Weaver v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Ricky Weaver
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc and TK Holdings Inc
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00025
Filed: March 23, 2011
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Independence
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: the pretrial hearing on 2/27/2014; granting 91 Toyota Defendants' motion for summary judgment for punitive damages; granting in part and denying in part 98 Toyota Defendants' Motion in Limine as set forth in this Order; and, granting in part and taking under advisement in part 100 Mr. Weaver's Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/28/2014. (thd)
March 7, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Mr. Weaver's motion for non-suit. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/7/2014. (mmd)
February 7, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/7/12. (kpr)
July 30, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/30/12. (kpr)
August 3, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 32 Motion to Vacate 30 Order Dismissing Case. The trial will be continued to sometime in 2013. Pltf will file an amended complaint by 8/21/12 and Rule 26 expert disclosures by 9/30/12. Toyota will produce its Rule 26 expert disclosures by 11/15/12; and the discovery cutoff will be 1/31/13. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/3/12. (kpr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2012: # 1 Main Document - Correct) (hph).
March 1, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 60 MOTION to Exclude Untimely Disclosed Evidence and Alternative Motion for Continuance filed by Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc. A new scheduling order will be entered by separate order; di scovery will remain open until May 22, 2013, for the limited purpose of conducting the depositions of Dr. Paver, Dr. Batzer, Mr. Hooker, Michael Sanders, Charles Butler, and Peter Dishart. If a party wishes to take another deposition within this extended period of discovery, and the deposition cannot be taken by agreement, that party may file a motion with the Court. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/1/13. (kpr)
December 5, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 84 Response (Non Motion), filed by Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc, 83 Objection filed by Ricky Weaver. The Court overrules plaintiff's objection 83 and orders Mr. Hooker to be present for deposition in Little Rock, AR on December 11 or 12, 2013, or provide the Court before 10:00 a.m. Central Time on December 9, 2013, good reason as to why Mr. Hooker is unavailable on those dates. The Court denies defendants' requests for costs and expenses associated with this matter. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/5/13. (kpr)
December 10, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting telephone conference re 87 Reply (Non Motion) filed by Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc, 85 to discuss the deposition of Mr. Hooker. The conference will be held on Wednesday, December 11, 2013, beginning at 1:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/10/13. (kpr)
December 12, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 89 Telephone Conference. Deposition of Mr. Hooker as an expert witness in this case is set for December 27, 2013. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/12/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Weaver v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Weaver
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Represented By: Barbara A. Merritt
Represented By: John M. Merritt
Represented By: R. Theodor Stricker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TK Holdings Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]