Young v. Liberty Mutual Group Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Dawn Young
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group Incorporated, Mike Dumas and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2012cv02302
Filed: October 29, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2014 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company's Motion to Seal Portions of its Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documentation, (Doc. 14 8), is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Seal, (Doc. 153 ), is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's motion for summary judgment, (Doc. 149 ), is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED striking Docs. 151 and 154. These documents shall remain under seal. FURTHER ORDERED that the oral argument s et for January 15, 2015 is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with the procedure as set forth in this Order concerning the briefing of Defendant's motion of summary judgment. Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment within fourteen days from the date of this Order, with the response and reply due within the time period prescribed by Local Rule 7.2(c) and (d). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/4/2014.(KMG)
March 17, 2015 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 169 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's bad faith claim will proceed to trial, and Plaintiff's punitive damages claim is dismissed. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/17/2015.(TLB)
March 6, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Mike Dumas's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 5 ) is granted. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/6/2013.(KMG)
March 6, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The parties have fully briefed the issues regarding Defendant Mike Dumas's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's complaint against him (Doc. 5 ). Having considered the parties briefs the Court finds oral argument would not aid the Court� 39;s decisional process. Accordingly, the Court vacates the Oral Argument on Defendant Mike Dumas's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 5), scheduled for Monday, March 11, 2013, at 4:00 p.m. MST. See Partridge v. Reich, 141 F.3d 920, 926 (9th Cir. 1998); Lake at Las Vegas Investors Group, Inc. v. Pac. Dev. Malibu Corp., 933 F.2d 724, 729 (9th Cir. 1991). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/6/2013. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Liberty Mutual Group Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Young
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis Raizner
Represented By: Kevin B Wein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group Incorporated
Represented By: Cassandra Victoria Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Dumas
Represented By: Cassandra Victoria Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.