Mealer v. GMAC Mortgage LLC et al

Defendant: Motors Liquidation Company, GMAC Financial Services, General Motors Corporation, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Residential Capital LLC and Unknown Parties
Plaintiff: John Lewis Mealer
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv08172
Filed: September 14, 2010
 
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Navajo
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2010 30 Featured Case ORDER AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part 8 GM's Motion to Dismiss. It is denied as to dismissing the case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5), for insufficient service of process. GM's simultaneous motion to dismiss the case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) is GRANTED, and the claims against GM are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 11/1/10.(LSP)
November 16, 2010 35 Featured Case ORDER denying 13 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 24 Motion to Strike. 28 MOTION in Support of Plaintiff's Standing MOTION to Withdraw MOTION to Quash Defendant's Motion to Dismiss MOTION to Amend/Correct. The portion of plaintiff's motion at docket 28 in support of plaintiff's standing is also DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 11/16/10.(JWS)
November 16, 2010 36 Featured Case ORDER AND OPINION granting Mr. Kordella's 16 Motion to Dismiss the claims, and the claims against Mr. Kordella are dismissed. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 11/16/10.(ESL)
December 6, 2010 40 Featured Case ORDER AND OPINION that defendants' 21 motion to dismiss the complaint as res judicata is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: To the extent Mr. Mealer has asserted claims against GMAC Mortgage, LLC, Residential Capital LLC, and GMAC Financial Services based on the mishandling of mortgage assets, breach of contract, conspiracy, or declaratory relief, those claims are DISMISSED as res judicata, leaving only claims arising out of the allegedly tortious blog posting. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 12/03/10.(ESL)
February 24, 2011 54 Featured Case ORDER denying 42 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 2/24/11.(JWS)
March 25, 2011 68 Featured Case ORDER AND OPINION granting 59 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall enter judgment for defendants. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 3/25/11.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mealer v. GMAC Mortgage LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motors Liquidation Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Financial Services
Represented By: Colt B Dodrill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Colt B Dodrill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Capital LLC
Represented By: Colt B Dodrill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lewis Mealer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]