Rashad v. Sallings et al

Defendant: Dick H Sallings, Thomas Kendrick, Tammy L Harris and Jeff Sims
Plaintiff: Fahim Jamal Rashad
Case Number: 1:2013cv00032
Filed: March 19, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Independence
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion for TRO; denying 9 Motion for Order to Show Cause; finding as moot 11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/5/13. (kpr)
September 19, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion to Compel, as moot. Defendants have agreed to respond to plaintiff's discovery requests, which they just received. The responses are due October 10, 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/19/13. (kpr)
January 3, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reminding Plaintiff to keep a current address on file with the Clerk. If he does not submit a current address by 31 January 2014, the Court will dismiss his complaint without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/3/2014. (jak)
May 3, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing plaintiff's claims against defts Sallings, Harris, and Dendrick. Service is appropriate as to deft Sims. The Clerk shall prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal shall serve it and a copy of the complaint, without prepayment of fees. The 7 MOTION to Compel filed by Fahim Jamal Rashad is denied without prejudice. Def Sims need not respond to discovery requests until he has been served and made a party to this lawsuit. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/3/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rashad v. Sallings et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick H Sallings
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Kendrick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy L Harris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sims
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fahim Jamal Rashad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]