Steadfast Insurance Company v. National Fire & Marine Insurance Company et al

Defendant: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company and Unknown Parties
Plaintiff: Steadfast Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2013cv00724
Filed: April 10, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Injunctive/Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant National Fire's 14 Motion to Dismiss is granted with leave to amend. Plaintiff Steadfast shall file an amended complaint on or before January 17, 2014. ORDERED that Steadfast's Counter-Motion to Remand is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 12/19/2013.(LFIG)
April 10, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Response to Motion to Dismiss: Plaintiff's response to 34 Motion to Dismiss is due 4/24/2014. See attached order. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 4/10/2014. (LMR)
April 21, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion for Reconsideration. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 4/20/2014.(LMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steadfast Insurance Company v. National Fire & Marine Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Jay Richard Graif(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kevin Charles Barrett(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: William Courtland Reeves(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]