Grecian v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al

Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC and Unknown Parties
Plaintiff: Todd P Grecian
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv08089
Filed: April 16, 2013
 
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER granting Defendant's 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before September 13, 2013. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/21/13. (LAD)
December 10, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER granting 25 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before December 23, 2013. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/10/13.(LSP)
May 15, 2014 56 Featured Case ORDER granting 48 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Because Plaintiff has had three opportunities to state a claim and has failed to do so, further leave to amend will not be granted. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/15/14.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Grecian v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd P Grecian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]