Poe v. Polaris Industries Inc et al

Plaintiff: Chris Poe
Defendant: Polaris Industries Inc and Floyd Inc
Case Number: 2:2011cv00039
Filed: February 28, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED EXPERT DISCLOSURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/21/11. (kpr)
January 24, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/24/12. (kpr)
April 30, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing counsel for the parties to meet and confer by telephone this week to address the Whittle issue. Poe's three responses are due May 6, 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/30/13. (kpr)
June 28, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing both defendants with prejudice pursuant to the parties' settlement. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/28/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poe v. Polaris Industries Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Poe
Represented By: Ralph E. Chapman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polaris Industries Inc
Represented By: David L. Ortega
Represented By: J. K. Leonard
Represented By: Gordon S. Rather, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd Inc
Represented By: Michael L. Alexander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]