shall tender payment to Plaintiffs' counsel, who shall be responsible for allocating it among the several plaintiffs. Payment shall be made in the form of a check payable to Plaintiffs' counsel within 21 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 6/9/14.(JWS)
March 23, 2015 342 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the 310 Motion Seeking Decertification is DENIED and the 303 Motion to Certify Class is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. ORDERED certifying a class action that includes all current and former drivers or couriers as described here in. ORDERED appointing plaintiffs' counsel as class counsel under Rule 23(g). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall provide to plaintiffs' counsel the last-known contact information for the class members within 21 days of this Order and plaintiffs shall submit a proposed class notice within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 3/23/2015. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
March 23, 2015 343 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the 304 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs' request for a determination that they are employees for purposes of the FLSA and the Arizona Wage Act is GRANTED, and plaintiffs' request for partial summary judgment holding that defendants Transportation Authority, Inc., Keith Spizzirri, and Bob Lorgeree are joint employers under the FLSA is DENIED. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 3/23/2015. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
July 31, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 32 Motion to Certify Class. 1) It is ORDERED conditionally certifying a class that includes All current and former drivers or couriers, who made pick-ups or deliveries for or on behalf of IntelliQuick Deliveries, Inc. as a Freight Driver , Route Driver, or On-Demand Driver within the State of Arizona and who were or are classified or paid as independent contractors or not classified or paid as employees at any time on or after April 9, 2009. 2) Defendants shall provide to plaintiffs ' counsel the last known contact information for potential class members. 3) Plaintiffs' proposed notice is approved provided the opt-in period is amended to sixty days. 4) Because contact information for current employees who are potential class members will be provided to plaintiffs, the court declines to require that IntelliQuick post the notice and consent forms at its business locations. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 7/31/12.(JWS)
December 11, 2012 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 12/11/12.(JWS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collinge et al v. Intelliquick Delivery Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Collinge
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Represented By: Mark Allen Bracken
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Kroll
Represented By: Susan Joan Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melonie Priestly
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Represented By: Mark Allen Bracken
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Kroll
Represented By: Susan Joan Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Arras
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Represented By: Mark Allen Bracken
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Kroll
Represented By: Susan Joan Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intelliquick Delivery Incorporated
Represented By: Laurent Richard George Badoux
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Judd
Represented By: Mark Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Spizzirri
Represented By: Laurent Richard George Badoux
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Judd
Represented By: Mark Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miriam Spizzirri
Represented By: Laurent Richard George Badoux
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Judd
Represented By: Mark Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportation Authority LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert F Lorgeree, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Majik Leasing LLC
Represented By: Laurent Richard George Badoux
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Judd
Represented By: Mark Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Tavison
Represented By: Laurent Richard George Badoux
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Judd
Represented By: Mark Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Mittendorf
Represented By: Laurent Richard George Badoux
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Judd
Represented By: Mark Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Lieber
Represented By: Laurent Richard George Badoux
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Judd
Represented By: Mark Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]