Ralcorp Holdings Inc et al v. Frito-Lay North America Inc

Plaintiff: Ralcorp Holdings Inc and Medallion Foods Inc
Defendant: Frito-Lay North America Inc
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00018
Filed: February 10, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 MOTION for Timothy S. Durst, Susan Cannon Kennedy, and Jonathan R. Mureen to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Frito-Lay North America Inc. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/21/12. (vjt)
February 23, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion for Limited Admission of David W. Harlan, Jennifer E. Hoekel and Zachary C. Howenstine. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/23/12. (kpr)
March 16, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that pltfs' 26 Motion to Strike the affidavit of Timothy S. Durst is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/16/12. (vjt)
March 19, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing counsel for deft Timothy S. Durst and Jonathan R. Mureen to bring electronic devices into the courthouse in Little Rock on 3/19/12. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/19/12. (vjt)
March 19, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Kevin A Crass, Jamie Huffman Jones, David W. Harlan, and Mark Hostetler are hereby authorized to bring electronic devices into the courthouse in Little Rock on 3/19/12. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/19/12. (vjt)
March 20, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Frito-Lay's motion to dismiss 4 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; pltfs' 11 motion to enjoin Frito-Lay from proceeding with the second-filed case is DENIED; this action is STAYED pending a decision from the Eastern District of Texas; parties are directed to notify this Court upon that decision. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/20/12. (vjt)
April 4, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY, the Eastern District of Texas has now ruled that Ralcorp and Medallion are subject to its jurisdiction and that venue is proper there; this action is therefore dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/4/12. (vjt)
April 4, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 42 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/4/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ralcorp Holdings Inc et al v. Frito-Lay North America Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralcorp Holdings Inc
Represented By: Jennifer E. Hoekel
Represented By: David W. Harlan
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Represented By: Zachary C. Howenstine
Represented By: Jamie Marie Huffman Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medallion Foods Inc
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Represented By: David W. Harlan
Represented By: Jennifer E. Hoekel
Represented By: Zachary C. Howenstine
Represented By: Jamie Marie Huffman Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frito-Lay North America Inc
Represented By: Timothy S. Durst
Represented By: Susan Cannon Kennedy
Represented By: Jonathan R. Mureen
Represented By: John Peyton Perkins, III
Represented By: Steven T. Shults
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]