Murphy v. Hughes et al

Plaintiff: Lisa Murphy
Defendant: J Hughes, Heather Hutton-Glover, Booker and Austin
Case Number: 1:2014cv00006
Filed: January 13, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Status of the case. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet and the Initial Scheduled Order 31 . Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/16/2014. (kcs)
April 29, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 54 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; granting 41 motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff's claim Hughes provided her with inadequate medical care for degenerative disc disease in her knee, back, and neck is dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's claim that Williams failed to take corrective action after reviewing her grievances about the medical care she received for degenerative disc disease in her knee, back, and neck is dismissed with prejudice. All other claims raised in her substituted complaint are dismissed without prejudice. It is CERTIFIED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/29/2015. (ks)
April 29, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 55 Order entered on this day, this case is dismissed. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/29/2015. (ks)
February 19, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/19/2014. (kcs)
February 24, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A, Murphy's claims against Hutton-Glover, Booker, and Austin are dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Hughes, Cole, Husten, Warsham, and Williams, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, substituted complaint, and this Opinion and Order on them through the Humphries & Odum law firm without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/24/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Hughes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Hutton-Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.