S & S Sales Inc v. Kellogg Company et al

Plaintiff: S & S Sales Inc
Defendant: Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, Kellogg USA Inc and Gulf Coast Cookies LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00155
Filed: September 1, 2011
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
 
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2011 24 Featured Case ORDER denying, without prejudice, 8 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/20/11. (kpr)
February 21, 2012 30 Featured Case ORDER denying 28 Notice filed by S & S Sales Inc, which the Court construes as a motion for Clerk's default. Kellogg must answer the complaint by March 9, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/21/12. (kpr)
May 4, 2012 37 Featured Case ORDER suspending the scheduling order and finding as moot 32 Motion to Stay. The Court will enter judgment dismissing the complaint with prejudice after June 4, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/4/12. (kpr)
June 5, 2012 38 Featured Case JUDGMENT pursuant to the parties' settlement and this Court's 37 Order of May 4, 2012, dismissing the complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/5/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: S & S Sales Inc v. Kellogg Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S & S Sales Inc
Represented By: Christopher Aaron Averitt
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Sales Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg USA Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast Cookies LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]