Grady et al v. Tri-City National Bank

Defendant: Tri-City National Bank
Plaintiff: Michael Grady and Jennifer Grady
Case Number: 2:2012cv02507
Filed: November 23, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs' 23 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is denied; ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 18 Motion to Exceed Page Limit is granted to the extent that Doc. 16 is deemed to be properly filed; and that Defendant's 22 Motion to Exceed Page Limit is granted to the extent that Doc. 21 is deemed to be properly filed. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/19/2013.(LFIG)
May 13, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 5 Motion to Dismiss is granted. ORDERED that the 16 Motion to Amend is granted. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order or the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment, dismissing this case with prejudice. ORDERED that the 10 Motion for Sanctions is denied. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/13/2013.(LFIG)
May 15, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER that the 5 Motion to Dismiss is granted. ORDERED that the 16 Motion to Amend is granted. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint by June 3, 2013 or the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment, dismissing this case with prejudice. ORDERED that the 10 Motion for Sanctions is denied. ORDERED that this Order amends and supersedes the 25 Order of May 13, 2013. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/15/2013. (LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grady et al v. Tri-City National Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-City National Bank
Represented By: Neal Hait Bookspan
Represented By: Laura Allison Rogal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Grady
Represented By: John R Politan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Grady
Represented By: John R Politan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]