Ferrell v. Ryan et al

Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Petitioner: Stanford Lamar Ferrell
Case Number: 4:2013cv00305
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Hector C Estrada (PS)
Presiding Judge: David C Bury
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254). The Magistrate Judge recommends that the District Court, after its independent review of the record, enter an order denying the petition for writ of habeas corpus. Any party may serve and file written objections within 14 days of being served with a copy of this report and recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 7/22/14. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
September 23, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 29 . It is ORDERED that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 1 ) is DENIED and this action is dismissed with prejudice. A Final Judgment shall enter separately. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 9/22/14. (KAH)
April 17, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation 29 in its entirety as its findings of fact and conclusions of law. The Objections 34 raised by the Petitioner are OVERRULED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply 39 and Motion for Leave to File Reply 41 are DENIED; the Motion to Strike Reply 43 is GRANTED. 28 U.S.C. §2254. FURTHER ORDERED that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 is DENIED and this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Final Judgment to enter separately. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Certificate of Appealability is DENIED as to all claims. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 4/15/2015. (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrell v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stanford Lamar Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]