Muhammad v. Lovin et al

Defendant: Donna Smith, Edna Smith, Tommie G Lovin and C Murphy
Plaintiff: Reno Muhammad
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00026
Filed: February 8, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Monroe
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 16 Partial Report and Recommendations that 15 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Reno Muhammad be denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/27/12. (kpr)
May 16, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 29 Partial Report and Recommendations denying 33 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/16/12. (kpr)
August 17, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the Order that was entered on this day, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED, and ADJUDGED that this case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/17/2012. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Muhammad v. Lovin et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edna Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommie G Lovin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Murphy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reno Muhammad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]