Brooks v. Hawaii, State of et al

Defendant: Benjamin Griego, Department of Public Safety, Shari Kimoto, Saguaro Correctional Center, Todd Thomas and Hawaii, State of
Plaintiff: Donimic T Brooks
Case Number: 2:2013cv00485
Filed: March 8, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Bridget S Bade (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's (Complaint) [1-2] is dismissed for failure to file on the court-approved form. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must ent er a judgment of dismissal without prejudice. ORDER denying 8 Motion for Default Judgment; denying without prejudice 11 Motion for Order to Show Cause; Motion for TRO; Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying without prejudice as moot Motion for Summary Judgment [1-4 at p.7]. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/10/13.(TLJ)
September 12, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) Counts Two and Three and the Free Exercise claim in Count One of the First Amended Complaint are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Kimoto and Jinbo are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judg ment 16 is denied without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet for Defendants Griego and Thomas. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Bridget S. Bade. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 9/8/13. (TLJ)
November 25, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant Griego and Thomas's Motion to Dismiss. The Motion to Dismiss 22 is granted. Plaintiff's action is dismissed without prejudice for lack of exhaustion. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/22/13.(TLJ)
March 6, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, allowing the withdrawal of Courtney R. Cloman as one of the counsel of record for Defendants Todd Thomas and Ben Griego ("Defendants") in this action. Defendants continue to be represented by Daniel P. Struck and Rachel Love for Struck Wieneke & Love, P.L.C.. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/5/2014.(ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Hawaii, State of et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Griego
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Courtney Rachel Cloman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Rachel Love(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Struck(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shari Kimoto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saguaro Correctional Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii, State of
Represented By: Rachel Love(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Courtney Rachel Cloman
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Struck(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donimic T Brooks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]