Montoya v. 3PD Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Dennis Montoya
Defendant: Home Depot Incorporated, 3PD Incorporated and Home Depot USA Incorporated
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv08068
Filed: March 27, 2013
 
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Mohave
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2014 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 70 Big Dog's Motion to Dismiss. See PDF document for details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/9/14.(LSP)
July 10, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND DECISION AND ORDER granting 89 Home Depot's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall dismiss Defendants Home Depot Incorporated and Home Depot USA Incorporated from this case. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/9/14.(LSP) Modified on 7/10/2014 (LSP).
July 8, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2013 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/8/2013. (LMR)
September 25, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Stipulation on Equitable Tolling: See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/25/2013. (LMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Montoya v. 3PD Incorporated et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Montoya
Represented By: John Dean Curtis, II(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Carolyn H Cottrell(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot Incorporated
Represented By: Stephanie J Quincy(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3PD Incorporated
Represented By: Robert Lewis Browning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA Incorporated
Represented By: Stephanie J Quincy(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]